Preap et al v. Beers et al

Defendant: Gregory Archambeault, Timothy S. Aitken, Eric H. Holder, Jr., David Marin and Jeh Johnson
Plaintiff: Juan Lozano Magdaleno, Eduardo Vega Padilla and Mony Preap
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv05754
Filed: December 12, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2014 39 Featured Case ORDER IN ADVANCE OF ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/17/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
May 15, 2014 48 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 24 Motion to Dismiss; granting 8 Motion to Certify Class. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
June 24, 2014 57 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION; PERMITTING PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO REPLY re 51 MOTION for Clarification of Court's May 15, 2014 Order and Stay Pending Clarification filed by David Marin, Gregory Archambeault, Timothy S. Aitken, Jeh Johnson, Eric H. Holder, Jr. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/24/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
July 11, 2014 59 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 51 Motion for Clarification of thsi Court's May 15, 2014 Order. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 21, 2014 66 Featured Case ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/21/14. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A )(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Preap et al v. Beers et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Archambeault
Represented By: Troy Liggett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy S. Aitken
Represented By: Troy Liggett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Represented By: Troy Liggett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Marin
Represented By: Troy Liggett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeh Johnson
Represented By: Troy Liggett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Lozano Magdaleno
Represented By: Stacy S Chen
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass, Esq.
Represented By: Theresa H Nguyen
Represented By: Alison Edith Pennington
Represented By: Anoop Prasad
Represented By: Jon Burgess Streeter
Represented By: Betny A. Townsend
Represented By: Jingni Zhao
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Vega Padilla
Represented By: Stacy S Chen
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass, Esq.
Represented By: Theresa H Nguyen
Represented By: Alison Edith Pennington
Represented By: Anoop Prasad
Represented By: Jon Burgess Streeter
Represented By: Betny A. Townsend
Represented By: Jingni Zhao
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mony Preap
Represented By: Theresa H Nguyen
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass, Esq.
Represented By: Stacy S Chen
Represented By: Alison Edith Pennington
Represented By: Anoop Prasad
Represented By: Jon Burgess Streeter
Represented By: Betny A. Townsend
Represented By: Jingni Zhao
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]