Eslami v. Koskinen

Plaintiff: A. Ali Eslami
Defendant: John Koskinen
Case Number: 4:2014cv00328
Filed: January 22, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:6702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS 11 MOTION. Responses due by 4/28/2014. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
June 10, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 11 MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING 10 MOTION TO SEAL. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 16, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 20 Motion to Continue (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
February 10, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER CORRECTING TIME OF FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AS PREVIOUSLY STATED WRONG IN: ORDER DOCKET NO. 48 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/10/2105. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eslami v. Koskinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. Ali Eslami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Koskinen
Represented By: Thomas M. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.