Gonzales v. Google Inc. Featured Case

U.S. Attorney General Alberto R. Gonzales subpoenaed Google, Inc. to compile and produce a massive amount of information from Google\'s search index, and to turn over a significant number of search engine queries entered by Google users.

Plaintiff: Alberto R. Gonzales
Defendant: Google Inc.
Amicus: Law Professors and Center for Democracy and Technology
 
Case Number: 5:2006mc80006
Filed: January 18, 2006
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Ware
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2006 10
NOTICE by Alberto R. Gonzales re 1 MOTION to Compel of Hearing on Motion (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 1/26/2006)
February 2, 2006 11 Featured Case
ORDER by Judge James Ware continuing hearing on motion to compel; setting briefing schedule. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2006)
February 17, 2006 12
Memorandum in Opposition to the Government's Motion to Compel filed byGoogle Inc.. (Gidari, Albert) (Filed on 2/17/2006)
February 17, 2006 13
DECLARATION of Marty Lev in Opposition to 12 Memorandum in Opposition to the Government's Motion to Compel filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s)12) (Gidari, Albert) (Filed on 2/17/2006)
February 17, 2006 14
DECLARATION of Matt Cutts in Opposition to 12 Memorandum in Opposition to the Government's Motion to Compel filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Related document(s)12) (Gidari, Albert) (Filed on 2/17/2006)
February 17, 2006 15
DECLARATION of Ashok Ramani in Opposition to 12 Memorandum in Opposition to the Government's Motion to Compel filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Related document(s)12) (Gidari, Albert) (Filed on 2/17/2006)
February 17, 2006 16
NOTICE of Appearance by Aden J. Fine (Fine, Aden) (Filed on 2/17/2006)
February 17, 2006 17
Memorandum in Opposition filed byACLU et al.. (Fine, Aden) (Filed on 2/17/2006)
February 24, 2006 18
STIPULATION Regarding the Length of the Movant's Reply Brief by Alberto R. Gonzales. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 2/24/2006)
February 24, 2006 19
Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Jennifer Stisa Granick on behalf of Law Professors. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Proposed Order)(Granick, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/24/2006)
January 18, 2006 1
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel compliance with subpoena duces tecum filed by Alberto R. Gonzales. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2006 20
Brief re 1 MOTION to Compel, 12 Memorandum in Opposition Amicus Brief of Center for Democracy and Technology in Support of Google's Opposition to the Motion to Compel filed byCenter for Democracy and Technology. (Related document(s)1, 12) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 2/24/2006)
February 24, 2006 21
REPLY to Response to Motion re 1 MOTION to Compel Reply Memorandum in Support of the Motion to Compel Compliance with the Subpoena Duces Tecum filed byAlberto R. Gonzales. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 2/24/2006)
February 24, 2006 22
Declaration of Philip B. Stark, Ph.D. Notice of Filing of Supplemental Declaration of Philip B. Stark, Ph.D. filed byAlberto R. Gonzales. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 2/24/2006)
February 24, 2006 23
Declaration of Joel McElvain Second Declaration of Joel McElvain filed byAlberto R. Gonzales. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 2/24/2006)
February 27, 2006 24 Featured Case
STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Length of Movant's Reply. Signed by Judge James Ware on 02/27/06. (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2006)
February 28, 2006 25 Featured Case
ORDER GRANTING LAW PROFESSORS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Signed by Judge James Ware on 02/28/06. (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2006)
March 3, 2006 26 Featured Case
ORDER by Judge James Ware rescheduling hearing on Plaintiff's motion to compel. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2006)
March 8, 2006 27
Proposed Order re 19 Amicus Curiae Appearance [PROPOSED] AMENDED ORDER GRANTING LAW PROFESSORS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Law Professors. (Granick, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/8/2006)
March 9, 2006 28
RESPONSE to re 19 Amicus Curiae Appearance Movant's Statement in Response to Application for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Alberto R. Gonzales. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 3/9/2006)
March 13, 2006 29 Featured Case
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING LAW PROFESSORS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Signed by Judge James Ware on 03/13/06. (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2006)
January 18, 2006 2
NOTICE of filing declaration of Philip B. Stark Phd by Alberto R. Gonzales re 1 MOTION to Compel (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2006 30
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/14/2006 before James Ware (Date Filed: 3/17/2006). (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (mp, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/17/2006)
March 17, 2006 31 Featured Case
ORDER by Judge James Ware granting in part and denying in part 1 Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006)
January 18, 2006 3
Declaration of Joel McElvain in Support of 1 MOTION to Compel filed byAlberto R. Gonzales. (Related document(s)1) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2006 7
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Delehunt (Delehunt, Lisa) (Filed on 1/24/2006)
January 26, 2006 9
STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule by Alberto R. Gonzales. (McElvain, Joel) (Filed on 1/26/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gonzales v. Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto R. Gonzales
Represented By: Joel McElvain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Delehunt Olle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Law Professors
Represented By: Jennifer Stisa Granick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Center for Democracy and Technology
Represented By: Richard Roy Wiebe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]