Michael Malone v. eBay, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael Malone, Ann Farmer, Todd Van Pelt and James Donohue
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2007cv01882
Filed: April 4, 2007
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
 
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2008 101 Featured Case ORDER overruling 97 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge Seeborg. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/19/2008. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 25, 2008 104 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Fogel denying 85 Motion to Intervene and Motion for Joinder Party Intervention (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
October 21, 2008 111 Featured Case ORDER re 110 Stipulation, filed by eBay, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/21/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
December 11, 2008 123 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 108 Motion to Compel without Prejudice (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
January 15, 2009 127 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel denying 121 Motion to Intervene (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
March 5, 2009 146 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 145 (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 17, 2009 149 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 147 (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
April 3, 2009 159 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting in part 152 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
May 29, 2009 210 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS RE BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re 208 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/29/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
July 7, 2009 237 Featured Case ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 222 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
August 13, 2009 318 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF PLAINTIFF MICHAEL MALOTT re 290 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/12/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 17, 2009 348 Featured Case FURTHER ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL TESTIMONY AND TRANSACTIONAL DATA 252 177 (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 31, 2009 390 Featured Case ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 359 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/26/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
September 1, 2009 412 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 344 DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; AND GRANTING IN PART 349 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO VACATE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT'S MO TION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/1/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
September 10, 2009 423 Featured Case ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE TO 404 OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY ORDER.Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/10/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 11, 2009 425 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING AND DEPOSITION SCHEDULE (approving 418 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/11/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 17, 2009 448 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 441 MODIFYING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR EBAY'S 438 MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT GLENN A. WOROCH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/17/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 24, 2009 454 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Page Limitations for Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Class Certification re 451 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/22/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
October 14, 2009 497 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Seeborg vacating hearing on (442)Motion to Compel in case 5:07-cv-01882-JF and recommending appointment of special master. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
October 16, 2009 507 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/16/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 22, 2009 534 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER AUTHORIZING APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/22/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 23, 2009 535 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING EBAY'S MOTION FOR SPECIALLY SET HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND EBAY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/23/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 28, 2009 537 Featured Case ***PLEASE DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR*** ORDER OVERRULING 404 , 436 OBJECTION TO AUGUST 17, 2009 FURTHER ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL TESTIMONY AND TRANSACTIONAL DATA. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/28/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009) Modified on 10/28/2009 (jflc2, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2009 538 Featured Case ORDER OVERRULING 404 , 436 OBJECTION TO AUGUST 17, 2009 FURTHER ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL TESTIMONY AND TRANSACTIONAL DATA. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/28/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 28, 2009 539 Featured Case ORDER (1)AMENDING OCTOBER 20, 2009, ORDER AND (2) GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/28/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009).
November 25, 2009 560 Featured Case ORDER PERMITTING USE OF ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT AND PROJECTOR re 556 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/24/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 25, 2009 561 Featured Case ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFFS' USE OF ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT AND PROJECTOR AT HEARING re 557 . Signed by Judge Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/24/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
December 4, 2009 568 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 544 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S OCTOBER 20, 2009 ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/4/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
March 4, 2010 577 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 333 Motion for Summary Judgment AND DENYING AS MOOT 217 Motion to Certify Class by Judge Jeremy Fogel. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 578 Featured Case JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/4/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
May 25, 2010 607 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 595 eBay, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
July 19, 2010 616 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 608 Motion to Modify Protective Order. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
September 10, 2010 618 Featured Case ORDER (1) DECLINING TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NUMBER 5:10-cv-03825 HRL WITH THE INSTANT CASE AND (2) REQUESTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/10/10. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Michael Malone v. eBay, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Malone
Represented By: Beverly Tse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Farmer
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Van Pelt
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Donohue
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]