Holman et al v. Apple, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs allege that defendant Apple, Inc. tied the iPhone product to other products an services offered by Apple and AT&T Mobility, LLC

Plaintiff: Mark G Morikawa, Lucy Rivello, Dennis V Macasaddu, Vincent Scotti, Paul Holman, Michael G Lee and Timothy P. Smith
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC and Apple, Inc.
3rd Party Defendant: Timothy P. Smith
Movant: Herbert H. Kliegerman
Case Number: 5:2007cv05152
Filed: October 5, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2008 100 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Denying 61 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Granting 70 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Denying 71 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Appointing Interim Lead Counsel and Administratively Closing Cases. All future filings shall continue to be filed in Case No. C 07-05152 JW and to bear the caption: In Re Apple & AT&TM Anti-Trust Litigation. The Clerk shall administratively close cases C 07-05662 JW and C 08-0948 JW . Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/15/08. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2008) Modified docket text to conform to Order on 4/16/2008 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2008 102
FIRST CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed by Vincent Scotti, Dennis V Macasaddu, Mark G Morikawa, Timothy P. Smith, Michael G Lee, Herbert H. Kliegerman, Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello. (Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 5/5/2008) Modified TEXT on 5/6/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2008 103
Letter from Mark C. Rifkin Letter from Mark C. Rifkin to Judge James Ware. (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 5/28/2008)
May 30, 2008 104
MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution Of Its Soon-To-Be-Filed Motion To Compel Arbitration filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2008 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Falk, Donald) (Filed on 5/30/2008)
May 30, 2008 105
Declaration of Daniel A. Sasse in Support of 104 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution Of Its Soon-To-Be-Filed Motion To Compel Arbitration filed byAT&T Mobility, LLC. (Related document(s) 104 ) (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 5/30/2008)
May 30, 2008 106
Proposed Order re 104 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution Of Its Soon-To-Be-Filed Motion To Compel Arbitration by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 5/30/2008)
June 2, 2008 107
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding the Filing of a 109 Revised Consolidated Complaint and Modified 108 Briefing Schedule by Vincent Scotti, Dennis V Macasaddu, Mark G Morikawa, Timothy P. Smith, Michael G Lee, Paul Holman, Herbert H. Kliegerman, Lucy Rivello. (Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 6/2/2008) Modified text on 6/11/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2008 108 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER as Modified by the Court; Setting Further Case Management Conference re 107 Stipulation, 103 Letter. Revised Consolidated Amended Complaint due 6/4/2008 as a separate docket entry in this case. Joint Case Management Statement due 6/10/2008. Interim Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2008 10:00 AM, Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/4/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2008)
June 4, 2008 109
REVISED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC. Filed by Vincent Scotti, Dennis V Macasaddu, Mark G Morikawa, Timothy P. Smith, Michael G Lee, Paul Holman, Herbert H. Kliegerman, Lucy Rivello. (Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 6/4/2008) Modified TEXT on 6/11/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2007 10 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Richard Seeborg for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 10/19/07. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2007 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2008 110
EXHIBITS re 104 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution Of Its Soon-To-Be-Filed Motion To Compel Arbitration -- Exhibit 2 filed byAT&T Mobility, LLC. (Related document(s) 104 ) (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
June 6, 2008 111
EXHIBITS re 104 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution Of Its Soon-To-Be-Filed Motion To Compel Arbitration -- Exhibit 3 filed byAT&T Mobility, LLC. (Related document(s) 104 ) (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
June 10, 2008 112
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Vincent Scotti, Dennis V Macasaddu, Mark G Morikawa, Timothy P. Smith, Michael G Lee, Paul Holman, Herbert H. Kliegerman, Lucy Rivello. (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 6/10/2008)
June 23, 2008 113
Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/23/2008 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 6/23/2008). Motion hearing continued from 9/8/2008 re 104 Motion to 9/12/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/23/2008)
June 26, 2008 114 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 104 Motion to Stay (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2008)
June 27, 2008 115
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2008 09:00 AM. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
June 27, 2008 116
Brief re 115 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed byAT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
June 27, 2008 117
Declaration of NEAL S. BERINHOUT in Support of 115 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed byAT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
June 27, 2008 118
Declaration of KEVIN RANLETT in Support of 115 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed byAT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
June 27, 2008 119
Declaration of CYNTHIA HENNESSY in Support of 115 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed byAT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
October 19, 2007 11
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello 7 8 9 10 (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 10/19/2007) Modified on 10/26/2007, (counsel failed to link to which documents relate to) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2008 120
Declaration of RICHARD A. NAGAREDA in Support of 115 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed byAT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
June 27, 2008 121
Proposed Order re 115 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
June 27, 2008 122
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Revised Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
June 27, 2008 123
Request for Judicial Notice re 122 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Revised Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 122 ) (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
June 27, 2008 124
Proposed Order re 123 Request for Judicial Notice, 122 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Revised Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Apple, Inc.. (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
July 2, 2008 125
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing re 115 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2008)
October 19, 2007 12 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Denying Motion to Relate Case C 06-04457 JW Tucker v. Apple Inc. and C 07-05152 RS Holman et al v. Apple Inc. et. al. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/19/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2007)
October 31, 2007 13
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher St. John Yates for Defendant Apple Inc. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 10/31/2007)
October 20, 2008 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING OF DISCOVERY PLAN. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/20/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 31, 2007 14
STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Apple Inc. and Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' 1 Complaint by Apple, Inc.. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 10/31/2007) Modified text on 11/1/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2007 15
Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 10/31/2007)
November 13, 2008 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Case Management Conference. The Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2008 is VACATED. The Court will, if necessary, reschedule the Case Management Conference following issuance of Judge Seeborgs Discovery Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/13/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
December 12, 2008 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BIFURCATING CLASS AND MERITS DISCOVERY; SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 140 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, 141 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 1/5/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/12/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
October 31, 2007 16
NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 10/31/2007)
January 7, 2009 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ADOPTING THE PARTIES PROPOSEDSCHEDULE FOR CLASS DISCOVERY AND CERTIFICATION re 170 Joint Case Management Statement. The case Management Conference set for 1/12/2009 is VACATED. The Court orders as follows: The Court adopts the parties' proposed schedule for class discovery and certification, as contained in their Joint Statement. Discovery shall be limited to class certification issues at this time. Discovery disputes are referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge. Motion Hearing re Class Certification set for 12/7/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/6/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
November 1, 2007 17
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Allen Sasse Notice of Appearance (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 11/1/2007)
November 2, 2007 18 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Apple Inc. and Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs'Complaint re 14 Stipulation filed by Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/31/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2007)
April 29, 2009 191 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXPERT DISCOVERY re 190 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
May 11, 2009 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER DISPUTE. The parties are instructed to incorporate defendants proposal and enter into a stipulated protective order within 5 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Seeborg (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009) Modified on 5/18/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2009 199 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT CONTINUING MOTION HEARING RE CLASS CERTIFICATION FROM 12/7/2009 TO 3/22/2010 re 197 Stipulation. All briefing on Class Certification shall be completed on or before 3/1/2010. The parties shall m eet and confer and develop a discovery and briefing schedule that would assist the parties in meeting the above deadlines. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
October 5, 2007 1
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Damages, Injunctive Relief and Restitution (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Apple, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611001829). Filed by Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2009 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE A STIPULATION AS TO THE DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 201 Letter, 202 Letter filed by Apple, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, 203 Letter. On or before September 30, 2009, the parties shall f ile such Stipulation for the Court's approval. In the event that the parties are unable to agreed on a schedule, the Court will set at briefing schedule that is consistent with the Civil Local Rules of the Court. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/21/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
October 2, 2009 206 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF CLASS DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 205 Stipulation. Close of Class Discovery due by 10/30/2009. Class Certification Motion due by 12/7/2009. Motion Hearing re Class Certification set for 3/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/2/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
November 20, 2009 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SHORTENING TIME re 213 Motion to Shorten Time, Signed by Judge Seeborg on 11/20/2009 (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
December 14, 2009 228 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 226 WITHDRAWING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING APPLE TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, INCLUDING IPHONE SOURCE CODE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/14/2009. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 15, 2009 230 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 229 WITHDRAWING MOTIONS TO SEAL AND RELATED DOCUMENTS PRELIMINARILY FILED UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING APPLE TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, INCLUDING IPHONE SOURCE CODE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/15/2009. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 16, 2009 231 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadlines Related to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re 227 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
November 8, 2007 23 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Wm. Randolph Smith. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
November 8, 2007 24 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Archis A. Parasharami. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
February 5, 2010 256 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER GRANTING 236 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/5/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
November 8, 2007 25 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher E. Ondeck. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
February 12, 2010 266 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS PAUL HOLMAN AND LUCY RIVELLO'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 257 Motion to Shorten Time (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
November 8, 2007 26 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey H. Howard. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
November 9, 2007 27
MOTION to Relate C07-5662 RMW and C07-5152 JW Cases filed by Apple, Inc.. (Davis, Adrian) (Filed on 11/9/2007) Modified text on 11/14/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2010 281 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Voluntary Dismissal of Count VII, Violation of the Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act, as Against AT&T Mobility LLC, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) re 260 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
November 10, 2007 28
Proposed Order re 27 MOTION to Relate Case by Apple, Inc.. (Davis, Adrian) (Filed on 11/10/2007)
November 12, 2007 29
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 27 MOTION to Relate Case, 28 Proposed Order (Davis, Adrian) (Filed on 11/12/2007)
October 5, 2007 2
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2008. Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2008 02:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2007)
November 16, 2007 30
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 11/16/2007) Modified text on 11/28/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2010 316 Opinion or Order of the Court ****FILED IN ERROR SEE DOCUMENT # 317****ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS PAUL HOLMAN AND LUCY RIVELLO'S MOTION TO COMPEL INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS TO OTHER CLASS COUNSEL by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull denying 252 Motion to Compel (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010) Modified on 3/2/2010 (cl, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2010 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS PAUL HOLMAN AND LUCY RIVELLO's MOTION TO COMPEL INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS TO OTHER CLASS COUNSEL (WITH ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE) re 252 MOTION to Compel Lead Counsel to Produce Documents to Other Class Counsel filed by Paul Holman. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on March 1, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
November 16, 2007 31
Declaration of Daniel A. Sasse in Support of 30 Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A to Sasse Declaration# 2 Exhibit Ex B to Sasse Decl# 3 Exhibit Ex C to Sasse Decl# 4 Exhibit Ex D to Sasse Decl)(Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 11/16/2007) Modified on 11/28/2007,(counsel failed to properly link to motion) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2007 32
[Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' 30 Motion to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 11/16/2007) Modified on 11/28/2007,(counsel failed to properly link to motion) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2007 33
Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC's Administrative 30 Motion to Enlarge Time filed by Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello. (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 11/21/2007) Modified on 12/13/2007,(counsel failed to link to motion) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2007 34 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Relating Cases; Order Consolidating Cases and Setting Case Management Conference re granting 27 Motion to Relate Case. Case No. C 07-05152 JW and Case No. 07-05662 RMW ARE RELATED. The Court sua sponte consolidates the two actions. All future filings shall be filed in C 07-05152 JW and bear the following caption: "In Re Apple & AT&TM Anti-Trust Litigation". The Court vacates all previous deadlines and case schedules. A consolidated Amended Complaint shall be filed within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Case Management Conference set for January 28,2008 at 10:00 AM Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2007) Modified docket text on 12/3/2007 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2007 35 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RELATING CASES. Case No. C 07-05152 JW and Case No. 07-05662 RMW ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/30/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2007)
December 5, 2007 36 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Finding as Moot 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Please see 34 Order on Motion to Relate Case for further specifics. A consolidated Amended Complaint shall be filed within thirty (30) days from the date of the 34 Order. Signed by by Judge James Ware on 12/5/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2007)
December 7, 2007 37
Certificate of Interested Entities DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PERSONS OR ENTITIES (Crowe, David) (Filed on 12/7/2007)
March 26, 2010 383 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL re 276 Redacted Document, filed by Dennis V Macasaddu, Herbert H. Kliegerman, Mark G Morikawa, Vincent Scotti, Timothy P. Smith, Lucy Rivello, Michael G Lee, Paul Holman, Scott Sesso. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on March 26, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
April 1, 2010 384 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER re 316 Order on Motion to Compel,. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/1/10. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
December 20, 2007 38
NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Pendency of Action or Other Proceeding (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 12/20/2007)
December 21, 2007 39
NOTICE of Appearance by Damian Rene Fernandez , M. Van Smith, Joseph Antonelli, Janelle C. Carney, Kevin T. Barnes, Gregg Lander (Fernandez, Damian) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
October 10, 2007 3
Proof Of Service by Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 10/10/2007) Text modified on 10/10/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 26, 2007 40
STIPULATION by Timothy P. Smith. (Antonelli, Giuseppe) (Filed on 12/26/2007)
December 26, 2007 41
Declaration of Damian R. Fernandez and Max Folkenflik filed byTimothy P. Smith regarding ( 40 ). (Antonelli, Giuseppe) (Filed on 12/26/2007) Modified text to add linkage on 1/23/2008 (srm, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2008 42 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Enlarge Time for Plaintiff to File a Consolidated Amended Complaint re 40 Stipulation filed by Timothy P. Smith. Plaintiff shall file the Consolidated Amended Complaint by 1/18/2008. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/2/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2008) Modified docket text re clerical error on 1/15/2008 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 43
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options filed on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Davis, Adrian) (Filed on 1/7/2008)
January 8, 2008 44
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 1/8/2008)
January 8, 2008 45
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello re 44 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b)of discussion of ADR options (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 1/8/2008)
January 9, 2008 46
***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD*** ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2008) Modified on 1/9/2008 (tjs, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2008 47
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC AND COUNSEL (Crowe, David) (Filed on 1/10/2008)
January 10, 2008 48
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Mobility, LLC re: ( 47 ) ADR Certificate (Crowe, David) (Filed on 1/10/2008) Modified text to add linkage on 1/28/2008 (srm, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2010 497 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. In light of this Order, the case is stayed until 12/13/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/10/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
December 9, 2010 499 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING THE SUPREME COURT'S DECISION IN AT&T MOBILITY v. CONCEPTION. Consistent with the Court's Stay Order in In re Apple iPhone 3G Products Liability Litigation, a stay in this case will also simplify the legal issues and conserve judicial resources. The Court notes that the decision to stay the case is consistent with decisions of several courts that have issued stays pending the Supreme Court's final decision in Conception. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference is VACATED and the case is STAYED pending the Supreme Court's final decision in Conception. Within 14 days of the Supreme Court's decision, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report as to its effect on the current dispute. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/9/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
January 18, 2008 49
MOTION to Vacate Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Vacate the Date for Filing A Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Paul Holman. (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 1/18/2008)
October 11, 2007 4
Application for Admission of Attorney Max Folkenflik leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611001865) filed by Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2011 503 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/11. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
January 18, 2008 50
Proposed Order re 49 MOTION to Vacate Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Vacate the Date for Filing A Consolidated Amended Complaint by Paul Holman. (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 1/18/2008)
January 18, 2008 51
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Holman re 50 Proposed Order, 49 MOTION to Vacate Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Vacate the Date for Filing A Consolidated Amended Complaint (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 1/18/2008)
September 2, 2011 528 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 527 Stipulation, filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/2/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
January 18, 2008 52
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 1/18/2008)
January 18, 2008 53
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 52 Case Management Statement (Joint) (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 1/18/2008)
January 22, 2008 54
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Damian Rene Fernandez (Fernandez, Damian) (Filed on 1/22/2008)
January 11, 2012 559 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 556 Stipulation filed by Apple, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 556 Stipulation, 554 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Plaintiffs' Notice of Moti on And Motion For Leave To Seek Reconsideration And/Or In Addition To Amend The Order To Certify For Immediate Interlocutory Appeal; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Supp. Responses due by 1/10/2012. Replies due by 1/23/2012. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/11/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 25, 2008 55 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 49 Motion to Vacate (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2008)
April 24, 2012 569 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Striking Notice of Appearance of The Terrell Law Group. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/24/12. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
January 28, 2008 56
Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/28/2008 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 1/28/2008). Deadline to File Motion due by 2/4/2008. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/28/2008)
January 29, 2008 57 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Following Case Management Conference on 1/28/2008. Deadline to File Motion due by 2/4/2008. Opposition/Cross-Motion deadline due 2/18/2008. Reply deadline due 2/25/2008. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/29/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2008)
February 4, 2008 58
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL AND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL; Declaration by Damian R. Fernandez filed by Vincent Scotti, Dennis V Macasaddu, Mark G Morikawa, Timothy P. Smith, Michael G Lee. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom #5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marc Rifkin email re: Kliegerman Stipulation)(Fernandez, Damian) (Filed on 2/4/2008) Modified on 2/5/2008,(counsel failed to select multiple motions) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2008 59
Letter from Mark C. Rifkin to Judge Ware dated 2/4/08 re: case pending in the Southern District of New York their No. 1:07-cv-8404-PKC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)
October 12, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
February 8, 2008 60
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric H. Gibbs Notice of Appearance and Association of Counsel (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 8, 2008 61
NOTICE OF Motion and Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 2/8/2008) Modified on 2/11/2008,(counsel used incorrect event) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2008 62
Declaration of Eric H. Gibbs In support of 61 Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel filed by Timothy P. Smith. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 2/8/2008) Modified on 2/11/2008 ,(counsel failed to link to motion)(cv, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2008 63
Declaration of Damian R. Fernandez In Support of 61 Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed by Timothy P. Smith. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 2/8/2008) Modified on 2/11/2008,(counsel failed to link to which motion relates to) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2008 64
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 61 , 62 , 63 by Timothy P. Smith (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 2/8/2008) Modified on 2/11/2008,(counsel failed to link to which document relates to) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2008 65
Proposed Order Granting 61 Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel by Timothy P. Smith. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 2/14/2008) Modified on 2/14/2008,(counsel failed to link to motion) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2008 66 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL AND APPOINT LEAD COUNSEL by Judge James Ware finding as moot 58 Motion for Extension of Time to File (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
February 15, 2008 67
MOTION to Relate C08-948 JSW, C07-5152 JW and C07-5662 JW Cases UNDER L.R. 3-12 filed by Herbert H. Kliegerman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 2/15/2008) Modified on 2/19/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/19/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2008 68
STIPULATION re 67 MOTION to Relate C08-948 JSW and C07-5152 JW Cases UNDER L.R. 3-12 by Herbert H. Kliegerman. (Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 2/15/2008) Modified text on 2/19/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2008 69
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Herbert H. Kliegerman re 68 Stipulation, 67 MOTION to Relate Case PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES UNDER L.R. 3-12 (Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
October 15, 2007 6
PROOF OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint ( 1 ), ( 2 ) by Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 10/15/2007) Text modified on 10/16/2007, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2008 70
NOTICE of Cross MOTION and CROSS-MOTION of plaintiff Kligerman to Appoint Wolf Haldenstein in case number C08-948 JSW as Lead Counsel MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT thereof. filed by Herbert H. Kliegerman. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2008 09:00 AM. (Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 3/3/2008) Modified on 3/4/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2008 71
MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION TO APPOINT MAX FOLKENFLIK AS LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND THE PUTATIVE CLASS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 72
Declaration of H. TIM HOFFMAN in Support of 71 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION TO APPOINT MAX FOLKENFLIK AS LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND THE PUTATIVE CLASS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byPaul Holman, Lucy Rivello. (Related document(s) 71 ) (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 73
Declaration of MAX FOLKENFLIK in Support of 71 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION TO APPOINT MAX FOLKENFLIK AS LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND THE PUTATIVE CLASS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byPaul Holman, Lucy Rivello. (Related document(s) 71 ) (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 74
Declaration of RONALD M. SABRAW in Support of 71 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION TO APPOINT MAX FOLKENFLIK AS LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND THE PUTATIVE CLASS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byPaul Holman, Lucy Rivello. (Related document(s) 71 ) (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 75
Declaration of JOSEPH CARUSO in Support of 71 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION TO APPOINT MAX FOLKENFLIK AS LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND THE PUTATIVE CLASS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byPaul Holman, Lucy Rivello. (Related document(s) 71 ) (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 76
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello re 75 Declaration in Support, 74 Declaration in Support, 72 Declaration in Support, 73 Declaration in Support, 71 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION TO APPOINT MAX FOLKENFLIK AS LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND THE PUTATIVE CLASS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 77
AFFIDAVIT re 70 Cross MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION OF PLAINTIFF KLIEGERMAN FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM LEAD CLASS COUNSEL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION . AFFIDAVIT OF ALEXANDER H. SCHMIDT IN SUPPORT OF 70 CROSS-MOTION by Herbert H. Kliegerman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 78
Proposed Order re 70 Cross MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION OF PLAINTIFF KLIEGERMAN FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM LEAD CLASS COUNSEL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION . [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF KLIEGERMAN'S CROSS-MOTION by Herbert H. Kliegerman. (Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
March 3, 2008 79
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Herbert H. Kliegerman re 70 Cross MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION OF PLAINTIFF KLIEGERMAN FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM LEAD CLASS COUNSEL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
October 18, 2007 7
*** FILED IN ERROR *** Please see 8 amended Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello . (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 10/18/2007) Modified text on 10/19/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2008 80
Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Further Support of His 70 Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Class Counsel filed by Herbert H. Kliegerman. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 3/17/2008) Modified on 3/18/2008,(counsel failed to link to motions and used incorrect event) (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2008 81
DECLARATION of MAX FOLKENFLIK REGARDING 71 APPLICATIONS OF FERNANDEZ AND WOLF HALDENSTEIN TO BE APPOINTED AS LEAD COUNSEL filed by Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 3/17/2008) Modified on 3/18/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2008 82
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 81 Declaration in Opposition, MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL AND MOTIONS TO APPOINT FERNANDEZ OR WOLF HALDENSTEIN AS INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL filed byPaul Holman, Lucy Rivello. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 81 ) (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 17, 2008 83
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello re 82 Memorandum in Opposition, 81 Declaration in Opposition, (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 17, 2008 84
Memorandum in Opposition 70 Motions For Appointment Of Interim Lead Counsel Filed By Counsel For Plaintiff Kliegerman And Holman filed by Vincent Scotti, Dennis V Macasaddu, Mark G Morikawa, Timothy P. Smith, Michael G Lee. (Fernandez, Damian) (Filed on 3/17/2008) Modified on 3/18/2008,(counsel failed to link to motions) (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2008 85 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Granting (67) Motion to Relate Case, (68) in case 5:07-cv-05152-JW. C-07-05152 JW In Re Apple & AT&TM Anti-Trust Litigation; C-07-05662 JW Smith et al v. Apple, Inc. Et al and C-08-0948 JSW Kliegerman v. Apple, Inc ARE RELATED. The Clerk shall relate the cases. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/18/2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2008) Modified docket text and docket relationship on 3/18/2008 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2008 86 Opinion or Order of the Court
RELATED CASE ORDER. C-07-05152 JW In Re Apple & AT&TM Anti-Trust Litigation; C-07-05662 JW Smith et al v. Apple, Inc. Et al and C-08-0948 JSW Kliegerman v. Apple, Inc ARE RELATED. The Clerk shall relate the cases. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/18/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2008) Modified on 3/18/2008 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2008 87
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Damian Rene Fernandez Disassociation of Girard Gibbs LLP (Fernandez, Damian) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 24, 2008 88
Reply Memorandum in Further Support of ( 61 ) Plaintiff Kliegerman's Cross-Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Class Counsel filed byHerbert H. Kliegerman. (Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 3/24/2008) Modified text to add linkage on 3/25/2008 (srm, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2008 89
AFFIDAVIT in Support ( 88 ) Reply Affidavit of Alexander H. Schmidt in Further Support of Plaintiff Kliegerman's Cross-Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Class Counsel filed byHerbert H. Kliegerman. (Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 3/24/2008) Modified text to add linkage on 3/25/2008 (srm, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2007 8
Amended Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello. (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 10/18/2007)
March 24, 2008 90
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Herbert H. Kliegerman Declaration of Service for ( 88 ), ( 89 ) Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Plaintiff Kliegerman's Cross-Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Class Counsel; and Reply Affidavit of Alexander H. Schmidt in Further Support of Plaintiff Kliegerman's Cross-Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Class Counsel (Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 3/24/2008) Modified text to add linkage on 3/25/2008 (srm, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2008 91
Reply Memorandum REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MAX FOLKENFLIK AS INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL filed byPaul Holman, Lucy Rivello. (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 3/24/2008)
March 24, 2008 92
Declaration of MAX FOLKENFLIK REPLY DECLARATION OF MAX FOLKENFLIK filed byPaul Holman, Lucy Rivello. (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 3/24/2008)
March 24, 2008 93
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello re 92 Declaration in Support, 91 Reply Memorandum (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 3/24/2008)
March 24, 2008 94
Reply Memorandum in Support of Smith ( 61 ) Plaintiffs' Motion for Lead Counsel filed byVincent Scotti, Dennis V Macasaddu, Mark G Morikawa, Timothy P. Smith, Michael G Lee. (Fernandez, Damian) (Filed on 3/24/2008) Modified text to add linkage on 3/25/2008 (srm, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2008 95
Reply Memorandum CORRECTED REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MAX FOLKENFLIK AS INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL filed byPaul Holman, Lucy Rivello. (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
March 25, 2008 96
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello re 95 Reply Memorandum (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
April 7, 2008 97
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2008 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 4/7/2008) re (70 in 5:07-cv-05152-JW) Cross MOTION to Appoint Wolf Haldenstein Lead Counsel in case number C08-948 JSW and MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION filed by Herbert H. Kliegerman, (61 in 5:07-cv-05152-JW) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Timothy P. Smith, (71 in 5:07-cv-05152-JW) MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION TO APPOINT MAX FOLKENFLIK AS LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND THE PUTATIVE CLASS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Lucy Rivello, Paul Holman. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further order on motion. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/7/2008)
April 9, 2008 98
STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Vincent Scotti, Dennis V Macasaddu, Mark G Morikawa, Timothy P. Smith, Michael G Lee, Herbert H. Kliegerman, Paul Holman, Lucy Rivello. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
April 11, 2008 99 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER re Scheduling Order re 98 Stipulation filed by Dennis V Macasaddu, Herbert H. Kliegerman, Mark G Morikawa, Vincent Scotti, Timothy P. Smith, Lucy Rivello, Michael G Lee, Paul Holman. Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/10/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
October 19, 2007 9
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holman et al v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark G Morikawa
Represented By: M. Van Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Rivello
Represented By: Margaret McGerity
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis V Macasaddu
Represented By: Aaron M. Sheanin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Scotti
Represented By: M. Van Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Holman
Represented By: Max Folkenflik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G Lee
Represented By: M. Van Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy P. Smith
Represented By: Aaron M. Sheanin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Represented By: David Eldon Crowe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Adrian Frank Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Timothy P. Smith
Represented By: Aaron M. Sheanin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Herbert H. Kliegerman
Represented By: Francis M. Gregorek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]