Landmark Screens, LLC v. Morgan, Lewis, & Bockius, LLP et al

Plaintiff: Landmark Screens, LLC
Defendant: Morgan, Lewis, & Bockius, LLP and Thomas D Kohler
 
Case Number: 5:2008cv02581
Filed: May 21, 2008
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1391 Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 24, 2009 104 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING IN CAMERA REVIEW re 99 Stipulation and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/24/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2009)
January 8, 2010 107 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE re 100 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/4/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 15, 2010 108 Featured Case ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART 85 Motion to Compel AND (2) INTERIM ORDER FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. The 1/19/2010 hearing is vacated. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
February 3, 2010 110 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING IN CAMERA REVIEW re 85 Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld as Privileged filed by Landmark Screens, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/3/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
August 13, 2010 138 Featured Case ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 128 Defendants' Motion to Compel and (2) GRANTING 130 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Selected Documents under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 08/13/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 139 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE SEPTEMBER 10, 2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO SEPTEMBER 17, 2010 (approving 137 ). The Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2010 is CONTINUED to 9/17/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/13/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 27, 2010 143 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE FOR PURPOSE OF COMPLETING PREVIOUSLY NOTICED DEPOSITIONS (approving 142 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/27/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
September 10, 2010 152 Featured Case ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE 144 LANDMARK'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/10/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 14, 2010 155 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 119 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY; AND GRANTING 113 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/14/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
October 21, 2010 175 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 146 Motion to Determine Sufficiency of RFA Responses and DENYING 149 Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/21/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 25, 2010 176 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND OCTOBER 21, 2010 FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE (approving 174 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/25/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
November 23, 2010 186 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND DEADLINE TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS (granting 183 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/23/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
December 2, 2010 188 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND NOVEMBER 23, 2010 FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE (approving 187 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/2/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
January 5, 2011 197 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE JANUARY 21, 2011 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO JANUARY 28, 2011 (approving 196 ). The Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2011 is CONTINUED to 1/28/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/5/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
January 25, 2011 203 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 144 LANDMARK'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
February 7, 2011 206 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 178 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/7/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
November 28, 2012 227 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REMANDED CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/27/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/3/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/28/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
January 2, 2013 231 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/2/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
January 20, 2009 42 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 33 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/20/09.(jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
February 2, 2009 44 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (approving docket no. 43 ). The Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2009 is CONTINUED to 2/27/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/30/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
February 2, 2009 45 Featured Case *** DUPLICATE OF DOCKET # 44 . *** STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (approving docket no. 43 ). The Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2009 is CONTINUED to 2/27/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/30/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009) Modified on 2/3/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2009 52 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 51 Stipulation filed by Landmark Screens, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/13/09. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
October 7, 2009 78 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 58 MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 21, 2009 81 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART 62 Motion to Compel and INTERIM ORDER FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW OF DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
November 16, 2009 84 Featured Case ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/16/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
December 15, 2009 94 Featured Case ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/15/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 15, 2009 95 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING IN CAMERA REVIEW re 62 MOTION to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/15/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 21, 2009 97 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 96 Stipulation filed by Thomas D Kohler, Morgan, Lewis, & Bockius, LLP. Hearing on 85 Motion to Compel continued to 1/19/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/21/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 23, 2009 99 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER AS AMENDED BY THE COURT re 98 Stipulation filed by Thomas D Kohler, Morgan, Lewis, & Bockius, LLP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/23/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Landmark Screens, LLC v. Morgan, Lewis, & Bockius, LLP et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Screens, LLC
Represented By: Clark S. Stone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan, Lewis, & Bockius, LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas D Kohler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]