Viacom International Inc. et al v. YouTube, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Viacom International Inc. and The Football Association Premier League Limited
Defendant: YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC and Google Inc.
3rd Party Plaintiff: BayTSP, Inc
 
Case Number: 5:2008mc80211
Filed: October 20, 2008
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
 
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2009 37 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS re 36 Stipulation filed by YouTube, LLC, Google Inc., YouTube, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on September 28, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 14, 2009 36 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS by Google Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Evans, Eric) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
July 27, 2009 35 Featured Case STIPULATED PRETRIAL PROTECTIVE ORDER re 34 Brief filed by YouTube, LLC, Google Inc., YouTube, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on July 27, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2009)
July 24, 2009 34 Brief Joint Brief Regarding Court's Authority to Issue Protective Order and [Proposed] Order (Exhibit A) filed byGoogle Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Evans, Eric) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 10, 2009 33 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS re 32 Stipulation filed by YouTube, LLC, Google Inc., YouTube, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on July 9, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 9, 2009 32 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS by Google Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Evans, Eric) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 2, 2009 31 Featured Case ORDER RE PARTIES' PROPOSED FORM OF PROTECTIVE ORDER re 30 Stipulation filed by YouTube, LLC, Google Inc., YouTube, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on July 2, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
June 30, 2009 30 STIPULATION [PROPOSED] STIPULATED PRE-TRIAL PROTECTIVE ORDER by Google Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Evans, Eric) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 22, 2009 29 Featured Case ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 28 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/19/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 11, 2009 28 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Richard B. Kendall for Non-Party BayTSP, Inc. (Kendall, Richard) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
April 24, 2009 27 Featured Case ORDER OVERRULING 20 OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER DATED JANUARY 14, 2009. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/24/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
February 27, 2009 26 EXHIBITS A to 25 C. Augustine Rakow Decl. filed byBayTSP, Inc. (Rakow, Christopher) (Filed on 2/27/2009) Modified on 3/2/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2009 25 Declaration of C. Augustine Rakow in support of 24 Reply filed byBayTSP, Inc. (Rakow, Christopher) (Filed on 2/27/2009) Modified on 3/2/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2009 24 Reply in support to BAYTSP's Objection filed byBayTSP, Inc. (Rakow, Christopher) (Filed on 2/27/2009) Modified on 3/2/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2009 23 RESPONSE to re 20 Objection Opposition to BayTSP's Objection to January 14, 2009 Order re YouTube Subpoena by Google Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 9, 2009 22 Featured Case ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING RE 20 OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/9/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
January 29, 2009 21 Declaration of C. Augustine Rakow in Support of 20 Objection to the January 14, 2009 Order re YouTube Subpoena filed byBayTSP, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 20 ) (Rakow, Christopher) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 20 OBJECTIONS to the 19 January 14, 2009 Order re YouTube Subpoena by BayTSP, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hemminger, Steven) (Filed on 1/29/2009) Modified on 1/30/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2009 19 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT YOUTUBE'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 7 Motion to Compel (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
December 17, 2008 18 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 9, 2008, before Judge Patricia Trumbull. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jana Ridenour, Telephone number (408) 390-7935. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2009. (mz, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 9, 2008 17 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/9/2008 before Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull; Matter Submitted. (Date Filed: 12/9/2008) re 1 MOTION to Compel filed by YouTube, LLC, Google Inc., YouTube, Inc., 7 Amended MOTION to Compel Renotice of Motion and Motion to Compel filed by YouTube, LLC, Google Inc., YouTube, Inc. (Court Reporter Jana Ridenour.)(cm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/9/2008)
December 5, 2008 16 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 4, 2008 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC re 14 Proposed Order, 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611004310.) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
December 4, 2008 14 Proposed Order re 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611004310.) by Google Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
December 4, 2008 13 MOTION for Attorney John P. Mancini for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611004310.) filed by Google Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
November 25, 2008 12 Reply Memorandum YouTube's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed byGoogle Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 19, 2008 11 EXHIBITS re 10 Declaration in Support,, Corrected Exhibit C to the Declaration of Steven D. Hemminger in Support of Response of Nonparty BayTSP to Defendant YouTubes' Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed byBayTSP, Inc. (Related document(s) 10 ) (Hemminger, Steven) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 18, 2008 10 Declaration of Steven D. Hemminger in Support of 9 Response of NonParty BayTSP to Defendant YouTube's Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed byBayTSP, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y)(Related document(s) 9 ) (Hemminger, Steven) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 18, 2008 9 Response of Non-Party BayTSP to Defendant YouTube's Motion to Compel Production of Documents byBayTSP, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hemminger, Steven) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 4, 2008 8 Renotice motion hearing Second Renotice of Motion to Compel BayTSP filed byGoogle Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom #5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Evans, Eric) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
October 28, 2008 7 Amended MOTION to Compel Renotice of Motion and Motion to Compel filed by Google Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom #5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Evans, Eric) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 21, 2008 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC re 5 Certificate of Service, 3 Declaration in Support, 2 Declaration in Support, 4 Proposed Order Corrected Certificate of Service (Kramer, David) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 20, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 20, 2008 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC re 1 MOTION to Compel, 3 Declaration in Support, 2 Declaration in Support, 4 Proposed Order (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008) (gm, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2008 4 Proposed Order re 1 MOTION to Compel by Google Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008) (gm, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2008 3 Declaration of Caroline E. Wilson in Support of 1 MOTION to Compel filed byGoogle Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Related document(s) 1 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2009: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21) (gm, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2008 2 Declaration of Brandon Baum in Support of 1 MOTION to Compel filed byGoogle Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Related document(s) 1 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2009: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P) (gm, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2008 1 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Google Inc., YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2008 09:00 AM. Filing Fee Paid $39.00; Receipt #54611004066.(gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008) . (gm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Viacom International Inc. et al v. YouTube, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viacom International Inc.
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Football Association Premier League Limited
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Elizabeth Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Represented By: Caroline Elizabeth Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Elizabeth Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: BayTSP, Inc
Represented By: Steven D. Hemminger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]