Elan Microelectronics Corporation v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Elan Microelectronics Corporation
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2009cv01531
Filed: April 7, 2009
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2012 448 NOTICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation / Elan Microelectronics Corp.'s Notice of Compliance with Paragraph 19 of Amended Stipulated Protective Order (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 10, 2012 447 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. [NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PARAGRAPH 19(B) OF THE PROTECTIVE ORDER [DKT. NO. 64]] (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 10, 2012 446 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 445 Stipulation (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 9, 2012 445 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
March 2, 2012 444 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
January 9, 2012 443 Featured Case ORDER granting 442 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 6, 2012 442 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Apple, Inc., Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Responses due by 1/20/2012. Replies due by 1/27/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
December 20, 2011 441 Featured Case FOURTH STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES TO ALLOW FOR FINALIZATION OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/20/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 19, 2011 440 STIPULATION (FOURTH) AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES TO ALLOW FOR FINALIZATION OF SETTLEMENT by Apple, Inc., Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 2, 2011 439 NOTICE of Change of Address by Douglas E. Lumish (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
November 29, 2011 438 Featured Case THIRD STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES TO ALLOW FOR FINALIZATION OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/29/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 28, 2011 437 STIPULATION (THIRD) AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES TO ALLOW FOR FINALIZATION OF SETTLEMENT by Apple, Inc., Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
October 24, 2011 436 Featured Case SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 435 TO EXTEND DEADLINES TO ALLOW FOR FINALIZATION OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/24/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 24, 2011 435 STIPULATION (Second) and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadlines to Allow for Finalization of Settlement by Apple, Inc., Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
September 28, 2011 434 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES TO ALLOW FOR FINALIZATION OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/28/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 23, 2011 433 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES TO ALLOW FOR FINALIZATION OF SETTLEMENT by Apple, Inc., Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 21, 2011 432 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held on 9/21/2011 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (Recording #Not Reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2011)
September 14, 2011 431 Declaration of NATHAN GREENBLATT in Support of 430 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INDEFINITENESS OF CLAIMS 24, 26 AND 30 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,825,352 filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 430 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 14, 2011 430 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INDEFINITENESS OF CLAIMS 24, 26 AND 30 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,825,352 filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 9/29/2011. Replies due by 10/6/2011. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 14, 2011 429 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 426 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF ELAN'S '352 PATENT BY APPLE'S CURRENT PRODUCTS AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 14, 2011 428 EXHIBITS 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7 AND 8 TO THE DECLARATION OF DR. RAVIN BALAKRISHNAN IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 6, # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 8)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 14, 2011 427 Declaration of DEREK C. WALTER IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF ELAN'S '352 PATENT BY APPLE'S CURRENT PRODUCTS filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 14)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 14, 2011 426 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF ELAN'S '352 PATENT BY APPLE'S CURRENT PRODUCTS AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 12, 2011 425 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING (1) DISPOSITIVE MOTION; (2) EXPERT REPORT; AND (3) TRIAL SCHEDULING by Apple, Inc., Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 9, 2011 424 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER RE DEFENDANT ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 9, 2011. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 423 Featured Case ORDER RE DEFENDANT ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 357 Motion to Compel; granting 341 Motion to Compel (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 422 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt in Support of 421 Response to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Objections to Non-Dispositive Ruling of Magistrate Judge 406 filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 421 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 421 Response re 406 Objection APPLE INC.'S RESPONSE TO ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S OBJECTIONS TO NON-DISPOSITIVE RULING OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE byApple, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 2, 2011 420 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY M. SCOTT STEVENS PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 419 Notice of Settlement and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 9/21/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/02/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 418 Minute Entry: TelephonicScheduling Conference held on 9/1/11 before Magistrate Judge Spero. (Recording #Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/2/2011)
September 1, 2011 416 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas E. Lumish (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 31, 2011 415 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING TIME SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference re-set for 9/1/2011 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 30, 2011 414 CLERKS NOTICE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 30, 2011 413 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/30/2011 before Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 8/30/2011) re 341 MOTION to Compel Discovery Related to Apple iOS Applications for the Accused Products filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation, 357 MOTION to Compel Discovery on Various Issues filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. The Court takes matters under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/30/2011)
August 30, 2011 412 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER RE BRIEFING ON OBJECTION TO NON-DISPOSITIVE RULING OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/30/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 26, 2011 411 Featured Case ORDER RE BRIEFING ON OBJECTION TO NON-DISPOSITIVE RULING OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/26/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 24, 2011 410 EXHIBITS re 401 Declaration in Support, /Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Discovery on Various Issues (Redacted) filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Related document(s) 401 ) (Bu, Jane) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 24, 2011 409 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 405 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 1 and 3 to the Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Discovery on Various Issues by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3)(Bu, Jane) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 22, 2011 408 Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of 406 Objection filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 406 ) (Bu, Jane) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 407 Proposed Order re 406 Objection by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Bu, Jane) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 406 OBJECTIONS to re 382 Order on Motion to Compel by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1)(Bu, Jane) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 19, 2011 405 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 399 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 18, 2011 404 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt in Support of 399 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Papers in Support of Its Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery on Various Issues filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 399 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 17, 2011 403 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Elan's '352 Patent by Apple's Current Products (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 16, 2011 402 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation re 401 Declaration in Support, Exhibits 1 and 3 (Bu, Jane) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 16, 2011 401 Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of 400 Reply to Opposition/Response to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Discovery on Various Issues filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 400 ) (Bu, Jane) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 16, 2011 400 REPLY (re 357 MOTION to Compel Discovery on Various Issues ) filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Bu, Jane) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 16, 2011 399 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Papers in Support of Its Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery on Various Issues filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 12, 2011 398 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 394 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibits 1-3 to the Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of Elan's Reply to Motion to Compel Discovery Related to Apple iOS Applications for the Accused Products by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3 - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Part 3)(Bu, Jane) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 12, 2011 397 EXHIBITS re 384 Declaration in Support, REDACTED EXHIBIT 9 to the Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt In Support of Apple's Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Discovery on Various Issues filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 384 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 12, 2011 396 RESPONSE (re 357 MOTION to Compel Discovery on Various Issues ) REDACTED filed byApple, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 12, 2011 395 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 392 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, EXHIBITS 8-10 to the Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt In Support of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Discovery on Various Issues by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9, # 2 Exhibit 10)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 12, 2011 394 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PAPERS IN SUPPORT OF ITS REPLY TO MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 387 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 12, 2011 393 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 392 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Discovery on Various Issues by Apple, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 12, 2011 392 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLE, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL APPLE, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY ON VARIOUS ISSUES by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 383 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 11, 2011 391 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt in Support of 387 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Papers in Support of Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Reply to Motion to Compel Discovery Related to Apple iOS Applications for the Accused Products filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 387 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 9, 2011 390 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation re 389 Declaration in Support, Exhibits 1-3 (Bu, Jane) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 389 Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of 388 Reply to Opposition/Response to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Discovery Related to Apple iOS Applications for the Accused Products filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Related document(s) 388 ) (Bu, Jane) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 388 REPLY (re 341 MOTION to Compel Discovery Related to Apple iOS Applications for the Accused Products ) filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Bu, Jane) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 387 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Papers in Support of Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Reply to Motion to Compel Discovery Related to Apple iOS Applications for the Accused Products filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 386 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 341 MOTION to Compel Discovery Related to Apple iOS Applications for the Accused Products. 8/23/2011 Motion Hearing continued to 8/30/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 385 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 384 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt in Support of Apple's Opposition to Elan Microelectronic Corporation's Motion to Compel Discovery on Various Issues 357 filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 383 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Discovery on Various Issues and Exhibits thereto filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 8, 2011 382 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART APPLE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part 313 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 8, 2011 381 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/4/11, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar Bartlett, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_bartlett@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2011. (Bartlett, Sahar) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 5, 2011 380 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/5/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 4, 2011 379 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/4/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 8/4/2011), Further Case Management Conference held on 8/4/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 8/4/2011). (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 378 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 377 EXHIBITS 2-8 to the Declaration of Dr. Ravin Balakrishnan In Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 6, # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 8)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 376 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLE, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS OPPOSITION TO ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RELATED TO APPLE iOS APPLICATIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 367 Motion for Leave to File (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 375 Declaration of Derek C. Walter In Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Elan's '352 Patent by Apple's Current Products filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 14)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 374 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Elan's '352 Patent by Apple's Current Products and Declaration and Exhibits Thereto filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 3, 2011 373 EXHIBITS re 358 Declaration in Support, /Exhibits F-G to the Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Discovery on Various Issues (Redacted) filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 358 ) (Bu, Jane) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 372 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 370 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits F-G to the Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Discovery on Various Issues by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G)(Bu, Jane) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 2, 2011 371 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of 369 Opposition/Response to Motion to Compel Discovery Related to Apple iOS Applications for the Accused Products filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 369 ) (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 2, 2011 370 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 359 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 2, 2011 369 RESPONSE (re 341 MOTION to Compel Discovery Related to Apple iOS Applications for the Accused Products ) filed byApple, Inc.. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 2, 2011 368 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of 367 MOTION for Leave to File Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Discovery Related to Apple iOS Applications for the Accused Products on August 2, 2011 filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 367 ) (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 2, 2011 367 MOTION for Leave to File Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Discovery Related to Apple iOS Applications for the Accused Products on August 2, 2011 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 1, 2011 366 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
August 1, 2011 365 MOTION Permission to bring certain equipment and materials into the federal courthouse / Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Bring into the Federal Courthouse Certain Equipment and Materials for Purposes of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement Hearing filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Responses due by 8/15/2011. Replies due by 8/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
August 1, 2011 364 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt in Support of 359 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Papers in Support of Its Motion to Compel Discovery on Various Issues filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 359 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
July 29, 2011 363 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 356 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Exhibits D-G to the Declaration of P. Rathinasamy in Support of Elan's Unopposed Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G)(Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 29, 2011 362 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 361 CONTINUING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/29/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 28, 2011 361 STIPULATION / Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Joint Case Management Conference Statement by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 26, 2011 360 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 359 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Papers in Support of Its Motion to Compel Discovery on Various Issues filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 358 Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of 357 MOTION to Compel Discovery on Various Issues filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 357 ) (Bu, Jane) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 357 MOTION to Compel Discovery on Various Issues filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/9/2011. Replies due by 8/16/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bu, Jane) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 356 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 355 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 350 Motion Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 25, 2011 354 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation re 350 MOTION Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Pat. L.R. 3-6 / Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Pat. L.R. 3-6 (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 25, 2011 353 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 354 . *** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation re 350 MOTION Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Pat. L.R. 3-6 / Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Pat. L.R. 3-6 (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/25/2011) Modified on 7/26/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2011 352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal / Plaintiff Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits D-G of the Declaration of Palani P. Rathinasamy in Support of Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Unopposed Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Pat. L.R. 3-6 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 351 Declaration of Palani P. Rathinasamy in Support of 350 MOTION Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Pat. L.R. 3-6 / Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Pat. L.R. 3-6 filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 350 ) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 350 MOTION Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Pat. L.R. 3-6 / Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Pat. L.R. 3-6 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/9/2011. Replies due by 8/16/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 349 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY FRANG G. SMITH PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 21, 2011 348 REPLY (re 212 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent 5,875,352 [Public Version] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent 5,875,352 [Public Version] ) / Elan's Response to Apple's Surreply re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 18, 2011 346 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 343 Motion to Shorten Time (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 18, 2011 345 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of 344 Opposition/Response to Motion to Shorten Time for Elan's Motion to Compel Discovery Related to the Apple iOS Applications for the Accused Products filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 344 ) (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 18, 2011 344 RESPONSE (re 343 MOTION to Shorten Time for Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Discovery Related to Apple iOS Applications for the Accused Products ) filed byApple, Inc.. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 15, 2011 343 MOTION to Shorten Time for Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Discovery Related to Apple iOS Applications for the Accused Products filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bu, Jane) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 342 Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of 341 MOTION to Compel Discovery Related to Apple iOS Applications for the Accused Products filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 341 ) (Bu, Jane) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 341 MOTION to Compel Discovery Related to Apple iOS Applications for the Accused Products filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 7/29/2011. Replies due by 8/5/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bu, Jane) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 13, 2011 347 Application for Frank G. Smith leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611062082.)filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 12, 2011 340 NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew Douglas Powers (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 11, 2011 339 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 335 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS 2, 4, 8, 11-14, 16-21, 23, 25-27, 34-35 to the Declaration of Derek Walter In Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel (1) Discovery Relating to U.S. Sales; (2) Documents Improperly Withheld on the Basis of Privilege; and (3) Inventor Depositions by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 11, # 4 Exhibit 12, # 5 Exhibit 13, # 6 Exhibit 14, # 7 Exhibit 14, # 8 Exhibit 14, # 9 Exhibit 14, # 10 Exhibit 14, # 11 Exhibit 14, # 12 Exhibit 14, # 13 Exhibit 14, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 16, # 22 Exhibit 16, # 23 Exhibit 16, # 24 Exhibit 16, # 25 Exhibit 16, # 26 Exhibit 17, # 27 Exhibit 18, # 28 Exhibit 18, # 29 Exhibit 18, # 30 Exhibit 18, # 31 Exhibit 19, # 32 Exhibit 20, # 33 Exhibit 21, # 34 Exhibit 21, # 35 Exhibit 23, # 36 Exhibit 25, # 37 Exhibit 26, # 38 Exhibit 27, # 39 Exhibit 34, # 40 Exhibit 35)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 338 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 337 Featured Case ORDER PERMITTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING AND CONTINUING HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/11/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 336 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 335 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel (1) Discovery Relating to Elan's U.S. Sales; (2) Documents Improperly WIthheld on the Basis of Privilege; and (3) Inventor Depositions [REDACTED] by Apple, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 335 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT APPLE, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 224 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 8, 2011 334 RESPONSE (re 330 MOTION for Leave to File [APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT A SURREPLY MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT 5,825,352] MOTION for Leave to File [APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT A SURREPLY MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT 5,825,352] ) filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 7, 2011 333 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 332 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt in Support of 323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Supplemental Declaration of Robert Dezmelyk in Support of Elan's Reply to Apple's Opposition to Elan's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of United States Pate nt No. 5,825,352 And Supporting Documents filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 323 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 331 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT APPLE, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL APPLE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND RELATED DOCUMENTS re 261 Declaration in Support, filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 7, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011) Modified on 7/11/2011 (psglc1, COURT STAFF). ****FILED IN ERROR, DUPLICATE OF DOCKET NO. 335************
July 6, 2011 330 MOTION for Leave to File [APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT A SURREPLY MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT 5,825,352] filed by Apple, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 329 Declaration of NATHAN GREENBLATT in Support of 328 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [APPLE INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL APPLE INC.'S SURREPLY TO ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORP.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [APPLE INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL APPLE INC.'S SURREPLY TO ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORP.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT] filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 328 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 328 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [APPLE INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL APPLE INC.'S SURREPLY TO ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORP.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT] filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 327 Letter from Jared Bobrow Regarding July 5, 2011 Hearing on Apple's Motion to Compel and Elan's Supplemental Privilege Logs. (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 326 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Ryan Lubeck (Lubeck, Christopher) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 325 Letter from Jane Bu regarding July 5, 2011 Hearing on Apple's Motion to Compel and Supplemental Exhibits in Support of Elan's Opposition to Motion to Compel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Bu, Jane) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 5, 2011 324 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Supplemental Declaration of Robert Dezmelyk in Support of Elan's Reply to Apple's Opposition to Elan's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of United States Patent No. 5,825,352 and Supporting Documents filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 322 Declaration of Palani P. Rathinasamy in Support of Plaintiff Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Reply to Apple, Inc.'s Opposition to Elan's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 321 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/5/2011 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 7/5/2011) re 313 MOTION to Compel Elan Employee Depositions in N.D. Cal filed by Apple, Inc., 224 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple, Inc. The Court takes matters under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/5/2011)
July 1, 2011 320 Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of 319 Opposition/Response to Motion to Compel Elan Witness Depositions in the Northern District of California filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 319 ) (Bu, Jane) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
July 1, 2011 319 RESPONSE (re 313 MOTION to Compel Elan Employee Depositions in N.D. Cal ) filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 29, 2011 318 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt in Support of 291 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Its Reply to Apple, Inc.'s Opposition to Elan's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement and Supporting Documents filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 291 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/29/2011)
June 29, 2011 317 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT APPLE, INC.'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 315 Motion to Shorten Time (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2011)
June 28, 2011 316 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of 315 MOTION to Shorten Time for Apple's Motion to Compel Elan Employee Depositions in N.D. Cal. filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 315 ) (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 315 MOTION to Shorten Time for Apple's Motion to Compel Elan Employee Depositions in N.D. Cal. filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 314 Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta in Support of 313 MOTION to Compel Elan Employee Depositions in N.D. Cal filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 313 ) (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 313 MOTION to Compel Elan Employee Depositions in N.D. Cal filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 7/12/2011. Replies due by 7/19/2011. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 312 Declaration of Jennifer Liu in Support of 305 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel and Exh B to supporting Walter Declaration filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Related document(s) 305 ) (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 311 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Marie Capoccia (Capoccia, Rachel) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 310 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 311 . *** NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Marie Capoccia (Capoccia, Rachel) (Filed on 6/28/2011) Modified on 6/29/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2011 309 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion / Notice of Withdrawal of Elan Microelectronics Corp.'s Motion to Compel Apple to Supplement its Response to Elan's Interrogatory No. 13 (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 22, 2011 308 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/21/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 21, 2011 307 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 306 Declaration in Support, 305 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel and Exh B to supporting Walter Declaration (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 306 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of Apple's Reply to Elan's Opposition to Motion to Compel filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 305 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel and Exh B to supporting Walter Declaration filed by Apple, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 304 STIPULATION / Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Modifying Case Management Scheduling Order by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 301 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF DOUGLAS E. LUMISH AS COUNSEL FOR APPLE, INC. by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 20, 2011 300 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 7/5/2011. Replies due by 7/11/2011. (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 17, 2011 299 EXHIBITS re 288 Declaration in Support, /Exhibits 9, 10, and 11 to the Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of Elan Microelectroncis Corporation's Opposition to Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Compel (Public Versions) filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10, # 2 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) 288 ) (Bu, Jane) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 298 RESPONSE (re 224 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) /Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Opposition to Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Compel (Public Version) filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 297 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 289 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibits 1, 5-6, 9-11 to the Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of Elan Microelectroncis Corporation's Opposition to Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Compel by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 9, # 4 Exhibit 10, # 5 Exhibit 11)(Bu, Jane) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 296 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 289 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Opposition to Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Compel by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 295 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S UNOPPOSED CIV L.R. 7-11 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF PAGE LIMIT. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 16, 2011 294 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 293 Declaration of Jennifer Liu in Support of Plaintiff Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Reply to Apple, Inc.'s Opposition to Elan's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit N, # 10 Exhibit O)(Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 292 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages /Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Unopposed Civ L.R. 7-11 Administrative Motion for Enlargement of Page Limit filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 291 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Its Reply to Apple, Inc.'s Opposition to Elan's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement and Supporting Documents filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 15, 2011 290 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation (Bu, Jane) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 15, 2011 289 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL ELAN'S OPPOSITION TO APPLE, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 287 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 14, 2011 288 Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Opposition to Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Compel filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 12)(Bu, Jane) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 287 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Opposition to Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Compel and Supporting Documents filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Bu, Jane) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 286 REPLY (re 209 MOTION to Compel Apple to Supplement Its Response to Elan's Interrogatory No. 13 ) / Elan Microelectronics Corporations Reply to Apples Opposition to Elans Motion to Compel Apple to Supplement Its Response to Elans Interrogatory No. 13 filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 285 Featured Case ORDER STIPULATED REQUEST TO PERMIT THE SUBMISSION OF APPLE SOURCE CODE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/14/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 284 STIPULATION re 212 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent 5,875,352 [Public Version] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent 5,875,352 [Public Version] Stipulated Request to Permit The Submission of Apple Source Code Under Seal and [Proposed] Order by Apple, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 13, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated*** Release of Transcript Restriction date of 09/27/2010 Date Terminated 130 Transcript. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 10, 2011 283 EXHIBITS re 236 Declaration in Support, of Apple's Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corp.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,825,352 (EXHIBIT D - PUBLIC VERSION) filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 282 Declaration of Ravin Balakrishnan in Support of 281 Opposition/Response to Motion, for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,825,352 (PUBLIC VERSION) filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 281 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 281 RESPONSE (re 212 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent 5,875,352 [Public Version] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent 5,875,352 [Public Version] ) [OPPOSITION - PUBLIC VERSION] filed byApple, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 280 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 277 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A, D, G, H & L to the Declaration of Derek Walter in Support of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corp.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,825,352 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit L)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 279 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 277 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Ravin Balakrishnan In Support of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corp.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,825,352 by Apple, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 278 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 277 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corp.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,825,352 by Apple, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 277 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 234 APPLE INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL APPLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORP.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 9, 2011 276 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 9, 2011 275 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation re 262 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of Palani P. Rathinasamy in Support of Plaintiff Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Apple to Supplement Its Response to Elan's Interrogatory No. 13 (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 9, 2011 274 EXHIBITS re 259 Declaration in Support, Exhibits 1 & 2 to the Declaration of Derek Walter In Support of Apple Inc.'s Response to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Apple to Supplement Its Response to Elan's Interrogatory No. 13 (PUBLIC VERSION) filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 259 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 9, 2011 273 RESPONSE (re 209 MOTION to Compel Apple to Supplement Its Response to Elan's Interrogatory No. 13 ) PUBLIC VERSION filed byApple, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 9, 2011 272 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 267 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibits 1 & 2 to the Declaration of Derek Walter In Support of Apple Inc.'s Response to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Apple to Supplement Its Response to Elan's Interrogatory No. 13 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 9, 2011 271 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 267 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Apple Inc.'s Response to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Apple to Supplement Its Response to Elan's Interrogatory No. 13 by Apple, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 9, 2011 270 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt in Support of 262 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of Palani P. Rathinasamy in Support of Plaintiff Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Apple to Supplement Its Response to Elan's Interrogatory No. 13 filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 262 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 8, 2011 269 Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support of 268 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply / Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing of Elan's Reply Brief in Support of Elan's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 268 ) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 268 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply / Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing of Elan's Reply Brief in Support of Elan's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 267 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLE, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL APPLE, INC.'S RESPONSE TO ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL APPLE, INC. TO SUPPLEMENT ITS RESPONSE TO ELAN'S INTERROGATORY NO. 13 by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 266 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART PLAINTIFF ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 249 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 265 EXHIBITS re 241 Declaration in Support EXHIBIT 5 to the Declaration of Derek Walter In Support of Apple's Opposition to Elan's Motion to Compel Apple to Produce Testing Tool (PUBLIC VERSION) filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 241 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 264 Declaration of Adrian Percer in Support of 263 Opposition/Response to Motion, Apple's Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Apple to Produce Testing Tool (PUBLIC VERSION) filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 263 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 263 RESPONSE (re 249 MOTION to Compel Apple, Inc. to Produce Testing Tool (Public Version) ) Apple's Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Apple to Produce Testing Tool filed byApple, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 262 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of Palani P. Rathinasamy in Support of Plaintiff Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Apple to Supplement Its Response to Elan's Interrogatory No. 13 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 7, 2011 261 Declaration of Jennifer Liu in Support of 224 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Compel and Related Documents filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 224 ) (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 260 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE INC.'S RESPONSE TO ELAN MICROELECTRONIC CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL APPLE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS RESPONSE TO ELAN'S INTERROGATORY NO. 13 AND EXHIBITS 1 AND 2 TO THE DECLARATION OF DEREK WA (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 259 Declaration of Derek Walter IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.'S RESPONSE TO ELAN MICROELECTRONIC CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL APPLE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS RESPONSE TO ELAN'S INTERROGATORY NO. 13 filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 and 2)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 258 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt in Support of 257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE INC.'S RESPONSE TO ELAN MICROELECTRONIC CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL APPLE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS RESPONSE TO ELAN'S INTERROGATORY NO. 13 AND EXHIBITS 1 AND 2 TO THE DECLARATION OF DEREK WA filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 257 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPLE INC.'S RESPONSE TO ELAN MICROELECTRONIC CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL APPLE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS RESPONSE TO ELAN'S INTERROGATORY NO. 13 AND EXHIBITS 1 AND 2 TO THE DECLARATION OF DEREK WALTER IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 256 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/7/2011 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 6/7/2011) re 249 MOTION to Compel Apple, Inc. to Produce Testing Tool (Public Version) filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. The Court takes matter under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter Gina Galvan Colin.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 255 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO HEAR THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN CONJUNCTIOIN WITH ELAN'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/7/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 254 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 239 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Palani P. Rathinasamy in Support of Plaintiff Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Apple, Inc. to Produce Testing Tool by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Exhibit G, # 6 Exhibit H, # 7 Exhibit I, # 8 Exhibit J, # 9 Exhibit K, # 10 Exhibit L, # 11 Exhibit M, # 12 Exhibit N, # 13 Exhibit O, # 14 Exhibit P)(Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 253 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 239 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support of Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Apple, Inc. to Produce Testing Tool by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 252 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 239 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Apple, Inc. to Produce Testing Tool by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 251 Declaration of Palani P. Rathinasamy in Support of 249 MOTION to Compel Apple, Inc. to Produce Testing Tool (Public Version) filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) 249 ) (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 250 Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support of 249 MOTION to Compel Apple, Inc. to Produce Testing Tool (Public Version) filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Related document(s) 249 ) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 249 MOTION to Compel Apple, Inc. to Produce Testing Tool (Public Version) filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 248 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Hear the Further Case Management Conference in Conjunction with Elan's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Apple, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 6, 2011 247 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 243 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3-13 to the Declaration of Derek Walter in Support of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corp.'s Motion to Compel Apple Inc. to Produce Testing Tool by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 10, # 8 Exhibit 11, # 9 Exhibit 12, # 10 Exhibit 13)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 246 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 243 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal The Declaration of Wayne Westerman in Support of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corp.'s Motion to Compel Apple Inc. to Produce Testing Tool by Apple, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 245 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 243 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal The Declaration of Adrian Percer in Support of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corp.'s Motion to Compel Apple Inc. to Produce Testing Tool by Apple, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 244 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 243 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corp.'s Motion to Compel Apple Inc. to Produce Testing Tool by Apple, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 243 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLE, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 240 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 3, 2011 242 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 240 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corp.'s Motion to Compel Apple Inc. to Produce Testing Tool (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 3, 2011 241 Declaration of Derek Walter filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 3, 2011 240 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corp.'s Motion to Compel Apple Inc. to Produce Testing Tool filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 3, 2011 239 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S AMENDED ADMININSTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 232 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 2, 2011 238 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 234 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [APPLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO ELAN'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT OF US PATENT NO. 5,825,352 AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [APPLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO ELAN'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT OF US PATENT NO. 5,825,352 AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS] (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 237 Appendix A & B [AND EXHIBITS 1-8] TO THE DECLARATION OF RAVIN BALAKRISHNAN IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC'S OPPOSITION TO ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORP.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,825,352 filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix B, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 236 Declaration of Derek Walter IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC'S OPPOSITION TO ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT 5,825,352] filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Exhibit I, # 6 Exhibit J, # 7 Exhibit K)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 235 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt in Support of 234 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [APPLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO ELAN'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT OF US PATENT NO. 5,825,352 AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [APPLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO ELAN'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT OF US PATENT NO. 5,825,352 AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS] filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 234 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 234 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [APPLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO ELAN'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT OF US PATENT NO. 5,825,352 AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS] filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 233 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 232 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Papers in Support of Its Motion to Compel Apple, Inc. to Produce Testing Tool filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 231 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Tsai (Tsai, John) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 230 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF ELAN MICRELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 222 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 1, 2011 229 Featured Case ORDER RE 227 GRANTING PLAINTIFF ELAN MICROELECTRONICS RENEWED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE PORTIONS OR THE ENTIRETY OF PAPERS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/1/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 228 Featured Case ORDER DENYING ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 211 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 227 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt in Support of 216 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal /Elan Microelectronics Corporation's RENEWED Administrative Motion to File Portions or the Entirety of Papers in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement Under Seal filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 216 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 31, 2011 226 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 224 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel and Related Papers (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 31, 2011 225 Declaration of Derek Walter In Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel (1) Discovery Relating to US Sales; (2) Documents Improperly Withheld on the Basis of Privilege; and (3) Inventor Depositions filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 6, # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 10, # 8 Exhibit 15, # 9 Exhibit 22, # 10 Exhibit 24, # 11 Exhibit 28, # 12 Exhibit 29, # 13 Exhibit 30, # 14 Exhibit 31, # 15 Exhibit 32, # 16 Exhibit 33, # 17 Exhibit 36)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 31, 2011 224 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 27, 2011 223 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 222 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions or the Entirety of Papers in Support of Plaintiff Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Apple, Inc. to Produce Testing Tool filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 221 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Apple, Inc. to Produce Testing Tool by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 25, 2011 220 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation (Related to Dkts. 210-211) (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 219 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation re 216 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal /Elan Microelectronics Corporation's RENEWED Administrative Motion to File Portions or the Entirety of Papers in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement Under Seal - Liu Declaration (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 218 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING FOR ELAN'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/25/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 217 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 206 CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/25/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 216 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal /Elan Microelectronics Corporation's RENEWED Administrative Motion to File Portions or the Entirety of Papers in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement Under Seal filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 24, 2011 215 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 204 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Papers in Support of Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration - Dezmelyk, # 2 Declaration - Liu, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 23, # 8 Exhibit 24, # 9 Errata 25, # 10 Exhibit 27, # 11 Exhibit 29, # 12 Exhibit 30, # 13 Exhibit 31, # 14 Exhibit 32, # 15 Exhibit 33, # 16 Exhibit 34, # 17 Exhibit 35, # 18 Exhibit 36, # 19 Exhibit 37, # 20 Exhibit 39, # 21 Exhibit 40, # 22 Exhibit 41, # 23 Exhibit 42, # 24 Exhibit 43, # 25 Exhibit 44, # 26 Exhibit 45, # 27 Exhibit 47)(Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 214 Declaration of Jennifer Liu in Support of 212 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent 5,875,352 [Public Version] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent 5,875,352 [Public Version] filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3-6 MFN, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 10, # 8 Exhibit 11, # 9 Exhibit 12, # 10 Exhibit 13, # 11 Exhibit 14, # 12 Exhibit 15, # 13 Exhibit 16, # 14 Exhibit 17, # 15 Exhibit 18, # 16 Exhibit 19, # 17 Exhibit 20, # 18 Exhibit 21, # 19 Exhibit 22, # 20 Exhibit 23-25 MFN, # 21 Exhibit 26, # 22 Exhibit 27 MFN, # 23 Exhibit 28, # 24 Exhibit 29-33 MFN, # 25 Exhibit 34, # 26 Exhibit 35-37 MFN, # 27 Exhibit 38 Part 1, # 28 Exhibit 38 Part 2, # 29 Exhibit 38 Part 3, # 30 Exhibit 39-45 MFN, # 31 Exhibit 46, # 32 Exhibit 47 MFN, # 33 Exhibit 48)(Related document(s) 212 ) (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 213 Declaration of Robert Dezmelyk in Support of 212 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent 5,875,352 [Public Version] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent 5,875,352 [Public Version] filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 212 ) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 212 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent 5,875,352 [Public Version] filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 211 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of Palani P. Rathinasamy in Support of Plaintiff Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Compel Apple to Supplement Its Response to Elan's Interrogatory No. 13 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 210 Declaration of Palani P. Rathinasamy in Support of 209 MOTION to Compel Apple to Supplement Its Response to Elan's Interrogatory No. 13 filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-MFN, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E-MFN, # 6 Exhibit F-MFN, # 7 Exhibit G-MFN, # 8 Exhibit H-MFN, # 9 Exhibit I-MFN, # 10 Exhibit J-MFN, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L-MFN, # 13 Exhibit M-MFN)(Related document(s) 209 ) (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 209 MOTION to Compel Apple to Supplement Its Response to Elan's Interrogatory No. 13 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 208 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing (Telephonic) held on 5/24/2011 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 5/24/2011). Motion to Compel Inspection set for 6/7/2011 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (Court Reporter FTR.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/24/2011)
May 20, 2011 207 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Grant Hamill and Christopher R. Lubeck (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 19, 2011 206 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Further Case Management Conference by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 205 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing for Elan's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Apple, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 11, 2011 204 Featured Case ORDER RE: 198 DENYING MOTION TO SEAL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 6, 2011 203 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 197 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Apple, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane H. Bu (Bu, Jane) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 201 NOTICE of Appearance by Palani Pradeep Rathinasamy (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 200 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 199 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement. by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 5, 2011 198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENTS AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 5, 2011 197 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLE INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE ITC'S INITIAL DETERMINATION. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 3, 2011 196 Letter from Matthew D. Powers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
May 3, 2011 195 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 15, 2011 194 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
January 28, 2011 192 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 2/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Jury Selection set for 2/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/28/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 27, 2011 191 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/27/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 1/27/2011). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/27/2011)
January 26, 2011 190 CLERKS NOTICE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SHALL BE CONDUCTED BY TELEPHONE. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 189 Request for Telephonic Appearance at Case Management Conference by Apple, Inc. re 185 Clerks Notice (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/26/2011) Modified on 1/27/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2011 188 Featured Case ORDER AMENDING CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/25/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 20, 2011 187 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT / Joint Further Case Management Statement filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
December 22, 2010 186 Featured Case ORDER RE 110 GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 10, 2010 185 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 5, 2010 184 NOTICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation // Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 1, 2010 183 Featured Case CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION ORDER re: 84 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/1/2010.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 27, 2010 182 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING AS UNOPPOSED PLAINTIFF ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORP'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 180 Motion for Leave to File (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 25, 2010 181 Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support of 180 MOTION for Leave to File Elan's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-6 filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 180 ) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 25, 2010 180 Elan's Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-6 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 10/25/2010) Modified on 10/26/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2010 179 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Apple, Inc.. Apple Inc.'s First Supplemental Invalidity Contentions. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 18, 2010 178 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING AS UNOPPOSED DEFENDANT APPLE, INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 171 Motion for Leave to File (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 177 Proposed Order Granting Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion For Leave To Amend Invalidity Contentions by Apple, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 6, 2010 176 Letter from Sean P. DeBruine re claim construction proceedings in parallel ITC investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 5, 2010 175 Apple Inc.'s Response To Elan Microelectronics Corporation's 169 Corrected First Amended Answer by Apple, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 10/5/2010) Modified on 10/6/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2010 174 Letter from Matthew D. Powers re claim construction proceedings in parallel ITC investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 20, 2010 173 Application Requesting Completion of Hague Convention Documents for the Deposition of Bernard Kasser filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Deposition Guidelines), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Letters Rogatory), # 3 Exhibit 3 (USM-94), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Subpoena to Kasser for Consular Deposition), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Subpoena to Kasser), # 6 Proposed Order)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 9/20/2010) Modified on 9/22/2010 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2010 172 Declaration of Sonal Mehta in Support of 171 Unopposed Motion For Leave To Amend Invalidity Contentions filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 171 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 9/20/2010) Modified on 9/22/2010 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2010 171 Unopposed Motion For Leave To Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 9/20/2010) Modified on 9/22/2010 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 170 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Subpoena to Bernard Kasser (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena to Bernard Kasser, # 2 Subpoena to Bernard Kasser (Consular Deposition), # 3 Request for Judicial Assistance (Letters Rogatory), # 4 Request for Service Abroad of Judicial or Extrajudicial Documents (USM-94))(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 14, 2010 169 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Corrected First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims in Response to Apple Inc.'s Third Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims; Demand for Jury Trial, COUNTERCLAIM against Apple, Inc. byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 8, 2010 168 Letter from Matthew D. Powers regarding Elan's August 20, 2010 letter ( 165 ) re: claim constrction proceedings in the parallel ITC Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 9/8/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2010 167 Notice of Withdrawal Of Apple Inc.'s Motion To Compel James Eakin To Produce Documents Pursuant To Subpoena Duces Tecum [D.I. 142] (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 8/26/2010) Modified on 9/2/2010 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 166 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 20, 2010 165 Letter from Sean P. DeBruine. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 19, 2010 164 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 8/19/2010) Modified on 8/20/2010 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2010 163 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF ELAN'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE DOCUMENTS NOT TIMELY PRODUCED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR COSTS by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull denying 135 Motion to Exclude Documents Not Timely Produced, or in the Alternative, for Costs. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 10, 2010 162 Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support of 161 Memorandum in Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel James Eakin to Produce Documents Pursuant to Subpoena Duces Tecum filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 161 ) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 161 Memorandum in Opposition re 142 MOTION to Compel James Eakin To Produce Documents Pursuant to Subpoena Duces Tecum filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 160 Reply Memorandum / Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude Documents Not Timely Produced or, in the Alternative, for Costs filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 9, 2010 159 Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta in Support of 157 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, {Redacted Declaration pursuant to Order) filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 157 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 6, 2010 158 Memorandum in Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Elan's Inequitable Conduct Defense and Counterclaim ( 131 ) filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 8/6/2010) Modified on 8/9/2010 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2010 157 Featured Case ORDER RE: 137 , 145 SEALING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 08/04/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 4, 2010 156 Featured Case ORDER RE: 131 GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS INEQUITABLE CONDUCT COUNTERCLAIM, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 08/04/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 3, 2010 155 Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta in Support of 152 Memorandum in Opposition to Elan's Motion to Exclude Documents or, in the Alternative, for Costs filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, Part 1 of 2, # 3 Exhibit A-1, Part 2 of 2, # 4 Exhibit A-2, # 5 Exhibit A-3, # 6 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 152 ) (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
August 3, 2010 154 Declaration of Jay Hamlin in Support of 152 Memorandum in Opposition to Elan's Motion to Exclusive Documents, or, in the Alternative, for Costs filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 152 ) (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
August 3, 2010 153 Declaration of Douglas E. Lumish in Support of 152 Memorandum in Opposition to Elan's Motion to Exclude Documents or, in the Alternative, for Costs filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 152 ) (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
August 3, 2010 152 Memorandum in Opposition re 135 MOTION to Exclude Documents Not Timely Produced or, in the Alternative, for Costs filed byApple, Inc.. (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
August 2, 2010 151 CLERKS NOTICE Re: motion scheduled for hearing on 8/05/2010 at 1:30 p.m. shall be submitted without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). Accordingly, the motion hearing is vacated. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 30, 2010 150 Amended Notice of Motion to Compel James Eakin to Produce Documents Pursuant to Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Apple, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/30/2010) Modified on 8/2/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2010 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2010 149 Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support of 145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (1) APPLE INC.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORP.S INEQUITABLE CONDUCT DEFENSE AND COUNTERCLAIM; AND (2) DECLARATION OF SONAL N. MEHTA IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.S REPLY AND Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (1) APPLE INC.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORP.S INEQUITABLE CONDUCT DEFENSE AND COUNTERCLAIM; AND (2) DECLARATION OF SONAL N. MEHTA IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.S REPLY AND filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Related document(s) 145 ) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 26, 2010 148 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. Certificate of Service by Hand Delivery (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 22, 2010 147 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 146 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt (Supplemental) in Support of Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Elan Microelectronics Corp.'s Inequitable Conduct Defense and Counterclaim filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (1) APPLE INC.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORP.S INEQUITABLE CONDUCT DEFENSE AND COUNTERCLAIM; AND (2) DECLARATION OF SONAL N. MEHTA IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.S REPLY AND EXHIBITS THERETO UNDER SEAL filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 144 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt in Support of 137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal / Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Administrative Motion to File Papers in Support of its Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Seal filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 137 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 20, 2010 143 Declaration of Nathan A. Greenblatt in Support of 142 MOTION to Compel James Eakin To Produce Documents Pursuant to Subpoena Duces Tecum filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 142 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 20, 2010 142 Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel James Eakin To Produce Documents Pursuant to Subpoena Duces TecumI> filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/20/2010) Modified on 7/21/2010 TO CORRECT HEARING LOCATION TO MATCH NOTICE (rslc1, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/27/2010 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2010 141 Amended Notice of Motion to Exclude Documents Not Timely Produced or, in the Alternative, for Costs filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/16/2010) Modified on 7/23/2010 (tshS, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2010 140 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elan Microelectronics Corporation (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 15, 2010 139 DECLARATION of Sean P. DeBruine in Opposition to 138 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V)(Related document(s) 138 ) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 15, 2010 138 Memorandum in Opposition re 131 MOTION to Dismiss [DI 118] Elan Microelectronics Corp.'s Inequitable Conduct Defense and Counterclaim MOTION to Dismiss [DI 118] Elan Microelectronics Corp.'s Inequitable Conduct Defense and Counterclaim filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 15, 2010 137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal / Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Administrative Motion to File Papers in Support of its Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Seal filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rader, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 13, 2010 136 Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support of 135 MOTION to Exclude Documents Not Timely Produced or, in the Alternative, for Costs filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) 135 ) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 13, 2010 135 MOTION to Exclude Documents Not Timely Produced or, in the Alternative, for Costs filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 6, 2010 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Swain (Swain, Adam) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 1, 2010 133 Letter to Judge Seeborg from Matthew D. Powers regarding developments following last weeks's Claim Construction Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-A, # 2 Exhibit-B, # 3 Exhibit-C) (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 7/1/2010) Modified on 7/2/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2010 132 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt in Support of 131 Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 6/29/2010) Modified on 6/30/2010 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2010 131 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 6/29/2010) Modified on 6/30/2010 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2010 130 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-23-10, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2010. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 25, 2010 CLERKS NOTICE RE: 129 Notice of Change of Address. Updated Address' for Attorneys: Yitai Hu, Sean P. DeBruine, Elizabeth H. Radar, and Jennifer Liu. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 24, 2010 129 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sean P DeBruine (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 23, 2010 128 Minute Entry: Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held on 6/23/2010 before Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 6/23/2010). (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/23/2010)
June 21, 2010 127 Minute Entry:Tutorial Hearing held on 6/21/2010 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 6/21/2010). (Court Reporter unreported.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/21/2010)
June 18, 2010 126 Featured Case ORDER RE: 105 MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 06/18/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
June 18, 2010 125 Featured Case ORDER RE: 124 GRANTING MOTION TO BRING INTO COURTHOUSE CERTAIN EQUIPMENT AND MATERIALS FOR PURPOSES OF A TUTORIAL AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING ( 124 ). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
June 18, 2010 124 Administrative Request to Bring into the Federal Courthouse Certain Equipment and Materials for Purposes of a Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearing filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 6/18/2010) Modified on 6/18/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2010 123 Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike Paragraphs 26-34 of the Claim Construction Declaration of Robert Dezmelyk Docket # ( 89 ) re 105 filed by Apple, Inc (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 6/17/2010) Modified on 6/18/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2010 122 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 116 MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Attorney Christopher Augustine Rakow terminated.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 14, 2010 121 Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support of Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Paragraphs 26-34 of the Claim Construction Declaration of Robert Dezmelyk re 120 , filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/14/2010) Modified on 6/15/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2010 120 Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Paragraphs 26-34 of the Claim Construction Declaration of Robert Dezmelyk re 105 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/14/2010) Text modified on 6/15/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2010 119 Letter to Judge Seeborg regarding the June 21, 2010 hearing on Apple's Motion to Strike Paragraphs 26-34, etc re ( 105 ) from Matthew D. Powers (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 6/14/2010) Text modified and linkage added on 6/14/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2010 118 Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims in Response to Apple, Inc.'s Third Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims re 96 by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/8/2010) Modified on 6/9/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2010 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Bobrow (Bobrow, Jared) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 3, 2010 116 Notice of Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; and (Proposed) Order filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Rakow, Christopher) (Filed on 6/3/2010) Text modified on 6/4/2010 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 115 Featured Case ORDER RE 107 GRANTING APPLE INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PARAGRAPHS 26-34 OF THE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DECLARATION OF ROBERT DEZMELYK. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 114 Declaration of Elizabeth H. Rader in Support of Elan Microelectronics Corp.'s Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief re 109 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Rader, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/3/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2010 113 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re ([110} Motion to File Under Seal by Elan Microelectronics Corporation (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/3/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2010 112 Rebuttal Declaration of Robert Dezmelyk in Support of Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief re 109 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/3/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2010 111 Supplemental Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support of Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief re 109 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/3/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2010 110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Sean DeBruine, # 2 (Proposed) Order)(Rader, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/2/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2010 109 Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief re ( 60 ) filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/2/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2010 108 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt in Support of Apple's Motion to Shorten Time re ( 107 ) filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 6/2/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2010 107 Unopposed Motion to Shorten Time for Its Motion to Strike Paragraphs 26-34 of the Claim Construction Declaration of Robert Dezmelyk re ( 105 ) filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 6/2/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2010 106 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt In Support of Apple's Motion to Strike Paragraphs 26-34 of the Claim Construction; Declaration of Robert Dezmelyk re ( 105 ) filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 6/2/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2010 105 Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Paragraphs 26-34 of the Claim Construction Declaration of Robert Dezmelyk re ( 89 ) filed by Apple, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 6/2/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2010 104 Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt in Support of Apple's Responsive Claim Construction Brief re 103 filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J) (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 6/2/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2010 103 Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Apple, Inc. (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 6/2/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2010 102 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 99 Stipulation filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on June 2, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 1, 2010 101 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
June 1, 2010 100 Letter to Judge Seeborg regarding Motion to Stay re ( 78 ) from Matthew D. Powers (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 6/1/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2010 99 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Modifying Amended Protective Order by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 5/28/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2010 98 Featured Case ORDER RE 97 GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND THE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE BY FIVE DAYS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 27, 2010 97 Unopposed Motion to Extend The Claim Construction Briefing Schedule by Five Days and (Proposed) Order re 87 , 85 Brief filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Rader, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/27/2010) Modified on 5/27/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2010 96 Third Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Complaint for Patent Infringement re ( 1 ) by Apple, Inc. (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 5/25/2010) Text modified on 5/26/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2010 95 Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Stay Pending Final Determination by The ITC of Investigation No. 337-RA-714 re 78 filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 5/20/2010) Text modified on 5/21/2010; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2010 94 Declaration of T. Hunter Jeffersion in Support of Motion to Stay Pending Final Determination by The ITC of Investigation No. 337-RA-714 re 93 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 5/20/2010) Modified on 5/21/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2010 93 *** PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET ( 95 )**** Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Stay Pending Final Determination by The ITC of Investigation No. 337-RA-714 re 78 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 5/20/2010) Text nodified on 5/21/2010 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/21/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2010 92 Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta in Support of Apple's Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Stay Pending Final Determination by the ITC of Investigation No. 337-Ta-714 re 91 filed b yApple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 5/13/2010) Modified on 5/14/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2010 91 Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Stay Pending Final Determination by the ITC of Investigation No. 337-Ta-714 re 78 filed by Apple, Inc. (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 5/13/2010) Modified on 5/14/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2010 90 Featured Case ORDER RE: 83 GRANTING APPLE'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
May 7, 2010 89 Declaration of Robert Dezmelyk in Support of Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Opening Claim Construction Brief re 87 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 5/7/2010) Modified on 5/10/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2010 88 Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Opening Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L) filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 5/7/2010) Modified on 5/10/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2010 87 Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 5/7/2010) Modified on 5/10/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2010 86 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support Apple's of Opening Claim Construction Brief re 85 filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V) (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 5/7/2010) Modified on 5/10/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2010 85 Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byApple, Inc. (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 5/7/2010) Modified on 5/10/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2010 84 First Amended Joint Claim Construction and Prehearint Statement filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 5/7/2010) Text modified on 5/10/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2010 83 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 (Proposed) Order)(Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 5/7/2010) Modified on 5/7/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2010 82 Featured Case ORDER RE: 90 DENYING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 05/03/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 27, 2010 81 Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support of Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing on Elan's Motion to Stay Pending Final Determination by the ITC of Investigation No. 337-TA-714 re 80 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 4/27/2010) Modified on 4/28/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2010 80 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Elan's Motion to Stay Pending Final Determination by the ITC of Investigation No. 337-TA-714 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 4/27/2010) Modified on 4/28/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2010 79 Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support of Motion to Stay Pending Final Determination by the ITC of Investigation No 337-TA-714 re 78 filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 4/27/2010) Modified on 4/28/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2010 78 Notice of Motion and MOTION to Stay Pending Final Determination by the ITC of Investigation No 337-TA-714 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 4/27/2010) Modified on 4/28/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF). ).
April 14, 2010 77 Featured Case ORDER RE: 75 GRANTING ELAN MICROELECTRONICS CORPORATION'S MOTION TO ENLARGE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/14/10.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 13, 2010 76 Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support of MOTION Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 6-3 to Enlarge Claim Construction Briefing Deadlines re ( 75 ) filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 4/13/2010) Text modified on 4/14/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2010 75 MOTION Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 6-3 to Enlarge Claim Construction Briefing Deadlines filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 4/13/2010) Modified on 4/14/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Tutorial Hearing set for 6/21/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 74 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Tutorial set for 6/21/10 at 1:30 p.m. Claims Construction Hearing set for 6/23/2010 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 03/18/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 73 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/18/2010 before Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 3/18/2010).(Court Reporter Unreported.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/18/2010)
March 17, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/12/2010 09:30 AM. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
March 17, 2010 72 Featured Case ORDER RE: 68 GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND THE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND MARKMAN HEARING DATE. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
March 17, 2010 71 Statement of Non-Opposition to Apple's Motion to Extend The Claim Construction Briefing Schedule and Markman Hearing Date re 68 by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 3/17/2010) Modified on 3/17/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2010 70 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING MATERIALS PRODUCED BY 3M PURSUANT TO SUBPOENAS re 69 Stipulation filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on March 16, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 69 STIPULATED Protective Order Concerning Materials producted by 3m Pursuant to Subpoena by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 3/16/2010) Modified on 3/16/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2010 68 Unopposed Motion to Extend The Claim Construction Briefing Schedule and Markman Hearing Date filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/11/2010) Modified on 3/12/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2010 67 Case Mangement Conference Statement Regarding Claim Construction Logistics filed by Apple, Inc., Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/11/2010) Modified on 3/12/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2010 66 CLERKS NOTICE RE: 65 Case Management Conference continued to 3/18/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010).
February 17, 2010 65 STIPULATION and (Proposed0 Order to Continue Case Management Conferene by Apple, Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/17/2010) Modified on 2/18/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 64 Featured Case AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS re 62 Proposed Order filed by Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on February 11, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 63 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on 2/11/2010 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case did not settle. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 62 (Proposed) Amended Stipulated Protective Order Regarding The Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials by Apple, Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Text modified on 2/11/2010 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
February 8, 2010 61 Featured Case ORDER RE: 60 SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 02/25/2010 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3, 17TH FLOOR, US COURTHOUSE, SAN FRANCISCO. Statement setting out joint proposal re: claim construction logistics due no later than 02/18/2010 (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010).
February 5, 2010 60 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed by Apple, Inc., Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/5/2010) Modified on 2/8/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2010 59 CLERKS NOTICE RE: 42 IMPORTANT CHANGES TO UPCOMING CIVIL MATTERS. All motion hearings before Judge Richard Seeborg must be re-noticed. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010).
January 26, 2010 58 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING TIME AND MANNER TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/22/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 25, 2010 57 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Production of Source Code Documents Per Patent L.R. 3-4(A) filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 1/25/2010) Modified on 1/26/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2010 56 Featured Case ORDER RE PARTIES' PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on January 25, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 22, 2010 55 (Proposed) Stipulated Protective Order Granting the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials by Apple, Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/22/2010) Modified on 1/25/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2010 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for discovery matters. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 20, 2010 54 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Modifying Time and Manner to Meet and Confer Regarding Settlement by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 53 Featured Case ORDER RE: 49 DENYING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 01/20/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 01/20/2010).
January 19, 2010 52 Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta in Support of Opposition to Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing on Elan's Motion to Compel Production of Source Code Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-4(A re 51 filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/19/2010) Modified on 1/20/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2010 51 Opposition to Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing on Elan's Motion to Compel Production of Source Code Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-4(A) re 49 filed by Apple, Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/19/2010) Modified on 1/20/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2010 50 Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support of MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Elan's Motion to Compel Production of Source Code Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-4(A) re ( 49 ) filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 1/13/2010) Modified on 1/14/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2010 49 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Elan's Motion to Compel Production of Source Code Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-4(A) filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 1/13/2010) Modified on 1/14/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2010 48 Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support of MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code Documents Per Patent L.R. 3-4(A) re ( 47 ) filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 1/13/2010) Modified on 1/14/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2010 47 MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code Documents per Patent L.R. 3-4(A) filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 1/13/2010) Modified on 1/14/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2009 46 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING TIMES RELATED TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference previously set for 1/14/10 has been re-set for 2/11/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/24/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 23, 2009 45 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Changing Times Related to Settlement Conference by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 11/23/2009) Modified on 11/24/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2009 44 ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses and COUNTERCLAIMS in Reponse to Apple, Inc's Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims re 43 by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 10/20/2009) Modified on 10/21/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2009 43 Second Amended ANSWER; Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Complaint for Patent Infringement by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/5/2009) Modified on 10/6/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2009 42 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2009 has been vacated. Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/12/2010 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/1/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
September 30, 2009 41 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 9/30/2009) Modified on 10/1/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2009 40 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge JOSEPH C. SPERO. Settlement Conference set for 1/14/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/25/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 25, 2009 39 Minute Entry: TelephonicScheduling Conference held on 9/24/9 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/25/2009)
September 14, 2009 38 Featured Case ORDER RE: 16 GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 14, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 14, 2009 37 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 9/24/9 at 10:00 AM. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
August 27, 2009 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 27, 2009 36 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/27/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 26, 2009 35 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2009 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 8/26/2009) re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Apple, Inc.'s Third, Fourth and Fifth Counterclaims Under Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure To State A Claim, Or In The Alternative, For More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e) MOTION to Dismiss Apple, Inc.'s Third, Fourth and Fifth Counterclaims Under Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure To State A Claim, Or In The Alternative, For More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e) filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Tape #FTR.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2009)
August 25, 2009 34 Opposition to Motion to Shorten Time for Motion for Leave to File Surreply re 30 , ( 29 ) ) filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2009 33 Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support of Apple's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply re 32 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2009 32 Opposition to Apple's Motion for Leave to File Surreply re 29 , [25 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2009 31 Declaration of Edward R. Reines in Support of Apple Inc's Motion to Shorten Time re 30 filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/20/2009) Modified on 8/21/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2009 30 MOTION to Shorten Time for its Motion for Leave to File a Surreply 29 filed by Apple, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/20/2009) Modified on 8/21/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2009 29 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply re 25 filed by Apple, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Surreply, # 2 (Proposed) Order) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/20/2009) Modified on 8/21/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2009 28 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/14/2009) Modified on 8/17/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2009 27 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elan Microelectronics Corporation Plaintiff And Counterdefendant Elan Microelectronics Corporation's (Kim, Sang Hui) (Filed on 8/14/2009) Modified on 8/17/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2009 26 Declaration of Sean P. DeBruine in Support of Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Apple, Inc's Third, Fourth and Fifth Counterclaims Under Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure To State A Claim, Or In The Alternative, For More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e) re 25 filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 8/12/2009) Modified on 8/13/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2009 25 Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Apple, Inc's Third, Fourth and Fifth Counterclaims Under Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure To State A Claim, Or In The Alternative, For More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e) filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 8/12/2009) Modified on 8/13/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2009 24 CLERKS NOTICE: Case Management Conference originally set for 8/26/09 continued to 10/7/2009 02:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2009. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
August 10, 2009 23 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
August 7, 2009 22 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Elan Microelectronics Corporation (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 8/7/2009) Text modified on 8/10/2009 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2009 21 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CONSENT/DECLINATION DEADLINE. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
August 5, 2009 20 ADR Certification by Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff and Counsel (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Apple Inc. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/5/2009) Modified on 8/6/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2009 19 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
August 5, 2009 18 Declaration of Edward R. Reines in Support of Apple Inc's Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Apple Inc's Third, Fourth and Fifth Counterclaims Under Rule 12(b)(6); For Failure To State A Claim, Or In The Alternative, For More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e) re 17 filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G) (Rines, Edward) (Filed on 8/5/2009) Text modified on 8/6/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2009 17 Opposition to Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Apple Inc's Third, Fourth and Fifth Counterclaims Under Rule 12(b)(6); For Failure To State A Claim, Or In The Alternative, For More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e) re 16 ; and (Proposed) Order filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/5/2009) Text modified on 8/6/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2009 16 MOTION to Dismiss Apple, Inc.'s Third, Fourth and Fifth Counterclaims Under Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure To State A Claim, Or In The Alternative, For More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e) filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 7/21/2009) Text modified on 7/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2009 15 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and , COUNTERCLAIMS against Elan Microelectronics Corporation'S Complaint for Patient Infringement byApple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 7/1/2009) Text modified on 7/1/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2009 14 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 12 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF T. HUNTER JEFFERSON PRO HAC VICE. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 16, 2009 13 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney T. Hunter Jefferson re 12 by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 16, 2009 12 Application for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney T. Hunter Jefferson ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611005419) filed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 15, 2009 11 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 10 RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference originally set for 8/12/09 now re-scheduled for 8/26/09 at 2:30 PM, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 15, 2009 10 STIPULATION & [Proposed] Order Rescheduling Initial Case Management Conference by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 6/15/2009) Modified on 6/16/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2009 9 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple, Inc. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 6/12/2009) Text modified on 6/15/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2009 8 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Apple, Inc. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 6/12/2009) Text modified on 6/15/2009 conforming to posted document (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2009 7 ANSWER to Complaint re ( 1 ) with Jury Demand by Apple, Inc. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 6/12/2009) Linkage added on 6/15/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2009 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint ( 1 ) by Apple, Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/27/2009) Linkage added on 4/28/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2009 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elan Microelectronics Corporation. Apple, Inc. served on 4/8/2009, answer due 4/28/2009. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 8, 2009 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
April 7, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
April 7, 2009 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/5/2009. Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2009 02:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
April 7, 2009 2 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
April 7, 2009 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611004046). Filed byElan Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Elan Microelectronics Corporation v. Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elan Microelectronics Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Augustine Rakow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]