Universal Grading Service et al v. EBay, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Universal Grading Service, John Callandrello, Joseph Komito and Vadim Kirichenko
Defendant: eBay, Inc., American Numismatic Association, Professional Numismatists Guild, Inc. and Barry Stuppler & Company, LLC
 
Case Number: 5:2009cv02755
Filed: June 24, 2009
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 99 re Case Management Conference and Plaintiff's Motion to File a Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/9/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
February 2, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 107 Setting Briefing Schedule: Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/2/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
March 9, 2010 115 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 114 for an Extension of Time: Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/9/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 11, 2010 117 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 116 to Continue Motion Hearing Dateon Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/11/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
April 7, 2010 123 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 121 for Plaintiff to File Third Amended Complaint, Setting Briefing Schedule for Motions to Dismiss, and Setting New Case Management Conference Date: Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/7/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 15, 2010 124 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 119 to Withdraw Defendant American Numismatic Association's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/15/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
July 14, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 128 Extending Time to File Opposition. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/14/10. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 19, 2010 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying administrative request for leave to file brief in excess of page limits 130 . Signed by Judge Whyte on 7/19/10. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 22, 2010 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 130 Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Whyte on 7/22/10. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
August 5, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 137 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. eBay's reply brief shall be filed by 8/20/2010. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 139 defendant PNG's request for additional time to file reply brief. Defendant's reply papers shall be filed and served no later than 8/20/10. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/5/10. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
March 2, 2011 150 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 148 Dismissing Defendant American Numismatic Association With Prejudice, American Numismatic Association Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/2/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
March 8, 2011 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 125 Motion to Dismiss; granting 126 Motion to Dismiss; granting 142 Motion to Strike (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
April 6, 2011 154 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 153 Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/6/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
July 22, 2011 165 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 164 Dismissing Defendant Professional Numismatics Guild, Inc., Professional Numismatists Guild, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/22/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
January 9, 2012 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE re 155 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on January 9, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 9, 2012 169 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on January 9, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
June 10, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION transferring case to Northern District of California. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 6/10/2009. Case transferred to the Northern District of California via ECF. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Abdallah, Fida)
November 17, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 91 Selecting ADR Process, Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/17/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Universal Grading Service et al v. EBay, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Grading Service
Represented By: Marina Trubitsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Callandrello
Represented By: Marina Trubitsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Komito
Represented By: Marina Trubitsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vadim Kirichenko
Represented By: Marina Trubitsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
Represented By: Marina Trubitsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Numismatic Association
Represented By: Jung Hyun Park
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Numismatists Guild, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. O'Quinn, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Stuppler & Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]