Khoo v. Hunt & Henriques

Plaintiff: Maryanne Khoo
Defendant: Hunt & Henriques
Case Number: 5:2009cv05175
Filed: November 2, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FINDING AS MOOT 10 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/7/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 8, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. Joint Statement or Stipulated Dismissal due by 5/28/2010. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/7/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismiss this action. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/7/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 29, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal with Prejudice re 15 STIPULATION. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/9/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khoo v. Hunt & Henriques
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryanne Khoo
Represented By: Michael S Agruss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt & Henriques
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]