Estrada et al v. Salyer American et al

Plaintiff: Felisa Estrada and Sergio Zamora
Defendant: Salyer American, Salyer American Fresh Foods, Inc., SK Foods, L.P., SK Frozen Foods, LLP, The Salyer Revocable Trust, RHM Industrial/Specialty Foods, Inc., Scott Salyer, Bank of The West, Agstar Financial Services, PCA/FLCA, FCS Financial, PCA and Steve Franson
Case Number: 5:2009cv05618
Filed: November 30, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Mono
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Request to Appear by Telephonic Conference as to Attorney Steve Franson re 99 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/30/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
October 6, 2010 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/06/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
December 7, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 127 Proposed Order filed by Sergio Zamora, Felisa Estrada. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/7/10. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
January 3, 2011 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Additional Information from Plaintiffs Before Staying Case. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/3/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
January 7, 2011 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/7/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 22, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Dismissal as to Defendants SK Foods, L.P and RHM Industrial/Specialty Foods, Inc. ONLY without Prejudice re 36 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Defendants RHM Industrial/Specialty Foods, Inc. and SK Foods, L.P. terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/22/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
March 12, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 63 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Salyer American without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1). Defendant Salyer American terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 25, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT re 92 Joint Case Management Statement. Deadline for Motions for Entry of Default due by 4/12/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/24/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estrada et al v. Salyer American et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felisa Estrada
Represented By: Charles Swanston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Zamora
Represented By: Charles Swanston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salyer American
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salyer American Fresh Foods, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SK Foods, L.P.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SK Frozen Foods, LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Salyer Revocable Trust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHM Industrial/Specialty Foods, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Salyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of The West
Represented By: Robert B. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agstar Financial Services, PCA/FLCA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCS Financial, PCA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Franson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]