Young v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Karen Beth Young
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv03579
Filed: August 13, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2010 35 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2010 is continued to 11/5/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 25, 2010 34 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION 19 TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF MAY BE GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/25/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 20, 2010 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 20, 2010 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 15, 2010 33 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/15/2010 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 10/15/2010) re 19 MOTION to Dismiss. The Court grants the motion with leave to amend. (Court Reporter Christine Bedard.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/15/2010)
October 12, 2010 30 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 1, 2010 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 28 Reply Memorandum (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 28 Reply Memorandum re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 24, 2010 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Morvarid Metanat (Metanat, Morvarid) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 13, 2010 26 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER (1) DENYING 14 MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE; (2) DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 10 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/13/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 9, 2010 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed byKaren Beth Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 19 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 2, 2010 24 Featured Case ORDER (1) DENYING 14 MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE; (2) DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 10 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/2/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 30, 2010 23 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 24, 2010 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 18 Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), 20 Exhibits, (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 20 EXHIBITS re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 19 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 18 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Gary Evan Weiss (Weiss, Gary) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 23, 2010 17 NOTICE by Karen Beth Young re 14 MOTION for Order to Preserve Evidence and Supporting Papers (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 16 Proposed Order re 14 MOTION for Order to Preserve Evidence and Supporting Papers by Karen Beth Young. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 15 Declaration of Karen Beth Young in Support of 14 MOTION for Order to Preserve Evidence and Supporting Papers filed byKaren Beth Young. (Related document(s) 14 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 14 MOTION for Order to Preserve Evidence and Supporting Papers filed by Karen Beth Young. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 13 NOTICE by Karen Beth Young re 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 12 Proposed Order re 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Karen Beth Young. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 11 Declaration of Karen Beth Young in Support of 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed byKaren Beth Young. (Related document(s) 10 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Karen Beth Young. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 18, 2010 9 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 08/18/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re 5 ADR Scheduling Order. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. The CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE previously scheduled for October 26, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. on Magistrate Judge Trumbull's calendar will NOT be held. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 16, 2010 7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Karen Beth Young (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 6 Proof of Service re ( 1 ) NOTICE OF REMOVAL to United States District Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(b); ( 2 ) Index of State Court Pleadings ; ( 3 ) Certification of Interested Parties by Facebook, Inc; ( 4 ) PROOF OF SERVICE ; ( 5 ) ADR SCHEDULING ORDER by Facebook, Inc. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 8/16/2010) Text modified, linkage added on 8/17/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2010. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Trumbull Standing Order for Civil Practice in Assigned Cases for all Purposes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 4 PROOF OF SERVICE RE ( 1 ) Notice of Removal; (2) Index of State Court Pleadings; (3) Certification of Interested Parties by Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 3 Certification of Interested Parties by Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 2 Index of State Court Pleadings re ( 1 ) Notice of Removal by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 to Index of State Court Pleadings, # 2 Attachment 2 to Index of State Court Pleadings, # 3 Attachment 3 to Index of State Court Pleadings, # 4 Attachment 4 to Index of State Court Pleadings, # 5 Attachment 5 to Index of State Court Pleadings, # 6 Attachment 6 to Index of State Court Pleadings, # 7 Attachment 7 to Index of State Court Pleadings, # 8 Attachment 8 to Index of State Court Pleadings, # 9 Attachment 9 to Index of State Court Pleadings, # 10 Attachment 10 to Index of State Court Pleadings) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010) Modified on 8/16/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/17/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2010 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to United States District Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(b) (NO PROCESS); jury demand; from Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 110CV178574. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 54611007911). Filed by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Facebook, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Beth Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Julio Cesar Avalos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]