Lalo v. Apple, Inc et al Featured Case

Defendant: The Weather Channel, GogII, Inc, OUTFIT7, Ltd, Room Candy, Inc, Sunstorm Interactive, Inc, Flurry, Inc., Medialets, Inc., Pinch Media, Inc., Quattro Wireless, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp., Groupon, Inc., NPR, New York Times Co., Webmd Health Services Group, Inc., Yelp!, Inc., Dictionary.com, Pandora, Inc, Apple, Inc and Backflip
Plaintiff: Dustin Freeman, Jared Parsley, Cole Parr, Precious Arrington, Anthony Chiu, Daniel Rodimer, Arfat Adil, Emili Clar, Jerod Couch, Barbara Davis, Matt Hines, Diego Lopez, Aaron Mulvey, Anna M. Ruston, Gena Terry and Jonathan Lalo
 
Case Number: 5:2010cv05878
Filed: December 23, 2010
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2013 215 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; finding as moot (126) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot (145) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot (156) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot (176) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot (187) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot (189) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot (190) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot (191) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:11-md-02250-LHK (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
March 7, 2013 214 Featured Case ORDER DENYING APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 130 AND INSTRUCTING PLAINTIFFS TO WITHDRAW MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BECAUSE OF APPLES UNTIMELY DISCOVERYAssociated Cases: 5:11-md-02250-LHK, 5:10-cv-05878-LHK, 5:10-cv-05881-LHK, 5:11-cv-00407-LHK, 5:11-cv-00700-LHK, 5:11-cv-02110-LHK, 5:11-cv-02270-LHK, 5:11-cv-02317-LHK, 5:11-cv-03416-LHK, 5:11-cv-04207-LHK, 5:11-cv-04542-LHK, 5:11-cv-04554-LHK, 5:11-cv-04555-LHK, 5:11-cv-04556-LHK, 5:11-cv-04557-LHK, 5:11-cv-04558-LHK, 5:11-cv-04559-LHK, 5:11-cv-04560-LHK, 5:12-cv-00162-LHK, 5:12-cv-00163-LHK(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 15, 2013 213 Featured Case ORDER re (126 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Anthony Chiu, Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, (145 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Documents filed by Apple, Inc., (156 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO APPLE INC,S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Anthony Chiu, Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, (176 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Certify Class filed by Anthony Chiu, Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/15/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 5, 2013 212 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting (170) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:11-md-02250-LHK for Leigh Smith.Associated Cases: 5:11-md-02250-LHK, 5:10-cv-05878-LHK, 5:10-cv-05881-LHK, 5:11-cv-00407-LHK, 5:11-cv-00700-LHK, 5:11-cv-02110-LHK, 5:11-cv-02270-LHK, 5:11-cv-02317-LHK, 5:11-cv-03416-LHK, 5:11-cv-04207-LHK, 5:11-cv-04542-LHK, 5:11-cv-04554-LHK, 5:11-cv-04555-LHK, 5:11-cv-04556-LHK, 5:11-cv-04557-LHK, 5:11-cv-04558-LHK, 5:11-cv-04559-LHK, 5:11-cv-04560-LHK, 5:12-cv-00162-LHK, 5:12-cv-00163-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
January 22, 2013 211 Featured Case ORDER re (152 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Cynthia O'Flaherty, granting (153 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) Proposed Order filed by Cynthia O'Flaherty. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/22/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 10, 2013 210 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; denying (140) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:11-md-02250-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:11-md-02250-LHK, 5:10-cv-05878-LHK, 5:10-cv-05881-LHK, 5:11-cv-00407-LHK, 5:11-cv-00700-LHK, 5:11-cv-02110-LHK, 5:11-cv-02270-LHK, 5:11-cv-02317-LHK, 5:11-cv-03416-LHK, 5:11-cv-04207-LHK, 5:11-cv-04542-LHK, 5:11-cv-04554-LHK, 5:11-cv-04555-LHK, 5:11-cv-04556-LHK, 5:11-cv-04557-LHK, 5:11-cv-04558-LHK, 5:11-cv-04559-LHK, 5:11-cv-04560-LHK, 5:12-cv-00162-LHK, 5:12-cv-00163-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
December 28, 2012 209 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting (135) Motion Regarding Timing of Hearings on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment and Briefing Schedule in case 5:11-md-02250-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:11-md-02250-LHK, 5:10-cv-05878-LHK, 5:10-cv-05881-LHK, 5:11-cv-00407-LHK, 5:11-cv-00700-LHK, 5:11-cv-02110-LHK, 5:11-cv-02270-LHK, 5:11-cv-02317-LHK, 5:11-cv-03416-LHK, 5:11-cv-04207-LHK, 5:11-cv-04542-LHK, 5:11-cv-04554-LHK, 5:11-cv-04555-LHK, 5:11-cv-04556-LHK, 5:11-cv-04557-LHK, 5:11-cv-04558-LHK, 5:11-cv-04559-LHK, 5:11-cv-04560-LHK, 5:12-cv-00162-LHK, 5:12-cv-00163-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 17, 2012 208 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; denying (119) Stipulation in case 5:11-md-02250-LHK and Striking Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment.Associated Cases: 5:11-md-02250-LHK, 5:10-cv-05878-LHK, 5:10-cv-05881-LHK, 5:11-cv-00407-LHK, 5:11-cv-00700-LHK, 5:11-cv-02110-LHK, 5:11-cv-02270-LHK, 5:11-cv-02317-LHK, 5:11-cv-03416-LHK, 5:11-cv-04207-LHK, 5:11-cv-04542-LHK, 5:11-cv-04554-LHK, 5:11-cv-04555-LHK, 5:11-cv-04556-LHK, 5:11-cv-04557-LHK, 5:11-cv-04558-LHK, 5:11-cv-04559-LHK, 5:11-cv-04560-LHK, 5:12-cv-00162-LHK, 5:12-cv-00163-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
November 21, 2012 206 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting in part and denying in part (97) Motion to Compel; denying (98) Motion for Protective Order in case 5:11-md-02250-LHK (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 9, 2012 205 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting (115) Motion for Extension of Time for Class Expert Disclosures and Class Certification Briefing.Associated Cases: 5:11-md-02250-LHK, 5:10-cv-05878-LHK, 5:10-cv-05881-LHK, 5:11-cv-00407-LHK, 5:11-cv-00700-LHK, 5:11-cv-02110-LHK, 5:11-cv-02270-LHK, 5:11-cv-02317-LHK, 5:11-cv-03416-LHK, 5:11-cv-04207-LHK, 5:11-cv-04542-LHK, 5:11-cv-04554-LHK, 5:11-cv-04555-LHK, 5:11-cv-04556-LHK, 5:11-cv-04557-LHK, 5:11-cv-04558-LHK, 5:11-cv-04559-LHK, 5:11-cv-04560-LHK, 5:12-cv-00162-LHK, 5:12-cv-00163-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
October 24, 2012 204 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting (110) Stipulation in case 5:11-md-02250-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:11-md-02250-LHK, 5:10-cv-05878-LHK, 5:10-cv-05881-LHK, 5:11-cv-00407-LHK, 5:11-cv-00700-LHK, 5:11-cv-02110-LHK, 5:11-cv-02270-LHK, 5:11-cv-02317-LHK, 5:11-cv-03416-LHK, 5:11-cv-04207-LHK, 5:11-cv-04542-LHK, 5:11-cv-04554-LHK, 5:11-cv-04555-LHK, 5:11-cv-04556-LHK, 5:11-cv-04557-LHK, 5:11-cv-04558-LHK, 5:11-cv-04559-LHK, 5:11-cv-04560-LHK, 5:12-cv-00162-LHK, 5:12-cv-00163-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
October 11, 2012 203 Featured Case ORDER re (103 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss and Response to Complaint filed by Anthony Chiu. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/11/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
September 27, 2012 202 NOTICE by Precious Arrington, Dustin Freeman, Cole Parr, Jared Parsley Notice of Disassociation of Counsel (Azita Moradmand) (Parisi, David) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
August 3, 2012 201 MOTION to Appear by Telephone (Request of Peter E. Seidman to Appear by Telephone) filed by Anthony Chiu. (Seidman, Peter) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
June 12, 2012 200 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Consolidation. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/12/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
April 25, 2012 199 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01-11-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
January 31, 2012 198 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jeff S. Westerman Removal of Sabrina S. Kim from this Case (Westerman, Jeff) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
December 5, 2011 197 Featured Case ORDER re (30 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) Stipulation Re: Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/5/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
October 17, 2011 196 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Chang (Chang, Nancy) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
September 28, 2011 195 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 191 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 194 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 190 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 193 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 189 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 192 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 188 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 191 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by TrafficMarketplace.com. Inc.. (Bateman, David) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 190 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Dustin Freeman. (Wilson, Jeremy) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 189 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Anthony Chiu. (Seidman, Peter) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 188 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Arun Gupta. (Scharg, Ari) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 9, 2011 187 Featured Case ORDER Regarding MDL Panel Conditional Transfer Order transferring tag-along actions to Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Koh on 9/9/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 7, 2011 186 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 185 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 6, 2011 185 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Anthony Chiu. (Clark, Melissa) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 184 Featured Case ORDER re 182 Notice (Other) filed by Eric Terrell. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/6/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 183 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 181 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 3, 2011 182 MOTION to Appear by Telephone by Eric Terrell (Terrell, Reginald) (Filed on 9/3/2011) Modified on 9/6/2011 counsel posted document using incorrect event type (dhm, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2011 181 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Dustin Freeman. (Wilson, Jeremy) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
August 25, 2011 180 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the action listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California is transferred to the Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending there and listed on Schedule A. *** Reference must be made to individual docket sheets for entries relating only to individual actions *** (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 19, 2011 179 Featured Case ORDER re 177 Permitting Hogan Lovells US LLP to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants Apple, Inc. and Quattro Wireless, Inc. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/19/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 19, 2011 178 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 175 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Melissa Clark. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 18, 2011 177 MOTION to Withdraw Hogal Lovells US LLP as Counsel of Record for Defendants Apple Inc. and Quattro Wireless, Inc., by Apple, Inc., Quattro Wireless, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2011) Modified text on 8/29/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2011 176 Proposed Order re 175 APPLICATION of Melissa Ryan Clark for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611063251) by Plaintiffs. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 10, 2011 175 APPLICATION of Melissa Ryan Clark for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611063251) filed by Plaintiffs. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 10, 2011 174 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/10/2011 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/10/2011). Further Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/10/2011)
August 10, 2011 9/1/2011 Motion Hearing continued to 9/8/2011 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/10/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 9, 2011 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Reginald Von Terrell (Terrell, Reginald) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 172 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 170 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 171 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 169 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 8, 2011 170 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Anthony Chiu. (Vu, Anne Marie) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 8, 2011 169 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Jonathan Lalo. (Audet, William) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 8, 2011 168 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 167 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 5, 2011 167 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Dustin Freeman. (Wilson, Jeremy) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 4, 2011 166 Featured Case ORDER Regarding August 10, 2011 Case Management Conference and September 1, 2011 Motion Hearing. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/4/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 165 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc re 160 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Wilson, Bryan) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 164 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc, Quattro Wireless, Inc. re 162 Case Management Statement (Wilson, Bryan) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 163 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter H Day (Day, Peter) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 162 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental Case Management Statement and [Proposed] Order filed by Apple, Inc, Quattro Wireless, Inc.. (Wilson, Bryan) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 161 Featured Case ORDER Requiring Parties to File Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/4/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 3, 2011 160 REPLY (re 142 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) ) filed byApple, Inc. (Wilson, Bryan) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 159 REPLY in Support of ( 145 MOTION to Dismiss First Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed by AdMarval, Inc, Admob, Inc, Flurry, Inc., Mellenial Media, MobClix, Pinch Media, Inc., Quattro Wireless, Inc., TrafficMarketplace.com. Inc.. (Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 8/3/2011) Modified text on 8/5/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2011 158 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 151 Motion to Relate Case. Case 11-03416 is related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
July 29, 2011 157 Featured Case ORDER re 154 Adopting Stipulation for 2-Day Extension to File Reply. Signed by Judge Koh on 7/29/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 29, 2011 156 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Quattro Wireless, Inc. re 154 Stipulation, 155 Declaration in Support, (Wilson, Bryan) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 29, 2011 155 Declaration of Bryan Wilson in Support of 154 Stipulation Joint Stipulation To Extend Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motions To Dismiss and [Proposed] Order filed byApple, Inc, Quattro Wireless, Inc.. (Related document(s) 154 ) (Wilson, Bryan) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 29, 2011 154 STIPULATION re 134 Order Joint Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule On Defendants' Motions To Dismiss and [Proposed] Order by Apple, Inc, Quattro Wireless, Inc.. (Wilson, Bryan) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 18, 2011 153 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION to 142 , 145 Defendants' MOTIONS to Dismiss, filed by Jonathan Lalo. (Kamber, Scott) (Filed on 7/18/2011) Modified on 7/20/2011 counsel posted document incorrectly as a motion and failed to link entry to related documents (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2011 152 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc re 151 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 18, 2011 151 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 12, 2011 150 Featured Case ORDER Adopting 149 Stipulation to file Over-Length Brief. Signed by Judge Koh on 7/12/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 12, 2011 149 STIPULATION for Permission to File an Over-Length Brief by Jonathan Lalo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Kreitenberg, Avi) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 7, 2011 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Avi Melech Kreitenberg Deborah Kravitz (Kreitenberg, Avi) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 6, 2011 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa Neet Burlison (Burlison, Teresa) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
June 20, 2011 146 Declaration of S. Ashlie Beringer in Support of 145 MOTION to Dismiss First Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byFlurry, Inc., Pinch Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 145 ) (Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 145 MOTION to Dismiss First Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by AdMarval, Inc, Admob, Inc, Flurry, Inc., Mellenial Media, MobClix, Pinch Media, Inc., Quattro Wireless, Inc., TrafficMarketplace.com. Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 7/18/2011. Replies due by 8/1/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 144 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc re 142 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7), 143 Declaration in Support,, (McCabe, James) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 143 Declaration of James F. McCabe in Support of 142 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) filed byApple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 142 ) (McCabe, James) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 142 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) filed by Apple, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 7/25/2011. Replies due by 8/1/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCabe, James) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 141 Certificate of Interested Entities by TrafficMarketplace.com. Inc. (Gold, Seth) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 16, 2011 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa Neet Burlison (Burlison, Teresa) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Alan Gold (Gold, Seth) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 10, 2011 138 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05-25-11, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2011. (las, ) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 137 Certificate of Interested Entities by MobClix identifying Corporate Parent Velti plc for MobClix. (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 8, 2011 136 NOTICE by Apple, Inc NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 6, 2011 135 NOTICE by Apple, Inc NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 3, 2011 134 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part 133 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Koh on 6/3/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 3, 2011 133 Proposed Order STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Admob, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Page Decl. In Support of Stipulation)(Page, Michael) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
May 31, 2011 132 Order Denying 72 Motion to Stay in case 5:10-cv-05878-LHK. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/31/2011. Associated Cases: 5:10-cv-05878-LHK, 5:10-cv-05881-LHK, 5:11-cv-00407-LHK, 5:11-cv-00700-LHK, 5:11-cv-01828-LHK, 5:11-cv-02110-LHK, 5:11-cv-02270-LHK, 5:11-cv-02317-LHK. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 27, 2011 130 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting (110) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:10-cv-05878-LHK. Cases 10-CV-02110, 11-CV-02270 and 11-CV-02317 are related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 26, 2011 129 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; denying (80) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:10-cv-05878-LHK. Case 11-CV-02167 is not related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 25, 2011 131 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/25/2011 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 5/25/2011), Motion Hearing held on 5/25/2011 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 5/25/2011) re (72 in 5:10-cv-05878-LHK) MOTION to Stay Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay Proceedings and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Apple, Inc. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/25/2011)
May 24, 2011 128 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 123 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 127 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 116 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 126 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 122 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 125 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 124 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of David Bateman. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 23, 2011 124 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney David A. Bateman ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009738.) filed by TrafficMarketplace.com. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 23, 2011 123 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by TrafficMarketplace.com. Inc.. (Davidson, Rachel) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 23, 2011 122 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by NPR. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (Friedman, Mali) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 23, 2011 121 Certificate of Interested Entities by Quattro Wireless, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Apple Inc. for Quattro Wireless, Inc.. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 20, 2011 120 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pinch Media, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Flurry, Inc. for Pinch Media, Inc.. DEFENDANT PINCH MEDIA, INC.S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Lees, Gail) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 20, 2011 119 Certificate of Interested Entities by Flurry, Inc. DEFENDANT FLURRY, INC.S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Lees, Gail) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 20, 2011 118 STIPULATION re 71 Amended Complaint, JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR CERTAIN DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by AdMarval, Inc, Mellenial Media. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 20, 2011 117 Featured Case ORDER Seeking Additional Information re 80 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Flurry, Inc. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/20/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 19, 2011 116 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Precious Arrington, Dustin Freeman, Cole Parr, Jared Parsley. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (Wilson, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Charlson Notice of Appearance on behalf of Defendant Quattro Wireless, Inc. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 114 STIPULATION Stipulation Extending Defendant Quattro Wireless, Inc.'s Time to Respond to Consolidated Complaint by Quattro Wireless, Inc.. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 113 NOTICE by Apple, Inc Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 112 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 110 Motion to Relate Cases, 111 Proposed Order by Apple, Inc (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/19/2011) Modified on 5/20/2011 counsel failed to link entry to document #110, 111 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2011 111 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related by Apple, Inc. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 110 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 109 Featured Case ORDER Granting 93 Defendant Apple's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/19/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel R. Davidson for TrafficMarketplace.com (Davidson, Rachel) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 107 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mellenial Media DEFENDANT MILLENNIAL MEDIA INC.S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND STATEMENT OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 106 Letter from Michael L. Charlson Letter from Michael L. Charlson to Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 18, 2011 105 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Initial Joint Case Management Statement filed by Apple, Inc. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 18, 2011 104 Declaration of GAIL E. LEES IN SUPPORT OF 102 STIPULATED AGREEMENT FOR AN ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS FLURRY, INC. AND PINCH MEDIA, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FIRST CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Flurry, Inc.. (Lees, Gail) (Filed on 5/18/2011) Modified on 5/20/2011 linking entry to document #102 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2011 103 Proposed Order APPROVING STIPULATED AGREEMENT TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS FLURRY, INC. AND PINCH MEDIA, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FIRST CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Flurry, Inc.. (Lees, Gail) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 18, 2011 102 STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS FLURRY, INC. AND PINCH MEDIA, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FIRST CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Flurry, Inc.. (Lees, Gail) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 18, 2011 101 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AdMarval, Inc re 100 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 18, 2011 100 Certificate of Interested Entities by AdMarval, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Opera Software USA, Corporate Parent Opera Software ASA for AdMarval, Inc. DEFENDANT ADMARVEL, INC.S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND STATEMENT OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSON (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 18, 2011 99 REPLY (re 72 MOTION to Stay Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay Proceedings and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byApple, Inc. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 17, 2011 98 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan Lalo re 97 Opposition/Response to Motion (Audet, William) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 17, 2011 97 RESPONSE (re 93 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint ) filed byJonathan Lalo. (Audet, William) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 17, 2011 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Carter Winford Ott (Ott, Carter) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 16, 2011 95 Proposed Order re 93 Granting Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint by Apple, Inc. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/16/2011) Modified on 5/20/2011 counsel failed to link entry to document #93 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2011 94 Declaration of Maren J. Clouse in Support of 93 Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple, Inc. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/16/2011) Modified on 5/20/2011 counsel failed to link entry to document #93 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2011 93 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple, Inc. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 13, 2011 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Dean Brown NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR AdMarvel, Inc. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Dean Brown NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR MILLENNIAL MEDIA INC. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 90 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION to ( 72 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Jonathan Lalo. (Kamber, Scott) (Filed on 5/13/2011) Modified text on 5/20/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2011 89 Joinder in 72 Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Flurry, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 5/13/2011) Modified on 5/20/2011 counsel failed to link entry to document #72 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2011 88 Joinder re 72 MOTION to Stay Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay Proceedings and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Admob, Inc. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 87 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc Defendant Apple Inc.'s Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 12, 2011 86 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint; Summons served on AdMarvel, Inc. on 5/9/2011, filed by Jonathan Lalo. (Audet, William) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 12, 2011 85 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint; Summons served on Millennial Media, Inc. on 5/9/2011, filed by Jonathan Lalo. (Audet, William) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 12, 2011 84 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint; Summons served on TrafficMarketplace.com, Inc. on 5/11/2011, filed by Jonathan Lalo. (Audet, William) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 12, 2011 83 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint; Summons served on MobClix, Inc. on 5/9/2011, filed by Jonathan Lalo. (Audet, William) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 12, 2011 82 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint; Summons; served on Google Inc. d/b/a Admob, Inc on 5/9/2011, filed by Jonathan Lalo. (Audet, William) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 12, 2011 81 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Consolidating Case by Apple, Inc. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 11, 2011 80 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Flurry, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit King Complaint)(Beringer, Susan) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 11, 2011 79 Certificate of Interested Entities by Admob, Inc. (AdMob, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Google Inc.) (Page, Michael) (Filed on 5/11/2011) Modified text on 5/12/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2011 78 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond re 71 Amended Complaint by Admob, Inc. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 5/11/2011) Modified text on 5/12/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2011 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Henry Page (Page, Michael) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 6, 2011 76 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting (68) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:10-cv-05878-LHK.Case 11-cv-01828 is related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 5, 2011 75 Summons Issued as to Mellenial Media, MobClix, AdMarval, Inc. as to 71 First Consolidated Class Action Complaint (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 5, 2011 74 Featured Case ORDER Expediting Motion Hearing re Defendant Apple's Motion to Stay and Setting Briefing Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2011 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/5/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 5, 2011 73 Proposed Order re 72 Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Stay Proceedings by Apple, Inc. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/5/2011) Modified on 5/16/2011 counsel failed to link entry to document #72 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2011 72 MOTION to Stay Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay Proceedings and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Apple, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
April 21, 2011 71 FIRST CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT inter alia, against Apple, Inc. Filed by Jonathan Lalo. (Stampley, David) (Filed on 4/21/2011) Modified on 5/5/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2011 70 NOTICE by Apple, Inc Notice of Pendency of Other Action (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 14, 2011 69 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc re 68 MOTION to Relate Case (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 14, 2011 68 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 7, 2011 66 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Case Schedule. Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2011 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Koh on 4/7/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
April 7, 2011 65 Featured Case ORDER Appointing Interim Class Counsel and Executive Committee. Signed by Judge Koh on 4/7/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
April 6, 2011 67 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/6/2011 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 4/6/2011). (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/6/2011)
April 4, 2011 64 Memorandum of Law in Further Support of 45 Recommendation that Milberg LLP be Appointed Interim Class Counsel, and in Opposition to the Motion Filed by the Kamberlaw Group filed by Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Related document(s) 45 ) (Westerman, Jeff) (Filed on 4/4/2011) Modified text on 4/7/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2011 63 RESPONSE to re 45 Brief, iPhone Plaintiffs' Group Opposition To Plaintiff Anthony Chiu's Recommendation by Jonathan Lalo. (Kamber, Scott) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 62 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Koh granting 56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Peter Seidman. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 61 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Koh granting 59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy Wilson.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 1, 2011 58 Featured Case ORDER re (49 in 5:10-cv-05878-LHK) granting reqest to appear by telephone filed by Anthony Chiu. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/1/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011) Modified text on 4/3/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2011 55 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting (50) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:10-cv-05878-LHK (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 30, 2011 57 Proposed Order re 56 APPLICATION of Peter E. Seidman for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009383.) by Anthony Chiu. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 30, 2011 56 APPLICATION of Peter E. Seidman for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009383.) filed by Anthony Chiu. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 30, 2011 54 Statement JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT by Apple, Inc. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 30, 2011 53 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Koh granting 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Marc Zwillinger. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 30, 2011 52 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Koh granting 40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Scott Kamber. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 30, 2011 51 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Koh granting 38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of David Stampley. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 30, 2011 50 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference on April 6, 2011 filed by Precious Arrington, Dustin Freeman, Cole Parr, Jared Parsley. (Moradmand, Azita) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 30, 2011 49 Request to Appear by Telephone by Anthony Chiu (Westerman, Jeff) (Filed on 3/30/2011) Modified text on 4/5/2011 counsel posted document using incorrect event type (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2011 60 Proposed Order re 59 APPLICATION of Jeremy R. Wilson for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611058067) by Dustin Freeman. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 59 APPLICATION of Jeremy R. Wilson for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611058067) filed by Dustin Freeman. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 48 ERRATA RE HEARING DATE by Jonathan Lalo. (Audet, William) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 26, 2011 47 EXHIBITS re 46 Brief i/s/o iPhone Plaintiffs' Group Leadership Structure Recommendation filed byJonathan Lalo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh 1(A-1) KamberLaw Firm Resume, # 2 Exhibit Exh 1(A-2) Lockridge Grindal Nauen Resume, # 3 Exhibit Exh B Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit Exh 2 W. Audet Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exh 3 J. Wilson Declaration)(Related document(s) 46 ) (Stampley, David) (Filed on 3/26/2011)
March 25, 2011 46 NOTICE OF MOTION and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of the Consensus Recommendation for Entry of an Order Appointing Kamber Interim Class Counsel and an Executive Committee re 36 Stipulation and Order, filed by Jonathan Lalo. (Related document(s) 36 ) (Stampley, David) (Filed on 3/25/2011) Modified on 4/4/2011 counsel posted document incorrectly as a brief (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2011 45 Recommendation that Milberg LLP be Appointed Interim Class Counsel, Submitted Pursuant to 36 Court Order Dated March 15, 2011 filed by Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 36 ) (Westerman, Jeff) (Filed on 3/25/2011) Modified text on 4/4/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2011 44 Proposed Order re 43 APPLICATION of Marc J. Zwillinger for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009350) by New York Times Co.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 25, 2011 43 APPLICATION of Marc J. Zwillinger for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009350) filed by New York Times Co.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 24, 2011 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Genevieve Patricia Rosloff Michael H. Page and Joseph C. Gratz for Dictionary.com and Yelp (Rosloff, Genevieve) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 23, 2011 41 Proposed Order re 40 APPLICATION of Scott A. Kamber for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009335) by Jonathan Lalo. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 23, 2011 40 APPLICATION of Scott A. Kamber for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009335) filed by Jonathan Lalo. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 23, 2011 39 Proposed Order re 38 APPLICATION of David A. Stampley for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009335) by Jonathan Lalo. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 23, 2011 38 APPLICATION of David A. Stampley for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009335) filed by Jonathan Lalo. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 18, 2011 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurence F. Pulgram , Tyler Newby and Guinevere Jobson, FENWICK & WEST LLP, on behalf of Groupon, Inc. -- (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 15, 2011 36 Featured Case ORDER re 33 Adopting Stipulation to Consolidate Related Cases, as Modified by the Court. The Related Cases: 10-cv-5878-LHK, 10-cv-5881-LHK, 11-cv-0407-LHK, and 11-cv-0700-LHK shall be consolidated into a single case in Lalo v. Apple, 10-cv-5878-LHK. As specified in this Order, the Consolidated Action shall bear the following caption: In re iPhone Application Litigation, No. 10-CV-5878 LHK (PSG). Signed by Judge Koh on 3/15/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011) ** For Further Docket Entries See Lead Consolidated Action C10-05878 LHK ** Modified text on 3/18/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2011 Motions terminated: 28 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/15/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 11, 2011 35 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASES. 11-00407 and 11-00700 are related to this case. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/11/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 9, 2011 34 *** FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE OF DOCKET # 33 . *** STIPULATION and [Proposed] Case Management Order No. 1 by Anthony Chiu. (Westerman, Jeff) (Filed on 3/9/2011) Modified on 3/10/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2011 33 STIPULATION AND [Proposed] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 by Jonathan Lalo. (Kreitenberg, Avi) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
February 23, 2011 32 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, to extend time to respond by The Weather Channel. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 31 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, to extend time to respond by Backflip. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 30 NOTICE by Apple, Inc NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 18, 2011 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc re 28 MOTION to Relate Case (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 28 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 27 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 17, 2011 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dictionary.Com re 25 Stipulation (Page, Michael) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 17, 2011 25 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond by Dictionary.Com. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 17, 2011 24 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT APPLE, INC. TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Apple, Inc. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 16, 2011 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pandora, Inc re 22 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (Page, Michael) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 16, 2011 22 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, to extend time to respond by Pandora, Inc. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 10, 2011 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Weather Channel re 19 Notice of Appearance of Cooley LLP on Behalf of The Weather Channel (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Backflip re 18 Notice of Appearance of Cooley LLP on Behalf of Backflip Studios, Inc. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 9, 2011 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes and Matthew D. Brown on Behalf of the Weather Channel (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 9, 2011 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes and Matthew D. Brown, Cooley LLP, on Behalf of Backflip Studios, Inc. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 9, 2011 17 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Koh granting 12 Motion of Clayton James for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 9, 2011 16 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Koh granting 10 Motion of Christopher Wolf for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 8, 2011 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Henry Page (Page, Michael) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 7, 2011 15 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 9 Motion to Relate Case. Case 10-CV-05881 is related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
January 31, 2011 13 Proposed Order re 12 APPLICATION of Clayton C. James for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009031) by Apple, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 31, 2011 12 APPLICATION of Clayton C. James for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009031) filed by Apple, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 31, 2011 11 Proposed Order re 10 APPLICATION of Christopher Wolf for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009030) by Apple, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 31, 2011 10 APPLICATION of Christopher Wolf for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009030) filed by Apple, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 28, 2011 9 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 27, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 1/27/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 26, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. 7 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: 3/29/2011 2:00 PM Case Management Conference VACATED. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 6 *** FILED IN WRONG CASE. NO NEW DOCUMENT. *** NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Charlson (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 1/26/2011) Modified on 1/27/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2011 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc Statement Declining to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Charlson (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
December 23, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2010: # 1 Standing Order for Civil Practice in Cases Assigned for All Purposes to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal, # 2 U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal Settlement Conference Procedures, # 3 Standing Order for All San Jose Judges) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2010: # 4 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California) (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 2 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc, Backflip, Dictionary.Com, Pandora, Inc, The Weather Channel. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010) (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 1 Class Action Complaint (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Apple, Inc, Backflip, Dictionary.Com, Pandora, Inc, The Weather Channel ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 346110054286.). Filed by Jonathan Lalo. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2010: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lalo v. Apple, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Weather Channel
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GogII, Inc
Represented By: Sascha Von Mende Henry
Represented By: Jonathan David Moss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OUTFIT7, Ltd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Room Candy, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunstorm Interactive, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flurry, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Ashlie Beringer
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Jessen
Represented By: Gail E. Lees
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medialets, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinch Media, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quattro Wireless, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAC/InterActiveCorp.
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Rosloff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupon, Inc.
Represented By: Guinevere Louise Jobson
Represented By: Tyler Griffin Newby
Represented By: Laurence F. Pulgram
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NPR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Times Co.
Represented By: Jennifer Stisa Granick
Represented By: Marc J. Zwillinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webmd Health Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jiyoun Chung
Represented By: James Donato
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yelp!, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Rosloff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dictionary.com
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Rosloff
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pandora, Inc
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc
Represented By: Christopher Wolf
Represented By: Clayton .C. James
Represented By: Michael L. Charlson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Backflip
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Freeman
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: Nabil Majed Nachawati, II
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Parsley
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: Nabil Majed Nachawati, II
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cole Parr
Represented By: Nabil Majed Nachawati, II
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precious Arrington
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Nabil Majed Nachawati, II
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Chiu
Represented By: Sabrina S. Kim
Represented By: Peter E. Seidman
Represented By: Jeff S. Westerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rodimer
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arfat Adil
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emili Clar
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerod Couch
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Davis
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Hines
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego Lopez
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Mulvey
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna M. Ruston
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gena Terry
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Lalo
Represented By: David A. Stampley
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: William M. Audet
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]