Meguerian v. Apple, Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff: Garen Meguerian
Defendant: Apple, Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv01758
Filed: April 11, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2013 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. The hearing on final approval of class action settlement is scheduled for 10/18/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/2/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
April 11, 2011 1 Alleged Class Action Complaint (Summons Issued); jury demand; COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611058506). Filed by Garen Meguerian. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
April 11, 2011 2 AFFIDAVIT of Garen Meguerian filed by Garen Meguerian. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
June 17, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION OF CASES re 23 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/8/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
July 8, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND REVISED STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION OF CASES re (20 in 5:11-cv-01989-JF) Stipulation filed by Heather Silversmith, Kathleen Koffman, Lauren Scott, (32 in 5:11-cv-01758-JF) Stipulation filed by Garen Meguerian. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/5/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
April 11, 2011 3 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
August 12, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE FOR ROBERTA D. LIEBENBERG (Filing Fee $275, receipt number 34611061492, Docket 28 in Consolidated Case Number CV-11-2394-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/4/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
April 11, 2011 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/28/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/5/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Howard R. Lloyd Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes, # 2 Standing Orders for San Jose Division Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
November 29, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Enlarge Time to file Reply Brief re 58 Stipulation. Apple's Reply Brief in support of the Motion to Stay Discovery is extended to 12/5/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/29/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
February 15, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Edward J. Davila denying (56) Motion to Stay, vacating hearing, and continuing case management conference.Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-01758-EJD, 5:11-cv-01989-EJD, 5:11-cv-02394-EJD(ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2012)
March 21, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Based on the parties' Joint Case Management Statement, the court finds that a Case Management Conference would be premature at this time. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/21/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
February 4, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT; SETTING HEARING ON PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. Having reviewed the parties Joint Case Management Statement (see Docket Item No. 85), the court has determined that a scheduling conference is unnecessary at this time. Accordi ngly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for February 8, 2013, is VACATED. Motion due by 2/15/2013. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Motions terminated: 86 MOT ION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Garen Meguerian, 87 MOTION to Appear by Telephone PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Garen Meguerian. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/4/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meguerian v. Apple, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garen Meguerian
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Represented By: Benjamin G. Edelman
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Represented By: Simon Bahne Paris
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Joshua D. Snyder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc
Represented By: Stuart Christopher Plunkett
Represented By: Penelope A. Preovolos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]