Boy Racer, Inc v. Does 1-52

Plaintiff: Boy Racer, Inc
Defendant: Does 1-52
 
Case Number: 5:2011cv02329
Filed: May 11, 2011
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Further Discovery; ORDER to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 13, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
November 16, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 22 Motion for Certificate of Appealability (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
March 8, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 3/23/2012. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 3/8/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
May 4, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISSOLVING ORDERS TO SHOW CAUSE AND DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 17 26 Orders. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 4, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 31, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE, re 6 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 31, 2011.(psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Boy Racer, Inc v. Does 1-52
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boy Racer, Inc
Represented By: Brett Langdon Gibbs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-52
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]