Doe I et al v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al Featured Case

Chinese Falun Gong practitioners filed a lawsuit against Cisco, the company's CEO John Chambers, two Cisco China executives, and others, alleging violations of the Alien Torts Statute for designing, supplying, and maintaining China's 'Golden Shield' electronic censorship and surveillance network with Cisco's 'policenet' system.

The civil lawsuit seeks compensatory and punitive damages from Cisco, accusing the tech company of aiding and abetting or conspiring with the Chinese Communist Party and Chinese Public Security forces, resulting in crimes against humanity, prolonged and arbitrary detention, torture, killing, wrongful death, false imprisonment, assault, battery, and more.

Defendant: Thomas Lam, Cisco Systems, Inc., John Chambers and Owen Chan
Plaintiff: Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Doe I, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII, Liu Guifu, Doe II and Ivy He
 
Case Number: 5:2011cv02449
Filed: May 19, 2011
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2012 84 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' Joint Statement, the court finds a that a Case Management Conference is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference currently scheduled for March 23, 2012, is CONTINUED to 10/12/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2012. Defendants' request to appear telephonically (see Docket Item No. 83) is TERMINATED AS MOOT. Motions terminated: 83 Motion to Appear by Telephone filed by John Chambers, Owen Chan, Fredy Cheung, Cisco Systems, Inc., Thomas Lam. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/20/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 16, 2012 83 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by John Chambers, Owen Chan, Fredy Cheung, Cisco Systems, Inc., Thomas Lam. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 16, 2012 82 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (Boyd, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
February 13, 2012 81 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING 2/17/2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
February 8, 2012 80 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT And Request For Continuance Of Case Management Conference filed by John Chambers, Owen Chan, Fredy Cheung, Cisco Systems, Inc., Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Thomas Lam, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
January 19, 2012 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 1/19/12. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 7/26/12 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific. Please note that the call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
November 9, 2011 79 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 76 Motion to Reschedule Briefing. The court orders the Clerk of the Court to TERMINATE Defendants Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint 67 without prejudice to such motion being re-filed. The associated motion hearing scheduled for February 17, 2012, is VACATED. The Case Management Conference for that date remains as currently scheduled. The Clerk of the Court shall also TERMINATE Defendants Motion to Dismiss the original Complaint 49 as such motion is now moot. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/10/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 8, 2011 78 PARTIAL OPPOSITION (re 76 to Plaintiffs' Motion for Admin Relief filed by John Chambers, Owen Chan, Fredy Cheung, Cisco Systems, Inc., Thomas Lam. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 11/8/2011) Modified on 11/10/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2011 77 Proposed Order re 76 MOTION to Reschedule Briefing Pursuant to N.D. Cal. Local Rule 7-11 by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (Boyd, Kathryn) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 4, 2011 76 MOTION to Reschedule Briefing Pursuant to N.D. Cal. Local Rule 7-11 filed by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. Responses due by 11/8/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rajika Shah)(Boyd, Kathryn) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
October 11, 2011 75 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE: SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON NEWLY ADDED DEFENDANT FREDY CHEUNG re 72 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/11/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 11, 2011 74 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS re 73 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 67 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected First Amended Complaint : Opposition due by 11/18/2011. Reply due by 1/16/2012. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/11/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 10, 2011 73 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR 67 MOTION TO DISMISS by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen Nelson ISO (Boyd, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/10/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011,(link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2011 72 STIPULATION RE: SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON NEWLY ADDED DEFENDANT FREDY CHEUNG by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (Boyd, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/10/2011)
October 7, 2011 71 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/10/2012. Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
September 30, 2011 70 Order Granting 64 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Judith Brown Chomsky. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 9/30/2011.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 27, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated: terminated Motion Hearing before Judge Fogel re 67 Motion To Dismiss; case has been transferred to another district judge. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 27, 2011 69 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Judge Jeremy Fogel no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 09/27/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 23, 2011 68 Declaration of John (Hejun) Chu in Support of 67 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected First Amended Complaint filed byJohn Chambers, Owen Chan, Fredy Cheung, Cisco Systems, Inc., Thomas Lam. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1-16)(Related document(s) 67 ) (Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 67 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected First Amended Complaint filed by John Chambers, Owen Chan, Fredy Cheung, Cisco Systems, Inc., Thomas Lam. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Responses due by 10/12/2011. Replies due by 11/14/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 66 Summons Issued as to Fredy Cheung also known as Zhang Sihua. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 16, 2011 63 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (Boyd, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 2, 2011 62 ERRATA to 61 First Amended Complaint by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected First Amended Complaint)(Boyd, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/2/2011) Modified on 9/7/2011 (gm, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2011 61 AMENDED COMPLAINT pursuant to F.R.C.P. 15(a)(1)(B) against John Chambers, Owen Chan, Cisco Systems, Inc., Thomas Lam, Fredy Cheung. Filed byIvy He, Doe III, Doe V, Charles Lee, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Roe VIII, Doe II, Roe VII, Doe IV, Doe I. (Boyd, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
August 25, 2011 60 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: EXTENDING PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. RULE 15(a)(1)(B) (approving 59 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/25/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 24, 2011 59 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re: Extending Plaintiffs' Time to File a First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 15(a)(1)(B) by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (Boyd, Kathryn) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 23, 2011 58 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING AUGUST 26, 2001, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 57 ). The Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2011 is CONTINUED to 9/23/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/23/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 22, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Robin W. Siefkin on 8/22/11. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 1/19/2012 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that all parties shall call 712-775-7300 and use access code 847955 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 19, 2011 57 STIPULATION Re: Rescheduling August 26, 2011 Case Management Conference by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (Boyd, Kathryn) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 8, 2011 56 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 8, 2011 55 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 8/22/11 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 712-775-7300 and use access code 847955 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 5, 2011 54 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Boyd, Kathryn) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 5, 2011 53 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Boyd, Kathryn) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 4, 2011 52 NOTICE by John Chambers, Owen Chan, Cisco Systems, Inc., Thomas Lam Rule 44.1 Notice of Intent to Raise Issue of Foreign Law on Motion to Dismiss (Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 51 Certificate of Interested Entities by John Chambers, Owen Chan, Cisco Systems, Inc., Thomas Lam (Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 50 Declaration of John (Hejun) Chu in Support of Defendants' 49 Motion to Dismiss filed byJohn Chambers, Owen Chan, Cisco Systems, Inc., Thomas Lam. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 16)(Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 8/4/2011) Modified on 8/8/2011 (gm, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2011 49 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by John Chambers, Owen Chan, Cisco Systems, Inc., Thomas Lam. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Responses due by 10/12/2011. Replies due by 11/14/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 48 NOTICE by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII re 39 Notice (Other) Opposition to Notice of Pendency of Related Action or Proceeding (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Opposition)(Boyd, Kathryn) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
July 28, 2011 47 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXCEED APPLICABLE PAGE LIMIT (granting 43 ). (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 27, 2011 46 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Kathleen Marie Sullivan (Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 26, 2011 45 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY AND THROUGH NEXT FRIEND (approving 38 ). Motions terminated: 2 , 5 , 27 , 28 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/26/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 44 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 37 ). The Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2011 is CONTINUED to 8/26/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/26/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 22, 2011 43 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 42 STIPULATION and proposed Order to Exceed Applicable Page Limit by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 41 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 43 . *** Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 7/22/2011) Modified on 7/22/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2011 40 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 42 . *** STIPULATION and proposed Order to Exceed Applicable Page Limit by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 7/22/2011) Modified on 7/22/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2011 39 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Pendency of Related Action or Proceeding (Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 21, 2011 38 STIPULATION and proposed Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Motions to Proceed Anonymously and Through Next Friend by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 21, 2011 37 STIPULATION and proposed Order Rescheduling Case Management Conference by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 21, 2011 36 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Isaac Nesser (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 21, 2011 35 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Faith E. Gay (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 1, 2011 34 Letter Brief re 29 Letter Brief, Opposition to Defendants' Letter Brief filed byDoe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rajika Shah, # 2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Boyd, Kathryn) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 27, 2011 33 Proposed Order re 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 54611009931.) by John Chambers, Owen Chan, Cisco Systems, Inc., Thomas Lam. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 32 MOTION for Attorney Isaac Nesser for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 54611009931.) filed by John Chambers, Owen Chan, Cisco Systems, Inc., Thomas Lam. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 31 Proposed Order re 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 54611009931.) by John Chambers, Owen Chan, Cisco Systems, Inc., Thomas Lam. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 30 MOTION for Attorney Faith E. Gay for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 54611009931.) filed by John Chambers, Owen Chan, Cisco Systems, Inc., Thomas Lam. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 29 Letter Brief re 2 MOTION Nortice of Motion and Motion to Commence and Proceed as Pseudonymous Plaintiffs, 5 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion to Commerce and Proceed Through Appointed Next Friend filed byCisco Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2 , 5 ) (Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 21, 2011 28 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 MOTION Nortice of Motion and Motion to Commence and Proceed as Pseudonymous Plaintiffs filed by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Responses due by 7/5/2011. Replies due by 7/12/2011. (Shah, Rajika) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 27 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 5 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion to Commerce and Proceed Through Appointed Next Friend filed by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Responses due by 7/5/2011. Replies due by 7/12/2011. (Shah, Rajika) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 20, 2011 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Marie Sullivan for Cisco Systems, Inc., John Chambers, Thomas Lam, Owen Chan (Sullivan, Kathleen) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 17, 2011 25 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Re: Proof of Service of Process and Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Shah, Rajika) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 24 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Terri Marsh (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 23 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Brian Pierce (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 7, 2011 22 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
May 26, 2011 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery matters. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 24, 2011 21 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 5/24/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 20, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. 20 TERMINATING 8/9/2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 20, 2011 20 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: 8/9/2011 Case Management Conference is hereby vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 20, 2011 18 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (Shah, Rajika) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 19, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 19 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order for Civil Practice in Cases Assigned for All Purposes to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal, # 2 U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal Settlement Conference Procedures, # 3 Standing Order for San Jose Division Judges, # 4 Standing Orders for Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 17 Summons Issued as to Owen Chan. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 16 Summons Issued as to Thomas Lam (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 15 Summons Issued as to Cisco Systems, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 14 Summons Issued as to John Chambers. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 13 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Terri Marsh for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re 12 by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011).
May 19, 2011 12 Application for Admission of Attorney Terri Marsh for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009710) filed by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 11 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Brian Pierce for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re 10 by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 10 Application for Admission of Attorney Brian Pierce for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009709) filed by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 9 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to L.R> 3-16 by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 8 Declaration of Roe III in Support of Motion to Commence and Proceed Through Appointed Next Friend re 5 filed by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 7 Declaration of Terri Marsh in Support of Motion to Commence and Proceed Through Appointed Next Friend re 5 filed by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 6 (Proposed) Order Granting Motion to Commerce and Proceed Through Appointed Next Friend re 5 by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 5 Notice of Motion and Motion to Commence and Proceed Through Appointed Next Friend filed by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 4 Declaration of Terri Marsh in Support of Motion to Commence and Proceed as Pseudonymous Plaintiffs re 2 filed by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to Declaration)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 3 (Proposed) Order Granting Motion to Commence and Proceed as Pseudonymous Plaintiffs re 2 and Motion to Commence and Proceed as Pseudonymous Plaintiffs by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 2 Notice of Motion and Motion to Commence and Proceed as Pseudonymous Plaintiffs filed by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe IV, Doe V, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Ivy He, Charles Lee, Roe VII, Roe VIII. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 1 Alleged Class Action Complaint (Summons Issued); jury demand; COMPLAINT against John Chambers, Owen Chan, Cisco Systems, Inc., Thomas Lam ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611009711). Filed by Ivy He, Doe III, Doe V, Charles Lee, Doe VI, Liu Guifu, Roe VIII, Doe II, Roe VII, Doe IV, Doe I. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Doe I et al v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Lam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chambers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owen Chan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe III
Represented By: Brian Pierce
Represented By: Terri Marsh
Represented By: Kathryn Lee Boyd
Represented By: Rajika Lynn Shah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe IV
Represented By: Kathryn Lee Boyd
Represented By: Terri Marsh
Represented By: Brian Pierce
Represented By: Rajika Lynn Shah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe V
Represented By: Kathryn Lee Boyd
Represented By: Terri Marsh
Represented By: Brian Pierce
Represented By: Rajika Lynn Shah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe VI
Represented By: Kathryn Lee Boyd
Represented By: Terri Marsh
Represented By: Brian Pierce
Represented By: Rajika Lynn Shah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe I
Represented By: Kathryn Lee Boyd
Represented By: Terri Marsh
Represented By: Brian Pierce
Represented By: Rajika Lynn Shah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lee
Represented By: Kathryn Lee Boyd
Represented By: Terri Marsh
Represented By: Brian Pierce
Represented By: Rajika Lynn Shah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roe VII
Represented By: Kathryn Lee Boyd
Represented By: Terri Marsh
Represented By: Brian Pierce
Represented By: Rajika Lynn Shah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roe VIII
Represented By: Kathryn Lee Boyd
Represented By: Terri Marsh
Represented By: Brian Pierce
Represented By: Rajika Lynn Shah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liu Guifu
Represented By: Kathryn Lee Boyd
Represented By: Terri Marsh
Represented By: Brian Pierce
Represented By: Rajika Lynn Shah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe II
Represented By: Rajika Lynn Shah
Represented By: Brian Pierce
Represented By: Terri Marsh
Represented By: Kathryn Lee Boyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivy He
Represented By: Rajika Lynn Shah
Represented By: Brian Pierce
Represented By: Terri Marsh
Represented By: Kathryn Lee Boyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]