Bernard v. Does 1-5

Plaintiff: Don Bernard
Defendant: Does 1-5
Case Number: 5:2011cv03414
Filed: July 12, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AND REQUESTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING ON MOTION TO DISMISS re 13 , 21 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on January 2, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2012)
January 12, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO ACCESS ELECTRONIC FILING SYSTEM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on January 12, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
February 16, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 13 , 21 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on February 16, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
April 4, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME UNTIL MAY 11, 2012 re 51 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on April 4, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
September 11, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS re 56 , 62 by Judge Ronald M. Whyte (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernard v. Does 1-5
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Bernard
Represented By: Diane M. Barker
Represented By: John David van Loben Sels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]