Brkic v. Facebook, Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff Lana Brkic alleged that Defendant Facebook, Inc. tracked, collected and stores its users' wire or electronic communications, including portions of their internet browsing history even when the users were not logged-in to Facebook, in violation of Title III f the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 as amended by the Electronic Communications Privacy Act of 1986.

Plaintiff: Lana Brkic
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv04935
Filed: October 5, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2011 13 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE. This case is STAYED until either (1) thirty (30) days after the MDL Panel has issued a ruling on the currently pending motion for coordination or consolidation, or (2) March 30, 2012, whichever date occurs earlier. The parties may apply for an extension of this temporary stay should the circumstances so require.. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/16/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 15, 2011 Pursuant to Signed Related Case Order ( 12 ). Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery matters. Judge Ronald M. Whyte and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 12 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE. RELATED CASE ORDER. 5:11-cv-04834-EJD Davis et al v. Facebook, Inc. and 5:11-cv-04935-RMW Brkic-vFacebook, Inc ARE RELATED. Related cases: Related cases: Create association to 5:11-cv-04834-EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/15/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
October 31, 2011 11 NOTICE OF FILING OF DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.S STIPULATED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION (CIV. L.R. 3-12) IN DAVIS V. FACEBOOK, INC., CASE NO. 11-CV-04834 (N.D. CAL.) by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit A-4)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 10/31/2011) Modified on 11/3/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2011 10 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING by Lana Brkic (Doyle, Conal) (Filed on 10/28/2011) Modified on 11/3/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 10/21/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 20, 2011 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 19, 2011 7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Facebook, Inc. DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A UNITED STATES DISTRICT JUDGE. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 19, 2011 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.S FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-16 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 19, 2011 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Dean Brown Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. (Michael G. Rhodes, Matthew D. Brown, Jeffrey M. Gutkin) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 5, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/15/2011. Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 3 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Lana Brkic (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 1 Alleged Class Action Complaint (Summons Issued; jury demand; against Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611007723). Filed by Lana Brkic. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brkic v. Facebook, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana Brkic
Represented By: Conal Fergus Doyle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Jeffrey Gutkin
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]