Kane v. Chobani, Inc

Plaintiff: Katie Kane
Defendant: Chobani, Inc
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv02425
Filed: May 14, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2013 113 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 111 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
July 3, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 3, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 12, 2013 125 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 15, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 44 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
July 25, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING JULY 12, 2013 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS; CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 30, 2013 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES JULY 29, 2013 STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 30, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
August 2, 2013 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion to Disqualify Counsel ; finding as moot 85 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 14, 2013 144 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 137 Motion for Leave to File.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
September 9, 2013 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 19, 2013 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 146 Motion for Reconsideration (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
February 20, 2014 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 158 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
September 10, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 28 *** Order on Joint Stipulation re: Response Date to Amended Class Action Complaint, and Continuing the Case Management Conference and Related Dates by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 15 Stipulation. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012) Modified on 9/10/2012 (lhklc1, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Joint Stipulation re: Response Date to Amended Class Action Complaint, and Continuing the Case Management Conference and Related Dates. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 10, 2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 27
September 28, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
October 2, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 31 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
November 27, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on November 27, 2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
February 12, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 45 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
February 20, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 21, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 21, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 21, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 57 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
March 19, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 70 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
April 15, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 82 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 24, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 93 Motion for Leave to File.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kane v. Chobani, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Kane
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chobani, Inc
Represented By: Dale Joseph Giali
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]