Siegel v. Hewlett-Packard Company

Plaintiff: Peter Siegel
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv03787
Filed: July 19, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 38 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER (AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT) to continue the hearing on Defendant's motion for Summary Judgment to June 25, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on April 22, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
June 6, 2013 42 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER (AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT) continuing briefing schedule and hearing on motion for summary judgment. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on June 6, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
July 16, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment. Opposition due by 8/6/2013. Reply due by 8/13/2013. Motion Hearing continued to 8/27/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floo r, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 45 MOTION to Continue Motion for Summary Judgment and to Extend Discovery FRCP Rule 6 and 56(d). Motion terminated as mo ot: 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Briefing Deadlines MSJ filed by Peter Siegel. Motion terminated per order: 45 MOTION to Continue Motion for Summary Judgment and to Extend Discovery FRCP Rule 6 and 56(d) filed by Peter Siegel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on July 16, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
December 10, 2013 82 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Hearing set for 12/17/2013 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/10/2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Siegel v. Hewlett-Packard Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Siegel
Represented By: Karen Ellen Ford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]