Herguan University et al v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE) et al

Plaintiff: Jerry Yun Fei Wang and Herguan University
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE) and Student and Exchange Visitor Program (SEVP)
Case Number: 5:2012cv04403
Filed: August 22, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DEMYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 2 Motion for TRO; denying 2 Ex Parte Application (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 28, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 14 Letter filed by Herguan University. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 28, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
November 19, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE LATE RESPONSE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Opposition or statement of non-opposition due by 11/23/2012. Reply due by 12/7/2012. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 11/19/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herguan University et al v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE) et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Yun Fei Wang
Represented By: David Leonard Ross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herguan University
Represented By: David Leonard Ross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)
Represented By: Claire T. Cormier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Student and Exchange Visitor Program (SEVP)
Represented By: Claire T. Cormier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]