Prestige Capital Corporation v. Shorebird Homeowners Association

Plaintiff: Prestige Capital Corporation
Defendant: Shorebird Homeowners Association
Case Number: 5:2012cv06072
Filed: November 30, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 30, 2014. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
May 23, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CASE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 23, 2014. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
January 30, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 30, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
February 25, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT 2/26/2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, granting 13 : Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 2/25/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
March 18, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/18/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
November 4, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 27 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 31 Motion for Sanctions. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prestige Capital Corporation v. Shorebird Homeowners Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prestige Capital Corporation
Represented By: Donald P. Gagliardi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorebird Homeowners Association
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]