United States of America for the use of San Benito Supply v. KISAQ-RQ 8A 2 JV et al

Plaintiff: United States of America for the use of San Benito Supply
Defendant: KISAQ-RQ 8A 2 JV, Frazier Masonry Company, Federal Insurance Company and Western Surety Company
Case Number: 5:2013cv00469
Filed: February 4, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Benito
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION, FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/28/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
February 25, 2015 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/4/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/25/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
March 6, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Order to Show Cause 106 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/6/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 11, 2015 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Response 112 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/11/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
April 17, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO COURT-SPONSORED MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on April 17, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
May 14, 2015 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) granting San Benito Supply's Request for Adversary Submissions on Frazier Masonry's Motion for the Award of Attorney Fees and Expert Witness Fees 135 ; and (2) setting deadline for Frazier Masonry to file additional evidence in support of its Motion for the Award of Attorney Fees and Expert Witness Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/14/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
July 9, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of the Deadline for Conducting Mediation. Mediation shall be completed by 9/14/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on July 8, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
September 16, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 28 FOR EXTENSION OF THE DEADLINE FOR CONDUCTING MEDIATION AND COMPLETING DISCOVERY filed by United States of America for the use of San Benito Supply. Mediation deadline continued to 10/31/13. Fact discovery dea dline continued to to 12/13/13. Expert discovery deadline continued to 1/20/14. The Court does not intend to extend the date for hearing dispositive motions or the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/16/13. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
October 21, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/21/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
November 4, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 32 FOR EXTENSION OF EXPERT DISCLOSURES AND RELATED REPORTS filed by United States of America for the use of San Benito Supply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/4/2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
December 20, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF THE FACT DISCOVERY, EXPERT DISCLOSURES AND RELATED REPORTS, AND EXPERT DISCOVERY filed by United States of America for the use of San Benito Supply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/20/2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
January 28, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 FOR EXTENSION OF THE FACT DISCOVERY, EXPERT DISCLOSURES AND RELATED REPORTS AND EXPERT DISCOVERY. Discovery Cutoff is 2/13/2014. Designation of Experts with Reports by 2/20/2014. Designation of Rebuttal Experts with Reports by 3/3/2014. Expert Discovery Cutoff is 3/20/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/28/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
February 20, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF THE EXPERT DISCLOSURES AND RELATED REPORTS DEADLINES. Deadline for Designation of Experts with Reports continued to 2/27/2014. NO OTHER DEADLINES ARE AFFECTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/20/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
April 24, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 TO CONTINUE THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DEADLINE, THE PRETRIAL HEARING, AND ALL PRETRIAL HEARING RELATED DEADLINES. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/23/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
August 6, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 to Waive Jury at Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/6/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
August 6, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 51 For Voluntary Dismissal of Counter Claim Plaintiff's Second Counter Claim for Negligence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/6/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the use of San Benito Supply v. KISAQ-RQ 8A 2 JV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use of San Benito Supply
Represented By: Diana Marie Dron
Represented By: William J. Ingalsbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KISAQ-RQ 8A 2 JV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frazier Masonry Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.