Sentius International, LLC v. Microsoft Corporation

Plaintiff: Sentius International, LLC
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 5:2013cv00825
Filed: February 22, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 102 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
July 29, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART SENTIUS' MOTION TO COMPEL; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE granting [102-4]. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 29, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
August 15, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MICROSOFT'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 76 and 78 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
January 6, 2015 163 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT, granting 156 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 1/6/2015. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
January 15, 2015 171 Opinion or Order of the Court OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 145 ; granting-in-part 149 ; denying 151 ; granting-in-part 153 ; granting 161 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 23, 2015 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INFRINGEMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 129 (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 23, 2015 196 Opinion or Order of the Court CLARIFICATION OF OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL re 194 , 173 Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 23, 2015. (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 23, 2015 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO EXCLUDE by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 130 . (psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 27, 2015 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO EXCLUDE Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 27, 2015 granting-in-part 131 . (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 28, 2015 211 Opinion or Order of the Court OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 176 ; granting-in-part 182 . (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
February 3, 2015 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part 208 (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
January 9, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 9, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
March 26, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 70 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sentius International, LLC v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentius International, LLC
Represented By: Steven Gerald Sklaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Joseph Lamberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]