Century 21 Real Estate LLC. v. ED/VAR INC. et al

Defendant: Eddie Fernandez, Chuck Vargas, Eriberto Fernandez, ED/VAR INC. and Carlos Vargas
Plaintiff: Century 21 Real Estate LLC.
Case Number: 5:2013cv00887
Filed: February 27, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting 23 Stipulation to Set Aside Default. Defendant Eriberto Fernandez shall answer the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Century 21 on or before June 3, 2013. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/4/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
September 24, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/8/2013. It appears to the court that ED/VAR Inc. and Vargas have abandoned their defense. Accordingly, the court hereby issues an order to show cause why the Answers of ED/VAR Inc. and Vargas sho uld not be stricken. If ED/VAR Inc. and Vargas do not, by October 8, 2013, demonstrate good cause in writing, the court will strike their answers which would allow Plaintiff to seek entry of default and default judgment against them. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
October 22, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; STRIKING ANSWER OF ED/VAR INC. The court finds that Carlos Vargas has demonstrated good cause as required. The Order to Show Cause is therefore DISCHARGED as to him. However, ED/VAR Inc. has failed to show good cause and has failed to retain counsel as previously ordered. Its answer is therefore STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/22/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2013: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. A judgment consistent with this order in favor of Plaintiff and against Ed/Var and Vargas shall issue. The court schedules this action for a Status Conference on 8/1/2014 at 10:00 a.m. Th e parties shall file a Joint Status Conference Statement which provides, inter alia, an update on the status of Plaintiff's anticipated application for attorneys fees and costs as well as the final resolution of this action, on or before 7/25/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/10/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 28, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. All other pretrial hearings and deadlines, including the bench trial scheduled to commence on September 16, 2014, are VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/28/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Century 21 Real Estate LLC. v. ED/VAR INC. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Fernandez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Vargas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eriberto Fernandez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ED/VAR INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Vargas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Century 21 Real Estate LLC.
Represented By: Aaron Paul Rudin
Represented By: Lisa Karen Garner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]