Ferchau v. CitiMortgage, Inc.

Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Charles Ferchau
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00941
Filed: March 1, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/04/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
July 31, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re 19 Notice (Other) filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/31/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
August 4, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Parties to File a Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on August 4, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2013)
August 6, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on August 6, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
January 2, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 14 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 31, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Dismissing with Prejudice. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/31/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ferchau v. CitiMortgage, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart Bruce Wolfe
Represented By: Brian H. Gunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ferchau
Represented By: Art Hoomiratana
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]