Intertrust Technologies Corporation v. Apple, Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff: Intertrust Technologies Corporation
Defendant: Apple, Inc
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01235
Filed: March 20, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2014 62 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: # 1 Order of Dismissal)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
April 1, 2014 61 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/1/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
April 1, 2014 60 Proposed Order of Dismissal by Intertrust Technologies Corporation. (Stein, James) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
January 7, 2014 59 NOTICE of Unredacted Exhibits G & H to December 3, 2013 Declaration of James Stein in Support of Intertrust's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions re 58 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Intertrust Technologies Corporation (Stein, James) (Filed on 1/7/2014) Modified on 1/8/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Counsel did not present papers as required by Civil L.R. 3-4]
January 3, 2014 58 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 47 Unopposed Administrative Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions; Denying Administrative Motion to Seal. The Court VACATES the hearing set for January 7, 2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
December 24, 2013 57 Reply Memorandum re 47 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Intertrust's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, filed by Intertrust Technologies Corporation. (Stein, James) (Filed on 12/24/2013) Modified on 12/26/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2013 56 Transcript of Electronically Recorded Proceedings held on December 16, 2013, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Tape Number: FTR: 2:11-2:12PM; 3:39-3:40PM; 4:35-5:21PM. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2014. (Related document(s) 55 , 52 ) (rhm) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 19, 2013 55 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Sernel, Marcus) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W Gray (Gray, Michael) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 18, 2013 52 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Case Management Conference Held on 12/16/13, filed by Intertrust Technologies Corporation for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Guledjian, Tigran) (Filed on 12/18/2013) Modified on 12/19/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2013 51 Statement of Non-Opposition re 47 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions], filed by Apple, Inc. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Sernel, Marcus) (Filed on 12/17/2013) Modified on 12/18/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Motion for Leave to Amend it Infringment Contentions Hearing [Dkt. No. 47-3] set for 1/7/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. [This motion was filed by Plaintiff on 12/3/2013.] (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 16, 2013 53 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/16/2013 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 12/16/2013). Markman hearing set for Friday, 10/10/2014 10:00 AM. Status Conference set for 4/21/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Tutorial Hearing set for Friday, 10/3/2014 10:00 AM. (Recording #FTR 2:11pm-2:12pm; 3:39pm-3:40pm and 4:35pm-5:21pm.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2013) Modified on 12/19/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2013 50 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT] by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 46 Stipulation. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 9, 2013 49 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Intertrust Technologies Corporation, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Stein, James) (Filed on 12/9/2013) Modified on 12/10/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2013 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intertrust Technologies Corporation re 47 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Intertrust's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions (Stein, James) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 3, 2013 47 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Intertrust's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by Intertrust Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Stein in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Intertrust's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 4 Declaration of James Stein in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 5 Exhibit A to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 6 Exhibit B to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 7 Exhibit C to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 8 Exhibit D to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 9 Exhibit E to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 10 Exhibit F to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 11 Redacted Version of Exhibit G to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 13 Redacted Version of Exhibit H to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 15 Exhibit I, Part 1 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 16 Exhibit I, Part 2 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 17 Exhibit I, Part 3 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 18 Exhibit I, Part 4 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 19 Exhibit I, Part 5 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 20 Exhibit I, Part 6 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 21 Exhibit I, Part 7 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 22 Exhibit I, Part 8 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 23 Exhibit I, Part 9 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 24 Exhibit J, Part 1 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 25 Exhibit J, Part 2 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 26 Exhibit J, Part 3 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 27 Exhibit J, Part 4 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 28 Exhibit J, Part 5 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 29 Exhibit J, Part 6 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 30 Exhibit J, Part 7 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 31 Exhibit J, Part 8 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 32 Exhibit J, Part 9 of 9, to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 33 Exhibit K to Stein Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 34 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions)(Stein, James) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
November 25, 2013 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER, filed by Intertrust Technologies Corporation, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Stein, James) (Filed on 11/25/2013) Modified on 11/26/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 44 Stipulation Moving Continued Case Management Conference and Modifying Date to File Updated Case Management Statement. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
November 8, 2013 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MOVING CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MODIFYING DATE TO FILE UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Apple, Inc, Intertrust Technologies Corporation. (Sernel, Marcus) (Filed on 11/8/2013) Modified on 11/12/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying without prejudice 42 Joint Stipulation (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 4, 2013 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Motion To Enter Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by Intertrust Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Joint Proposed Protective Order)(Stein, James) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
September 9, 2013 41 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Case Management Conference Held on 08/26/13, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, filed by Apple, Inc for Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (Sernel, Marcus) (Filed on 9/9/2013) Modified on 9/10/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2013 40 Transcript of electronically recorded proceedings held on August 26, 2013, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-7530, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2013. (Related documents(s) 39 ) (rhm) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
August 30, 2013 39 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for CMC held on 08/26/13 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, by Intertrust Technologies Corporation for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Guledjian, Tigran) (Filed on 8/30/2013) Modified on 9/3/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2013 38 Featured Case JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2013. Case Management Conference set 12/9/2013 at specially set time of 1:00pm. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/30/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 28, 2013 37 Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, by Intertrust Technologies Corporation, Apple, Inc.. (Stein, James) (Filed on 8/28/2013) Modified on 8/29/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2013 36 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/26/2013 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 8/26/2013). Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2013 at specially set time of 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. (Recording #FTR 3:18pm-4:05pm.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2013)
August 23, 2013 35 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Apple Inc. (Sernel, Marcus) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 34 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Guledjian, Tigran) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 22, 2013 33 Reply to Counterclaim with Jury Demand re 25 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim 1-23, against Apple, Inc by Intertrust Technologies Corporation. (Guledjian, Tigran) (Filed on 8/22/2013) Modified on 8/23/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2013 32 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Intertrust Technologies Corporation, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stein, James) (Filed on 8/19/2013) Modified on 8/20/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2013 31 NOTICE of Appearance as to James David Stein, filed by Intertrust Technologies Corporation (Stein, James) (Filed on 8/19/2013) Modified on 8/20/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2013 30 NOTICE of Appearance of Christopher Anthony Mathews as Counsel, filed by Intertrust Technologies Corporation (Mathews, Christopher) (Filed on 8/7/2013) Modified on 8/8/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2013 29 NOTICE of Appearance of Tigran Guledjian as Counsel, filed by Intertrust Technologies Corporation (Guledjian, Tigran) (Filed on 8/7/2013) Modified on 8/8/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2013 28 NOTICE of Appearance of Sidford Lewis Brown as Counsel, filed by Intertrust Technologies Corporation (Brown, Sidford) (Filed on 8/6/2013) Modified on 8/7/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2013 27 NOTICE OF CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1, filed by Apple, Inc.. (Sernel, Marcus) (Filed on 7/29/2013) Modified on 7/30/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2013 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc (Sernel, Marcus) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 29, 2013 25 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Intertrust Technologies Corporation, filed by Apple, Inc. (Sernel, Marcus) (Filed on 7/29/2013) Modified on 7/30/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 23 Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Moving Initial Case Management Conference. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 18, 2013 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Moving Initial Case Management Conference, filed by Apple, Inc, Intertrust Technologies Corporation. (Piepmeier, Sarah) (Filed on 6/18/2013) Modified on 6/19/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2013 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apple, Inc. Filed by Intertrust Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23)(Brewer, Linda) (Filed on 6/7/2013) Modified on 6/10/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 20 Joint Stipulation Extending Time to File Amended Complaint and Moving Initial Case Management Conference. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 22, 2013 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Amended Complaint and Moving Initial Case Management Conference, filed by Intertrust Technologies Corporation, Apple, Inc.. (Brewer, Linda) (Filed on 5/22/2013) Modified on 5/23/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2013 19 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Apple, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/24/2013. Replies due by 5/31/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sernel, Marcus) (Filed on 5/10/2013) Modified on 5/13/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2013 18 CLERKS NOTICE RE: MOTION TO RELATE CASES - COURT DECLINES TO RELATE CASES (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 16, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Marcus E. Sernel representing Defendant Apple, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
April 16, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory S. Arovas representing Defendant Apple, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
April 12, 2013 15 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 6/24/2013 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 11, 2013 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Marcus E. Sernel, P.C. ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7621973.) filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Sernel, Marcus) (Filed on 4/11/2013) Modified on 4/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2013 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Gregory S. Arovas, P.C. ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7618011.) filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Arovas, Gregory) (Filed on 4/10/2013) Modified on 4/11/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2013 12 STIPULATION PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-1(A) TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, filed by Apple, Inc, Intertrust Technologies Corporation. (Piepmeier, Sarah) (Filed on 4/9/2013) Modified on 4/10/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2013 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Sarah Elizabeth Piepmeier as Counsel, filed by Apple, Inc. (Piepmeier, Sarah) (Filed on 4/9/2013) Modified on 4/10/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2013 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE as to delivery of certified mail re 5 on 3/25/2013. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
March 28, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Signed by The Executive Committee on 3/28/2013. (gmS, ) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 27, 2013 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 27, 2013 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Intertrust Technologies Corporation. (Brewer, Linda) (Filed on 3/27/2013) Modified on 3/28/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2013 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed/Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to defendant Apple, Inc served on 3/20/2013, answer due 4/10/2013 by Intertrust Technologies Corporation. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 22, 2013 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patend Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 22, 2013 Remarks: Clerk update Attorney Brewer's contact information re civil complaint (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 21, 2013 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 20, 2013 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 20, 2013 3 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 20, 2013 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Intertrust Technologies Corporation. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 20, 2013 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement (Summons Issued: jury demand; against Apple, Inc ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611010172). Filed byIntertrust Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Intertrust Technologies Corporation v. Apple, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intertrust Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Frederick Alan Lorig
Represented By: Robert P. Feldman
Represented By: Linda Jane Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc
Represented By: Gregory S. Arovas
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Piepmeier
Represented By: Marcus Edward Sernel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]