Rock-Tenn Company v. General Electric Railcar Services Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Rock-Tenn Company
Defendant: General Electric Railcar Services Corporation, Genesse & Wyoming, Inc. and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2013cv01313
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2015 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 125 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/10/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
March 12, 2015 135 Opinion or Order of the Court [PROPOSED] PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS (ANNOTATED). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/12/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 137 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion in Limine; granting 79 Motion in Limine; granting 80 Motion in Limine; granting 81 Motion in Limine; denying 82 Motion in Limine; denying 83 Motion in Limine; denying 84 Motion in Limine (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 16, 2015 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/16/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL FILING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/16/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 18, 2015 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JURY COSTS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/18/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
June 18, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/18/2014. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
October 16, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING EX PARTE COMMUNICATIONS. Signed by Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 10/16/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Communication) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 30, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/30/2014. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
November 4, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/4/2014. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
January 8, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/8/2015. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
February 2, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING ONE WEEK ADVANCEMENT OF TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/2/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 10, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/10/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rock-Tenn Company v. General Electric Railcar Services Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rock-Tenn Company
Represented By: Hector E. Saliterero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Railcar Services Corporation
Represented By: James M. Hanlon, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesse & Wyoming, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.