North American Title Company et al

Appellant: North American Title Company
Trustee: Devin Derham-Burk
Miscellaneous: USBC Manager-San Jose and Arthur S. Weissbrodt
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and EMC Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 5:2013cv01316
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 9 Stipulation (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
October 15, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing on Motion for Withdrawal of Reference to Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/15/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
November 7, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
September 24, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 , 29 MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/24/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
November 20, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 71 FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO NORTH AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Replies due by 1/20/2015. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/20/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North American Title Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: North American Title Company
Represented By: Glenn Harlan Wechsler
Represented By: Lawrence Daniel Harris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Devin Derham-Burk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: USBC Manager-San Jose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Arthur S. Weissbrodt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mark Leonard Block
Represented By: Christina Lauren Goebelsmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Christina Lauren Goebelsmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Christina Lauren Goebelsmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]