Brooks v. Cate

Petitioner: Bruce Brooks
Respondent: Matthew Cate
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01352
Filed: March 26, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 9 Motion to Reinstate Petition (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
December 4, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 14 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting 15 Motion for Reconsideration ; Setting Briefing Schedule (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
February 24, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 18 MOTION to Enlarge Time to File Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Responses due by 4/4/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
April 15, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 6/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
May 29, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ;ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
July 16, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/15/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 16, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/15/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brooks v. Cate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bruce Brooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Cate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]