Lynch v. Bitter

Petitioner: Andrew Anthony Lynch
Respondent: Martin D. Bitter
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01439
Filed: April 1, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER RE-OPENING CASE; GRANTING RENEWED MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Dispositive Motion due by 12/3/2013. Habeas Answer due by 12/3/2013.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/3/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
January 9, 2014 13 Featured Case ORDER re 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct 11 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines for Pro Se Prisoner Cases,, Briefing Schedule filed by Martin D. Bitter, Motions terminated: 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct 11 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines for Pro Se Prisoner Cases,, Briefing Schedule filed by Martin D. Bitter. Dispositive Motion due by 3/3/2014. Habeas Answer due by 3/3/2014.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/9/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
July 15, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY PETITION; INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 6 Motion to stay petition; denying 7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lynch v. Bitter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andrew Anthony Lynch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martin D. Bitter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]