Kalani v. Perusina et al

Plaintiff: Robert Kalani
Defendant: Danford P. Perusina, Arlene M. Perusina and Prestige Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv01468
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 17 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Arlene M. Perusina, Danford P. Perusina. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 26, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
October 9, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/9/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
November 10, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting time. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 11/10/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2013)
December 13, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting dismissal. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 12/13/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalani v. Perusina et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kalani
Represented By: Tanya Eugene Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danford P. Perusina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene M. Perusina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Foods, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]