Ruiz v. Chase Bank USA, National Association

Defendant: Chase Bank USA, National Association
Plaintiff: Lori Ruiz
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01508
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER AND INFORM THE COURT WHETHER THEY CONSENT TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE OF THEIR CHOICE FOR ALL PURPOSES; AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, 7/22/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/11/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 25, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER; ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/25/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
October 29, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 18 Discovery Letter Brief.(ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
November 15, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/15/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ruiz v. Chase Bank USA, National Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: George Geoffrey Weickhardt
Represented By: Wendy Chai Krog
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Ruiz
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]