Knowles v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Matthew C Knowles
Defendant: Google Inc
Case Number: 5:2013cv01601
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2013 41 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:12-cv-02022. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 4, 2013 40 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2013 39 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting 38 Joint Motion to Stay of Proceeding Pending Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. All deadlines stayed until 30 days after the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation rules on pending motion for coordination or consolidation of this and other actions captioned In re Google Inc. Gmail Litigation (MDL No. 2430). Signed by Judge William M. Nickerson on 1/15/13. (bf, Chambers)
January 10, 2013 38 Joint MOTION to Stay of Proceeding Pending Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Google, Inc. Responses due by 1/28/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, Brendan)
January 3, 2013 37 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Tammi Ann Markowitz on behalf of Matthew C. Knowles. Directing attorney Tammi Ann Markowitz to register on-line for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 1/3/13. (cmns, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2013 36 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Kenneth Jay Grunfeld on behalf of Matthew C. Knowles. Directing attorney Kenneth Jay Grunfeld to register on-line for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 1/3/13. (cmns, Deputy Clerk)
January 2, 2013 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tammi Markowitz ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-3870365.) by Matthew C Knowles (Gracie, Kevin)
January 2, 2013 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth J. Grunfeld ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-3870359.) by Matthew C Knowles (Gracie, Kevin)
December 17, 2012 33 RESPONSE to Motion re 24 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by Matthew C Knowles. Replies due by 1/7/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gracie, Kevin)
December 17, 2012 32 QC NOTICE: 31 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Matthew C Knowles was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event selected. Please refile using the event under Responses and Replies - Response to Motion. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2012 31 (FILED IN ERROR) REPLY to Response to Motion re 24 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint , RESPONSE to Motion ( Replies due by 1/7/2013.) filed by Matthew C Knowles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gracie, Kevin) Modified on 12/17/2012 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
December 14, 2012 30 RESPONSE to Motion re 24 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by Matthew C Knowles. Replies due by 1/2/2013. (Gracie, Kevin)
November 21, 2012 29 Request for Hearing re 24 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint . (Hughes, Brendan)
November 20, 2012 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time and extending Plaintiffs deadline to oppose Defendants Motion to Dismiss until December 17, 2012 and Defendants deadline to reply to January 18, 2013. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 11/20/2012. (cae, Chambers)
November 20, 2012 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Google, Inc.. Responses due by 12/7/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, Brendan)
November 15, 2012 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matthew C Knowles. Google, Inc. waiver sent on 9/10/2012, answer due 11/9/2012. (Hopkins, William)
November 9, 2012 25 Request for Hearing/Trial for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt 24) (Hughes, Brendan)
November 9, 2012 24 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Google, Inc. Responses due by 11/29/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Whitty Somvichian, # 3 Appendix of Exhibits to Somvichian Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 5 Exhibit B to Declaration, # 6 Exhibit C to Declaration, # 7 Exhibit D to Declaration, # 8 Exhibit E to Declaration, # 9 Exhibit F to Declaration, # 10 Exhibit G to Declaration, # 11 Exhibit H to Declaration, # 12 Exhibit I to Declaration, # 13 Request for Judicial Notice, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, Brendan)
November 2, 2012 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Kyle Wong on behalf of Google Inc. Directing attorney Kyle Wong to register on-line for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 11/2/12. (cmns, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2012 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Michael G Rhodes on behalf of Google Inc. Directing attorney Michael G Rhodes to register on-line for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 11/2/12. (cmns, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2012 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Whitty Somvichian on behalf of Google Inc. Directing attorney Whitty Somvichian to register on-line for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 11/2/12. (cmns, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2012 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kyle Wong, Esq. by Google, Inc. (Fee Paid $50; Receipt #14637062690)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2012 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael G. Rhodes, Esq. by Google, Inc. (Fee Paid $50; Receipt #14637062695)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2012 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Whitty Somvichian, Esq. by Google, Inc. (Fee Paid $50; Receipt #14637062698)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2012 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Google, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate IMI Assurance, Inc. for Google, Inc... (Hughes, Brendan)
October 31, 2012 16 QC NOTICE: 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Google, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled and the corporate affiliations need to be entered when the system prompts you do to so. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2012 15 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Google, Inc.. (Hughes, Brendan) Modified on 10/31/2012 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
October 26, 2012 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Joseph Hughes on behalf of Google, Inc. (Hughes, Brendan)
October 23, 2012 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Richard M. Golomb on behalf of Matthew C. Knowles. Directing attorney Richard M. Golomb to register on-line for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 10/23/12. (cmns, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2012 12 Proposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard Golomb ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-3754433.) by Matthew C Knowles (Gracie, Kevin)
July 25, 2012 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew C Knowles. Google, Inc. served on 7/18/2012, answer due 8/8/2012. (Gracie, Kevin)
July 12, 2012 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney William E Hopkins, Jr on behalf of Matthew C Knowles. Directing attorney William E Hopkins, Jr to register on-line for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 7/12/12. (cmns, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2012 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William E. Hopkins, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-3576674.) by Matthew C Knowles (Gracie, Kevin)
July 11, 2012 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Ryan Quinn on behalf of Matthew C. Knowles. Directing attorney Ryan Quinn to register on-line for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 7/11/12. (cmns, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2012 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Michael W Slocumb on behalf of Matthew C. Knowles. Directing attorney Michael W Slocumb to register on-line for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 7/11/12. (cmns, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2012 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ryan Quinn ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-3575517.) by Matthew C Knowles (Gracie, Kevin)
July 11, 2012 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael W. Slocumb ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-3575473.) by Matthew C Knowles (Gracie, Kevin)
July 10, 2012 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Google, Inc..(sls, Deputy Clerk)
July 10, 2012 3 NOTICE by Matthew C Knowles Civil Cover Sheet (Gracie, Kevin)
July 9, 2012 2 NOTICE by Matthew C Knowles re 1 Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Case Info and Summons)(Gracie, Kevin)
July 9, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0416-3570148.), filed by Matthew C Knowles.(Gracie, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knowles v. Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew C Knowles
Represented By: Michael W Slocumb
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Quinn
Represented By: Tammi Ann Markowitz
Represented By: WILLIAM ELVIN HOPKINS, JR
Represented By: Kenneth Jay Grunfeld
Represented By: Kevin B Gracie
Represented By: Richard Moss Golomb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: Michael G. Rhodes
Represented By: Brendan Joseph Hughes
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Represented By: Kyle Christopher Wong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]