DirecTV, LLC v. Mackey et al

Plaintiff: DirecTV, LLC
Defendant: Elizabeth Josephine Kehoe, Aidan Mackey, Gerard Francis Kehoe and Katie Bloom's Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01619
Filed: April 10, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
 
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605 Communications Act of 1994
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER THAT CASE BE REASSIGNED WITH RECOMMENDATION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BE GRANTED by Judge Paul S. Grewal 21 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
December 13, 2013 32 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/13/13. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
January 3, 2014 33 Featured Case Correction of 32 Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/13/13. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
June 5, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT AIDAN MACKEY WITHOUT PREJUDICE, granting 8 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 6/5/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: DirecTV, LLC v. Mackey et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DirecTV, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Hufnagel
Represented By: Yasha Bronshteyn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Josephine Kehoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aidan Mackey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Francis Kehoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Bloom's Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]