Carrick v. Santa Cruz County Assessor/Recorder et al

Plaintiff: Paul M. Carrick
Defendant: Santa Cruz County Assessor/Recorder, Sean Saldavia and County of Santa Cruz
Case Number: 5:2013cv01632
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 5 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
September 19, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 9/26/2013. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
October 18, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 14 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrick v. Santa Cruz County Assessor/Recorder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul M. Carrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Cruz County Assessor/Recorder
Represented By: Tamyra Ann Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Saldavia
Represented By: Tamyra Ann Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Cruz
Represented By: Tamyra Ann Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.