IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc. v. Voxernet LLC

Plaintiff: IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Voxernet LLC
Case Number: 5:2013cv01708
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 64 defendant's Motion for Bond. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
July 3, 2014 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Construing Claim Terms re 91 . Signed by Judge Howard Lloyd on 7/3/2014. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 3, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Howard Lloyd granting 92 Motion for Summary Judgment (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 3, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Howard Lloyd granting 99 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 106 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
October 7, 2014 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to submit billing statements in camera. Signed by Judge Howard R Lloyd on October 7, 2014. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 179 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER to submit billing statements in camera. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/7/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
November 6, 2014 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT 145 AND (2) GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES 138 . Signed by Judge Howard R Lloyd on 11/6/2014. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc. v. Voxernet LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Pierre R. Yanney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voxernet LLC
Represented By: Michael Craig Saunders, II
Represented By: Hector Ribera
Represented By: J. David Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.