Walker v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Frank S. Walker
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01762
Filed: April 18, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. The court schedules this action for a Case Management Conference on 9/20/2013 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement, or separate statements as appropriate, on or before 9/13/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/30/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2013: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2013 58 Featured Case ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the pending Motion to Dismiss (see Docket Item No. 50), the court finds that a scheduling conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for Septem ber 20, 2013, is VACATED. The court will reset the conference, if necessary, in the order addressing the Motion to Dismiss. The court will reset the conference, if necessary, in the order addressing the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/17/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013) Modified text on 9/17/2013 (ecg, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2013: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2013 70 Featured Case ORDER granting 50 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; terminating 69 Motion to Appear by Telephone. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The hearing scheduled for 10/25/2013 is VACATED. The clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/21/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2013: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Walker v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank S. Walker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]