Bluestone Innovations, LLC v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al

Consol_defendant: ACER America Corporation, Acer Inc., Vizio Inc, BEST BUY CO INC, Best Buy Stores L.P. and Bestbuy.com LLC
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. and LG ELECTRONICS INC
Consol_plaintiff: Bluestone Innovations LLC
Plaintiff: Bluestone Innovations LLC
Case Number: 5:2013cv01770
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2013 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Matter for Related Case Determination. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 29, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
May 29, 2013 112 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Illston's standing ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
June 11, 2013 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 116 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 12, 2013 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 115 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
October 3, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/14/2014 03:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 5/7/2014 03:30 PM. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/2/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
October 11, 2013 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 127 Stipulation to Serve Amended Patent L.R. 3-1 Infringement Contentions (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 16, 2013 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 124 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Request & Order, # 2 Appendix Request & Order) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013) Modified on 10/16/2013 (tfS, COURT STAFF). Certified Copies to follow by mail.
October 30, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 31, 2013 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/31/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
November 15, 2013 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 130 Discovery Letter Brief (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
December 5, 2013 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 135 Motion to Compel (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
January 17, 2014 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 145 Motion to Strike (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
September 25, 2014 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 212 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Under Local Rule 7-12 to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Bluestone Innovations LLC. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/26/14 is continued to 10/17/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/25/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bluestone Innovations, LLC v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: ACER America Corporation
Represented By: Kaiwen Tseng
Represented By: Michael Cahocha Ting
Represented By: James Lin
Represented By: Hsiang Hong Lin
Represented By: Bernard Joseph DiMuro
Represented By: Jerry Chen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Acer Inc.
Represented By: Kaiwen Tseng
Represented By: Michael Cahocha Ting
Represented By: James Lin
Represented By: Hsiang Hong Lin
Represented By: Bernard Joseph DiMuro
Represented By: Jerry Chen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Vizio Inc
Represented By: Charles Christian Koole
Represented By: Steven Richard Hansen
Represented By: Adrian Mary Pruetz
Represented By: Jack Rephan
Represented By: Avraham Schwartz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: BEST BUY CO INC
Represented By: Robert Armistead Angle
Represented By: Christopher Kenneth Larus
Represented By: Bryan James Mechell
Represented By: Ethan G. Ostroff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Best Buy Stores L.P.
Represented By: Robert Armistead Angle
Represented By: Christopher Kenneth Larus
Represented By: Bryan James Mechell
Represented By: Ethan G. Ostroff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Bestbuy.com LLC
Represented By: Robert Armistead Angle
Represented By: Christopher Kenneth Larus
Represented By: Bryan James Mechell
Represented By: Ethan G. Ostroff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Philip W. Woo
Represented By: Philip Woo
Represented By: Ashish Nagdev
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Marion
Represented By: Robert John Kenney
Represented By: Peter H. Kang
Represented By: Peter Kang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS INC
Represented By: Philip W. Woo
Represented By: Philip Woo
Represented By: Ashish Nagdev
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Marion
Represented By: Robert John Kenney
Represented By: Peter H. Kang
Represented By: Peter Kang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Bluestone Innovations LLC
Represented By: Amy Sanborn Owen
Represented By: Richard Dean Holzheimer, Jr.
Represented By: Martin L. Fineman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bluestone Innovations LLC
Represented By: Amy Sanborn Owen
Represented By: Dean Douglas Niro
Represented By: David Joseph Mahalek
Represented By: Richard Dean Holzheimer, Jr.
Represented By: Martin L. Fineman
Represented By: Robert Allen Conley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]