Munoz v. Zorba Group Inc. et al

Defendant: Razan Zarba, Zorba Group Inc. and Hanan Zarba
Plaintiff: Jose Villalobos Munoz
Case Number: 5:2013cv01779
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/27/2013. Case Management Conference continued to 9/3/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on July 16, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
November 5, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Case Management Conference and setting Status Conference for 12/10/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/5/2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
December 10, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute. Hearing set for 1/7/2014 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 12/31/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/10/2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
January 21, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/21/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munoz v. Zorba Group Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Razan Zarba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zorba Group Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanan Zarba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Villalobos Munoz
Represented By: Huy Ngoc Tran
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]