Tasion Communications Inc. v. Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tasion Communications Inc.
Defendant: Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv01803
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 86 87 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
September 9, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Settlement Conference set for 12/10/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 16, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 107 Stipulated Protective Order For Litigation Involving Highly Sensitive Confidential Information And/Or Trade Secrets filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/16/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 16, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 108 Stipulated Request For Order Governing Discovery Of Electronically Stored Information; [proposed] Order filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/16/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
November 26, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Further Case Management Conference filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. Status Report due by 1/15/2015. Status Conference set for 1/22/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/26/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
December 9, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's request to excuse personal appearance at the settlement conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
July 1, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
July 3, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF. Replies due by 7/8/2013.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/3/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
August 21, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 25 Stipulation filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/21/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 26, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
November 20, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request for Order Continuing Case Management Conference and Motion for Leave Hearing; and [Proposed] Order filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request for Order Continuing Case Management Conference and Motion for Leave Hearing; and [Proposed] Order, 35 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Class Action Complaint and Declaration of Suzanne Havens Beckman in Support thereof. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/20/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
December 2, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 35 Motion for Leave to File An Amended Complaint (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 12, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 46 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/11/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 20, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request for Order Continuing All Pending Dates, Including Time to Submit Updated Joint Case Management Statement, Ubiquiti's Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' F irst Amended Complaint, Time for Defen filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/20/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
January 7, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Request to Continue Pending Dates, Including Streakwave's Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Time for Defendant Streakwave Wireless LLC to Submit Initial Disclosure filed by Streakwave Wireless, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/7/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
February 14, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 68 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Streakwave Wireless, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/14/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 28, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 Ex Parte Application re 57 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO PERMIT CERTAIN PHYSICAL ITEMS TO BE BROUGHT INTO COURTROOM 5 DURING THE HEARING ON DEFENDANT UBIQUITIS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Tasion Communications Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/28/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
March 14, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 56 Defendants' Motion to Strike; and Granting 57 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 24, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause 80 . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/24/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 25, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 81 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 5/15/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/25/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
May 14, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Joint Request to Continue Further Case Mangement Conference; and [proposed] Order filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2014. Further Case Management Conference reset for 7/31/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/14/14. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tasion Communications Inc. v. Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasion Communications Inc.
Represented By: Suzanne Havens Beckman
Represented By: Alan Himmelfarb
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]