Brinker v. JP Morgan Chase N.A. et al

Defendant: Trans Union , LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc, California Reconvenance Company, LPS Agency Sales and Posting Inc, JP Morgan Chase N.A. and Equifax Information Services, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Alan Brinker
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01805
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating September 10, 2014 case management conference and continuing September 10, 2014 case management conference to December 17, 2014. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 8, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
May 15, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SERVE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 15, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 16, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER TO SERVE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 16, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 17, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 7 Ex Parte Application.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 21, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MEET AND CONFER DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 21, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 30, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SETTING SCHEDULE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; ORDER REGARDING DECLARATION OF CRISTINA LING. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 30, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
June 5, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 24 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
June 24, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DECLARATION OF CRISTINA LING. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 24, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
July 26, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh DENYing 34 Ex Parte Application.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013) Modified on 7/26/2013 (lhklc1, COURT STAFF). [*** previously, this ECF entry mistakenly stated that the Ex Parte Application was granted. The ECF entry has been corrected ***]
August 1, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. AND CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on August 1, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
May 21, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/21/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
July 24, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/24/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
September 4, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 4, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 4, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION AND STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 4, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brinker v. JP Morgan Chase N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union , LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconvenance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPS Agency Sales and Posting Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Brinker
Represented By: Anita Louise Steburg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]