Haskins v. Symantec Corporation

Defendant: Symantec Corporation
Plaintiff: Kathleen Haskins
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv01834
Filed: April 22, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT SYMANTEC CORPORATIONS MOTION TO DISMISS re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendant Symantec Corporation's Motion to Dismiss filed by Symantec Corporation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 22 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Symantec Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Responses due by 7/25/2013. Replies due by 8/15/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 27, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
August 23, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 22 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
October 24, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 24, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
December 2, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 22 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 29, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Symantec to Answer or Move to Dismiss The Third Amended Complaint and Regarding a Briefing Schedule for a Motion to Dismiss filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 29, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2013)
March 5, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 51 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Symantec Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Class Action Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 5, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
June 2, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 51 Motion to Dismiss. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Haskins v. Symantec Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symantec Corporation
Represented By: Leslie A Kramer
Represented By: Molly Roberta Melcher
Represented By: Tyler Griffin Newby
Represented By: Laurence F. Pulgram
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Haskins
Represented By: Paula Michelle Roach
Represented By: Thomas Joseph O'Reardon, II
Represented By: Richard Lyle Coffman
Represented By: Timothy G. Blood
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]