Nguyen v. McHugh

Plaintiff: Huyen L. Nguyen
Defendant: John M McHugh
Case Number: 5:2013cv01847
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART NGUYEN'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 68 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
August 22, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 75 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 77 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 95 Motion to Strike ; denying 100 Motion for Extension of Time to File (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
September 7, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: FILING OF CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 09/07/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2013)
January 2, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 1/2/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
May 6, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 35 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 28, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION OF DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 28, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
July 17, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 7/17/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huyen L. Nguyen
Represented By: Karen Ellen Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.