Evanston Insurance Company, Inc. v. Giuffrida Cardens Homeowners Association, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Giuffrida Cardens Homeowners Association, Inc. and Five Star Windows
Case Number: 5:2013cv01860
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Directing Parties to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/6/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 11, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Continuing Mediation Deadline and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/11/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
April 30, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 29 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Case Management Statement due by 5/29/2014. Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/30/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
May 28, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 33 FURTHER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2014. Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/28/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
June 19, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 37 FURTHER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
August 13, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 45 FURTHER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 18, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 48 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/18/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
September 24, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 51 FURTHER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
November 6, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 55 FURTHER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2014. Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
December 3, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 57 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/3/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 17, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 59 FURTHER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2015. Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/17/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
January 27, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (approving 61). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/27/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanston Insurance Company, Inc. v. Giuffrida Cardens Homeowners Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Harrison Castoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giuffrida Cardens Homeowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Star Windows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.