Amador v. TT Investment Properties, LLC

Defendant: TT Investment Properties, LLC
Plaintiff: Rene G. Amador
Case Number: 5:2013cv01939
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT CASE BE REASSIGNED WITH RECOMMENDATION THAT THE CASE BE DISMISSED Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 16, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 25, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/25/2013. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
September 30, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 30, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2013: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amador v. TT Investment Properties, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TT Investment Properties, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene G. Amador
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]