J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Duong et al

Defendant: Lee Duong and Satom, LLC
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv02002
Filed: May 1, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553 Communications Act of 1994
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 13 Stipulation filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/19/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
January 8, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 17 Motion for Default Judgment (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
April 14, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Duong et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Duong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Satom, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]