Gold v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al

Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ellen Annete Gold
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv02019
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/24/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 30, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 18 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/30/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
August 26, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/26/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
October 29, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE adopting 32 Proposed Order. The mediation completion deadline in this matter is VACATED and is reset for 8/29/2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/29/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
February 18, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/18/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 20, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order, Motions terminated: 38 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ellen Annete Gold. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on February 20, 2014. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 28, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order, Motions terminated: 42 MOTION for Reconsideration re 41 Discovery Order, Terminate Motions (Motion For Leave To File Motion For Reconsideration) filed by Midland Funding, LLC, Midland Credit Management, Inc... Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on February 28, 2014. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
June 10, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re 55 MOTION to Compel Further Discovery Responses and Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information in Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests filed by Ellen Annete Gold. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/10/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
July 9, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re: 60 Joint Discovery Letter Brief No. 2 filed by Ellen Annete Gold. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/9/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 9, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re: 59 Joint Discovery Letter Brief No. 1 filed by Ellen Annete Gold. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/9/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 31, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting 67 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule re Motions for Summary Judgment and Pretrial Schedule. Dates set in 53 Case Management Order are Continued as follows: Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2014. Responses due by 11/20/2 014. Replies due by 12/4/2014. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2015 09:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2015 02:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 4/6/2015 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 7/31/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
August 11, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re: 69 Joint Discovery Letter Brief No. 3 filed by Ellen Annete Gold. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/11/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
October 7, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting in Part, Denying in Part 58 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 10/7/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gold v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Annete Gold
Represented By: Fred W. Schwinn
Represented By: Raeon Rodrigo Roulston
Represented By: O. Randolph Bragg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]