Seaman v. California Business Bank et al

Defendant: Biff Naylor, Steven Hong, Mladen Buntich, Peggy Hansen, Jane Auserwald, Cole W. Minnick, Jr., Michael Maluccio, Raffi D. Krikorian, California Business Bank, Kenneth Thompson, Gary K. Cross, Ellwood Johnston and N. Aaron Yashouafar
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Seaman
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv02031
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING AD PROCESS re 22 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Thomas A. Seaman filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 25, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
September 4, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 32 MOTION to Dismiss (CORRECTED) filed by California Business Bank. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 4, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
October 30, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 32 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
November 8, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/8/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
December 29, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS re 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 47 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMIS S PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 29, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2013)
January 3, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 3, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
February 7, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Permit Defendant Yashouafar to File a Joinder to the Pending Motion to Dismiss filed by N. Aaron Yashouafar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 7, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
April 2, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 47 Motion to Dismiss; granting 62 Motion for Joinder. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Seaman v. California Business Bank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biff Naylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mladen Buntich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Auserwald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole W. Minnick, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Maluccio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raffi D. Krikorian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Business Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary K. Cross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellwood Johnston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Aaron Yashouafar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Seaman
Represented By: David Robert Zaro
Represented By: Ted Fates
Represented By: Kim Anh Bui
Represented By: Patrick Edward Breen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]