City of Orlando Police Pension Fund v. Page et al

Defendant: Ann Mather, John L Hennessy, L. John Doerr, Eric E Schmidt, Sergey Brin, Lawrence E Page, Paul S Otellini, K. Ram Shriram, Shirley Tilghman and Google Inc
Plaintiff: City of Orlando Police Pension Fund
Case Number: 5:2013cv02038
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Orange
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/22/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
September 26, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 15 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
February 10, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 46 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 61 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 71 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
March 12, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE TEMPORARY STAY re 79 Order on Stipulation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/12/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Orlando Police Pension Fund v. Page et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Mather
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Peterson
Represented By: Bryson Scott Santaguida
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L Hennessy
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Peterson
Represented By: Bryson Scott Santaguida
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. John Doerr
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Peterson
Represented By: Bryson Scott Santaguida
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric E Schmidt
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Peterson
Represented By: Bryson Scott Santaguida
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergey Brin
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Peterson
Represented By: Bryson Scott Santaguida
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence E Page
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Peterson
Represented By: Bryson Scott Santaguida
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul S Otellini
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Peterson
Represented By: Bryson Scott Santaguida
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Ram Shriram
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Peterson
Represented By: Bryson Scott Santaguida
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Tilghman
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Peterson
Represented By: Bryson Scott Santaguida
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Cheryl Weisbard Foung
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Peterson
Represented By: Bryson Scott Santaguida
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Orlando Police Pension Fund
Represented By: Takeo A Kellar
Represented By: Ian David Berg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]